California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:23-cv-02418
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:May 17, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 13, 2023 1:17 AM PST
Defendant
Rugs.com, LLC
Represented By
Mohammad Keshavarzi
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Tony Jay-Lun Cheng
Mckown Bailey
contact info
J. Randall Boyer
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
John T. Brooks
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael McKown
Mckown Bailey
contact info
Sara Nicole Pfeiffer
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Roula Aldimassi
Represented By
Christin Cho
Dovel And Luner, LLP
contact info
Simon Carlo Franzini
Dovel And Luner
contact info
Grace Bennett
Dovel & Luner, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
44 44 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 07/24 3:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Roula Aldimassi. (Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
43 43 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 06/27 11:27 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Case Management Conference: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
42 42 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/08 5:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rugs.com, LLC. (Boyer, J. Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
41 41 order Order Fri 03/01 10:26 AM
ORDER re 40 Status Report filed by Rugs.com, LLC. The Court appreciates the parties' concerted efforts at resolution, and despite its prior warning, will allow one more extension of time. Accordingly, the Court grants the parties' request to set Defendant's responsive pleading deadline for May 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on March 1, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfllc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
40 40 misc Status Report Thu 02/29 4:46 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Rugs.com, LLC. (Boyer, J. Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
39 39 order Order Mon 12/18 11:28 AM
ORDER RE STAY. All deadlines, including all responsive pleading deadlines, will continue to be STAYED through February 29, 2024. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report regarding the outcome of mediation on February 29, 2024. No further extensions pending mediation will be granted, except in exceptional circumstances. Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on December 18, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfllc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/18 1:07 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 2/29/2024. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
38 38 misc Joint Case Management Statement Mon 12/11 4:42 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Roula Aldimassi. (Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
37 37 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/29 9:03 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
36 36 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 11/27 11:00 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Rita F. Lin in the San Francisco Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials RFL immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. All pending motions Related [+] must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Lin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court’s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after March 4, 2024 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before March 4, 2024, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. Each party is expected to review and become familiar with all applicable standing orders and scheduling notes. 9. On or before December 11, 2023 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address the following items in the following order: a. Date Filed : The date the case was filed; b. Parties : A list or description of each party; c. Claims : A summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims; d. Facts : A brief chronology of the facts and a statement of the principal factual issues in dispute; e. Legal Issues : A brief statement, without extended legal argument, of the disputed points of law, including reference to specific statutes and decisions; f. Relief : A description of the relief sought and the damages claimed with an explanation as to how damages have been (or will be) computed; g. Discovery : The status of discovery, including any significant discovery management issues, as well as any limits or cutoff dates; h. Related Cases : The status, case name, and case number of any related cases or proceedings pending before another judge of this court, or before another court or administrative body; i. Procedural History : A procedural history of the case, including any previous motions that were decided or submitted, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded, any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded, and any previous referral to a magistrate judge; j. Deadlines : A description of any other deadlines in place before reassignment, including those for ADR, dispositive motions, pretrial conferences, and trials; k. Any modification of deadlines : Any requested modification of these dates, and the reasons for the request; l. Consent to Magistrate : Whether the parties will consent to a magistrate judge for trial; and m. Emergency : Whether there exists an immediate need for a case management conference to be scheduled in the action, and why the parties believe such a need exists. 10. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. 11. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. Hearings and trials in any civil case assigned to a judge participating in the Pilot Project are eligible for video recording, upon request and with the consent of the parties and the presiding judge. Please see the [LINK:Northern Districts webpage about participation in the Pilot Project] and [LINK:General Order 65] for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 11/27/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] gardless of whether they are presently scheduled for hearing
Monday, November 06, 2023
35 35 misc Status Report Mon 11/06 4:34 PM
STATUS REPORT by Roula Aldimassi. (Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
34 34 misc Status Report Fri 10/06 4:11 PM
STATUS REPORT by Roula Aldimassi. (Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
33 33 4 pgs order Order Tue 10/03 9:13 AM
ORDER granting 31 Notice of Appearance by J. Randall Boyer and Substitution of Counsel for Rugs.com, LLC. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/3/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/3/2023 (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
32 32 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 09/29 11:00 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the stay of litigation to give the parties the opportunity to resolve this dispute among themselves, the further status conference scheduled for October 5, 2023 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Randall Boyer and Substitution of Counsel for Rugs.com, LLC (Boyer, J. Randall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
30 30 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 09/28 4:37 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Roula Aldimassi. (Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
29 29 misc Status Report Wed 09/06 2:54 PM
STATUS REPORT by Roula Aldimassi. (Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
28 28 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 08/25 4:49 PM
AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS INFORMATION. The Initial Case Management Conference set for October 5, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on October 4, 2023. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
27 27 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 08/17 2:56 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bennett, Grace)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 08/07 10:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS INFORMTION. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/6/2023 at 1:30 p.m. by a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 10/4/2023. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 08/07 10:26 AM
ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting as modified 23 Stipulation for Stay. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
24 24 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 08/04 5:05 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McKown, Aaron)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 08/04 4:58 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Stay filed by Rugs.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
Related: [-]
22 22 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Fri 08/04 4:21 PM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
21 21 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 07/28 1:36 PM
STIPULATION to Further Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint on or before August 13, 2023 filed by Rugs.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
20 20 15 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 07/14 11:03 AM
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on July 14, 2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
19 19 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 07/13 11:52 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by Roula Aldimassi.(Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Simon Franzini,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Redline Version
Friday, June 30, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 06/30 5:07 PM
STIPULATION to Further Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint on or before July 31, 2023 filed by Rugs.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
17 17 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 06/19 11:40 AM
STIPULATION to Further Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint on or before July 17, 2023 filed by Rugs.com, LLC. (McKown, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/01 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Bennett (Bennett, Grace)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/01 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Carlo Franzini (Franzini, Simon)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 06/01 2:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom videoconference. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 8/23/2024. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/01 10:20 AM
Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings.. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/1/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
12 12 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Thu 06/01 10:12 AM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
11 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
10 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Respond to Complaint filed by Rugs.com, LLC. (Cheng, Tony)
Related: [-]
9 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rugs.com, LLC.. (Cheng, Tony)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roula Aldimassi. Rugs.com, LLC served on 5/22/2023, answer due 6/12/2023. (Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
7 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Roula Aldimassi.. (Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
6 6 Summons Issued as to Rugs.com, LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Roula Aldimassi (Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Rugs.com, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18274883.). Filed byRoula Aldimassi.(Cho, Christin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of CLRA Venue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet