Monson v. R&B Corporation of Virginia DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE. FILE IN CASE #4:23cv66
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Robert J Krask |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00069 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 9:44 AM EST |
Defendant
R&B Corporation of Virginia
|
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Monson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MEMORANDUM ORDER: It is ORDERED that the following cases are consolidated for all purposes: 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71; and 4:23-cv-76. All filings shall be made in the lead case, 4:23-cv-66. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the case name of lead case 4:23-cv-66 on CM/ECF to: In re R&B Corporation of Virginia d/b/a Credit Control Corporation, Data Security Breach Litigation. It is ORDERED that Bryan L. Bleichner of Chestnut Cambronne PA, Benjamin F. Johns of Shub & Johns LLC, and Gary M. Klinger of Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman LLC are hereby APPOINTED as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and David Hilton Wise of the Wise Law Firm PLC is hereby APPOINTED as Liaison Counsel. The plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an amended, consolidated complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Memorandum Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any action subsequently filed in, transferred to, or removed to this Court that arises out of similar facts as the above-captioned cases may be consolidated by the Court based on notice of such filing by plaintiffs' counsel or defendants counsel and the passage of ten (10) days, or on the Court's own motion and notice. If any party objects to such consolidation or otherwise wishes to seek alternative relief, they must do so before the expiration of the 10-day period. See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/20/2023. (afar) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 07/20 11:48 AM
All Future Docket Entries Will Be Made In the Lead Case, 4:23cv66. (afar) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION re8 Stipulation,9 Order,, Consolidate Cases and to appoint Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Class Counsel by Douglas Monson.(Wise, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER. All counsel of record for the plaintiffs in cases 4:23-cv-66, 4:23-cv-67, 4:23-cv-68, 4:23-cv-69, 4:23-cv-70, and 4:23-cv-71 are ORDERED to consult with counsel for the plaintiff in 4:23-cv-76 regarding the appointment of class counsel and consolidation of all seven cases. Counsel for the plaintiffs are further ORDERED to file amended motions, supplemental briefs, or other filings as are necessary to include the seventh-filed case (4:23-cv-76) in the relief sought in the motions. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/6/23. (jhie, ) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71 by Douglas Monson.(Wise, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/28 11:40 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes no longer assigned to the case. (afar) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER granting6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Amanda Brooke Murphy as to Douglas Monson. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 06/06/2023. (tlev, ) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Brooke Murphy and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd by Douglas Monson. (Floyd, Lee) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to R&B Corporation of Virginia, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(mrees) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 06/05 11:37 AM
Notice of Correction re3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Brooke Murphy and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8963817. Counsel is advised that the applicant must have their original signature on the application and not an e-signature. Counsel does not have to pay an additional fee. (awoo, ) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Douglas Monson. (Floyd, Lee) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Brooke Murphy and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8963817. by Douglas Monson. (Floyd, Lee) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Douglas Monson. (Floyd, Lee) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8962066.), filed by Douglas Monson.(Floyd, Lee) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 06/01 2:56 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) |