Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:David J Novak
Case #: 3:23-cv-00363
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2023
Re-opened:Nov 01, 2023
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 9:44 AM EST
Defendant
City of Richmond Police Department
Represented By
Zachary Peter Grubaugh
Office Of The City Attorney (richmond)
contact info
Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Office Of The Richmond City Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Clayton Robinson
203 Cooper Court
Newport News, VA 23602


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 11, 2023
17 17 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/11 11:47 AM
FINAL ORDER (Granting Motion to Dismiss). Plaintiff Clayton Robinson ("Plaintiff'), proceeding pro se , brings this action against Defendant City of Richmond Police Department ("Defendant" or "Richmond Police Department"), asserting a claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. This matter comes before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ("Motion" (ECF No.13 )), moving the Court to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No.12 ) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Motion (ECF No.13 ) and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (ECF No.12 ). Because the complaint suffers from fundamental deficiencies - the same deficiencies that resulted in the Court dismissing his initial Complaint - and any amendment would be futile, the Court will not permit the Plaintiff to amend his complaint again. Should Plaintiff wish to appeal this Order, he must file a written notice of appeal with the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry. Failure to file a notice of appeal within that period may result in the loss of the right to appeal. See Order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/11/2023. Final Order was mailed to the plaintiff. (sbea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
16 16 notice Notice (other) Wed 11/15 11:34 AM
NOTICE by City of Richmond Police Department (Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument) (Fitzgerald, Shannan)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Roseboro Notice Wed 11/15 11:30 AM
Roseboro Notice by City of Richmond Police Department (Fitzgerald, Shannan)
Related: [-]
14 14 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 11/15 11:28 AM
Memorandum in Support re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Richmond Police Department. (Fitzgerald, Shannan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/15 11:27 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Richmond Police Department. (Fitzgerald, Shannan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/01 5:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Richmond Police Department, filed by Clayton Robinson.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Local Rule 83.1
Thursday, October 19, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/19 11:29 AM
ORDER (Granting Motion to Dismiss) For reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss5 and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint1 with leave to amend within thirty days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff files and Amended Complaint, the Clerk SHALL reopen the case. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/19/2023. (Copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order provided to all counsel of record and Pro Se Plaintiff.)(Kat)
Related: [-]
10 10 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 10/19 11:17 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/19/2023. (Kat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/24 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Marie Fitzgerald on behalf of City of Richmond Police Department (Fitzgerald, Shannan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
8 8 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/01 2:26 PM
Motion to deny dismissal5 and proceed with case filed by Clayton Robinson.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1 Certification
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
7 7 misc Waiver of Wed 07/19 10:26 AM
Waiver of Oral Argument for Motion to Dismiss by City of Richmond Police Department (Grubaugh, Zachary)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 07/19 10:23 AM
Memorandum in Support re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by City of Richmond Police Department. (Grubaugh, Zachary)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/19 10:21 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by City of Richmond Police Department. (Grubaugh, Zachary)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Roseboro Notice Wed 07/19 10:19 AM
Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by City of Richmond Police Department (Grubaugh, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/18 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Peter Grubaugh on behalf of City of Richmond Police Department (Grubaugh, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 06/02 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Richmond Police Department. Summons packet and a copy of Rule 4 mailed to Plaintiff at provided address. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/01 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Richmond Police Department, filed by Clayton Robinson. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 300001441.)(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1,
Att: 2 Receipt 300001441