Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:David J Novak
Case #: 3:23-cv-00362
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed Question-Violation of Constitutional Rights
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2023
Terminated:Jul 05, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 9:44 AM EST
Defendant
City Attorney
Plaintiff
Clayton Robinson
203 Cooper Court
Newport News, VA 23602


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/05 3:40 PM
ORDER (Dismissing Case for Failure to Comply with Court Orders and Failure to Prosecute). This matter comes before the Court on pro se Plaintiff Clayton Robinson's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis , (ECF No.1 ), proposed Complaint, (ECF No. 1-1), and the own initiative. Because Plaintiff has failed to file a corrected Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Costs and Fees ("IFP Application"), a Ghostwriting Form and a particularized amended complaint by the Court-ordered deadline of June 28, 2023, the Court hereby DISMISSES this action without prejudice. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 7/5/2023. Order was mailed to the plaintiff. (sbea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
2 2 4 pgs order Order Wed 06/07 1:54 PM
ORDER (Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and a Particularized Amended Complaint). This matter comes before the Court on pro se Plaintiff Clayton Robinson's ("Plaintiff') Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, (ECF No.1 ), and Proposed Complaint. Upon review, the Court cannot determine whether Plaintiff is qualified to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP"). First, Plaintiff failed to follow the instructions set forth on the first page of the Application by leaving large swathes of the Application incomplete. (See ECF No. 1, at 1 (instructing applicants that they must "not leave any blanks"). The Court hereby DENIES Plaintiff's Application, (ECF No. 1), and ORDERS that Plaintiff SHALL file a completed Amended Application within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this Order. In his Amended Application, Plaintiff must specifically address why the Court should not consider his ability to pay the filing fee in Civil Action No. 3:23cv363 as evidence that he is not entitled to IFP status. the Court also herby ORDERS that Plaintiff SHALL filed a Particularized Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the entry hereof. Plaintiff's Particularized Amended Complaint must outline in simple and straightforward terms why Plaintiff thinks that he is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over this case, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8(a)(1) and (2). The Particularized Amended Complaint must be legible and preferably created using a word processor , such as Microsoft Word. Further, the Particularized Amended Complaint SHALL comply with the directions. Once filed, the Particularized Amended Complaint will become the operative complaint in this case. The failure to strictly comply with the Court's directives and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL of this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). See Order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 6/7/2023. Order and Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs were mailed to the plaintiff. (sbea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/01 1:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Clayton Robinson.. (sbea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint,
Att: 2 Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification