Securities & Exchange Commission v. Auctus Fund Management, LLC et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Angel Kelley |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-11233 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 6:42 AM EST |
Amicus
Alternative Investment Management Association, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Association of Private Fund Managers
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Trading and Markets Project, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Auctus Fund LLC
545 Boylston Street 2nd Floor
Boston, MA 02116 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Auctus Fund Management, LLC
545 Boylston Street 2nd Floor
Boston, MA 02116 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louis J Posner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alfred Sollami
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Securities & Exchange Commission
33 Arch Street 24th Floor
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
![]() District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 25] is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Horvath, Courtney) |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
81 | 81
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 04/14 4:09 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 80 Joint MOTION to Stay (Extend Stay to May 9, 2025) (CEH) |
|
80 | 80
![]() Joint MOTION to Stay (Extend Stay to May 9, 2025) by Securities & Exchange Commission.(Kelly, Rua) |