Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90611

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:23-bk-90691
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2023

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Haas Group International, LLC
1475 Phoenixville Pike Suite 201
West Chester, PA 19380
Represented By
Charles A Beckham, Jr
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
7 7 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 08/15 4:46 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 1 (Averitt, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 10/16 7:09 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Isgur . (RobbieWestmoreland)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 04, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/04 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/04 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Friday, June 02, 2023
order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Fri 06/02 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
2 2 order Joint Administration Thu 06/01 5:36 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90611 Signed on 6/1/2023 (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-]
1 1 92 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Thu 06/01 7:32 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Haas Group International, LLC. (Beckham, Charles)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 06/01 4:03 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90691 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 191500. Fee amount $1738.00. (KimberlyPicota)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Thu 06/01 5:37 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90611 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-]