Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00695
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 24, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 30, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/04 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Mr. Puryear served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 02/06 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Mr. Puryear. sERVICE TO BE DONE VIA usms.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS 285 Form
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 02/07 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Dewayne Hill(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, February 02, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Fri 02/02 1:28 PM
ORDERED that Mr. Hill's claims against Harold Clarke, Mr. Tatum, and GEO Corp. are DISMISSED; it is further ORDERED that Mr. Hill's application for leave to proceed informa pauperis (Dkt. 2) is GRANTED and Mr. Hill's Complaint is deemed filed as of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 02/02/2024. (see order details)(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
5 5 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 09/27 10:20 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
4 4 misc Consent to Collection of Fees Tue 09/19 10:19 AM
Consent to Collection of Fees by Dewayne Hill.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, August 24, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Fri 08/25 8:24 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff is assessed a filing fee of $350.00 and an administrative fee of $52.00, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1914(a); and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Dkt. 2) be and is conditionally granted, to the extent that Plaintiff need not pay the filing fee at this time (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 8/24/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/01 11:57 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dewayne Hill. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Thu 06/01 11:56 AM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against G.E.O. Corp, Mr. Puryear, Mr. Tatum, filed by Dewayne Hill.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Data Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope