Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00719
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause08:1421-Review of Denial of Application for Naturalization
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 9:45 AM EST
Defendant
Kimberly Zanotti
Represented By
Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Higginbotham
Represented By
Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Murray Osorio
contact info
John William Goodman
Murray Osorio PLLC
contact info
Brian Murray
Murray Osorio PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 23, 2023
18 18 order So Ordered Mon 10/23 2:18 PM
So Ordered re17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kyle Higginbotham. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/23/2023. (lcre, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/12 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kyle Higginbotham (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 10/04 9:35 AM
Upon consideration of defendant's Consent Motion for an Enlargement of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the consent motion is GRANTED ; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file her motion for summary judgment, along with a single memorandum of law in support of that motion and in opposition to plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, on or before October 13, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/04/2023. (Dcrow, )
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Wed 10/04 9:01 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Kimberly Zanotti.(Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 22, 2023
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/22 11:29 AM
Set Deadline as to12 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
14 14 misc Notice of Hearing Date Thu 09/21 11:59 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/17/23 re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,13 Memorandum (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 respoth Memorandum Thu 09/21 11:58 PM
Memorandum to12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kyle Higginbotham.(Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Virginia model jury instructions
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Thu 09/21 11:56 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kyle Higginbotham. (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg on behalf of Kyle Higginbotham (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 09/14 5:27 PM
ORDERED that: Plaintiff's motion9 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file his Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law on or before September 21, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/14/2023. (tran)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Wed 09/13 8:29 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law by Kyle Higginbotham.(Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 31, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 08/31 12:58 PM
ORDERED that the joint motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant is not required to file a formal answer to plaintiff's complaint; it is further ORDERED that defendant will file the pertinent portions of the administrative record of proceedings before USCIS on or before August 17, 2023; it is further ORDERED that plaintiff will file his motion for summary judgment, along with a memorandum of law in support of that motion, or or before September 14, 2023; it is further ORDERED that defendant will file its motion for summary judgment, along with a single memorandum in support of that motion and in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, on or before October 6, 2023; it is further ORDERED that plaintiff will file a single memorandum containing reply arguments in further support of his motion for summary judgment, and in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment, on or before October 20, 2023; it is further ORDERED that defendant will file a reply memorandum of law in further support of its motion for summary judgment on or before November 3, 2023; and it is further ORDERED that the parties will notice their motion for hearing before this Court on November 17, 2023. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/31/2023. (tran)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
7 7 notice Notice (other) Wed 08/16 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Submission of Administrative Record by Kimberly Zanotti (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AR790-859
6 6 notice Notice (other) Wed 08/16 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Submission of Administrative Record by Kimberly Zanotti < (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AR1-317,
Att: 2 AR318-651,
Att: 3 AR652-789
Friday, July 28, 2023
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 07/28 8:40 AM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Kimberly Zanotti.(Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 05, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/05 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Murray on behalf of Kyle Higginbotham (Murray, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 06/02 8:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Kimberly Zanotti, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Notice
Thursday, June 01, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 06/01 9:55 PM
Proposed Summons by Kyle Higginbotham. (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/01 9:54 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8963528.), filed by Kyle Higginbotham.(Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, N-400 Decision,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, N-336 Decision,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 06/02 8:50 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil)
Related: [-]