Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:R David Proctor
Case #: 2:23-cv-00713
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2023
Terminated:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 5:28 AM CST
Defendant
Patricia Stephens
Represented By
Cameron Wayne Elkins
Office Of The Attorney General - Alabama
contact info
Defendant
Michael Labellarte
Represented By
Christian Collier Feldman
Scott Dukes & Geisler
contact info
Carter H Dukes
Scott Dukes & Geisler PC
contact info
Defendant
Craig Langrall
PO Box 16
Tracy's Landing, MD 20779
Defendant
Gary Lee
Represented By
Jennifer Devereaux Segers
Huie Fernambucq & Stewart LLP
contact info
Defendant
Laura Montgomery Lee
Represented By
Stacy L Moon
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhanim LLP
contact info
Jeremy W Richter
Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deegan Malone
Represented By
Eris Bryan Paul
Clark May Price Lawley Duncan & Paul, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Robert Eric Mashburn
324 Barkwood Trace
Trussville, AL 35173
Defendant
Alisha Ruffin May
Represented By
Cameron Wayne Elkins
Office Of The Attorney General - Alabama
contact info
Defendant
Dale Maynard
Represented By
William Mellor Bains Fleming, III
Norman Wood Kendrick & Turner
contact info
Defendant
Thomas McKnight, Jr
Represented By
Jennifer Devereaux Segers
Huie Fernambucq & Stewart LLP
contact info
Defendant
Terri Miller
Represented By
Robert M Ronnlund
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Solace Family Counseling LLC
Represented By
Robert V Wood, Jr
Wilmer & Lee PA
contact info
Defendant
Southern Maryland Dredging Inc
Represented By
Douglas J Centeno
Benton & Centeno LLP
contact info
Defendant
St Anne's School of Annapolis Incorporated
Represented By
Wesley C Redmond
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kirk.Drennan PC
Represented By
Robert Preston MacKenzie, III
Starnes Davis Florie LLP
contact info
David Lee McAlister
Carr Allison
contact info
Averie Armstead Jones
Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
contact info
Melisa C Zwilling
Carr Allison PC
contact info
Averie Louise Armstead
Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Caroline Taylor
Represented By
John G Dana
Gordon Dana Gilmore & Maner LLC
contact info
Carl Christian Williams
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Christina Vineyard
Represented By
Robert Smith Vance, III
Dominick Feld Hyde
contact info
Joseph E Stott
Stott & Harrington, P.C.
contact info
Barry A Ragsdale
Dominick Feld Hyde PC
contact info
Defendant
Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt LLC
Defendant
Andrea Weiss
Represented By
Wesley C Redmond
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Everett Wess
Represented By
Robert L Beeman, II
Beeman Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Wess Law Firm PC, The
Represented By
Robert L Beeman, II
Beeman Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Compton Wilson
Represented By
Douglas J Centeno
Benton & Centeno LLP
contact info
Defendant
Renee Wilson
Represented By
Douglas J Centeno
Benton & Centeno LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carolyn Wyatt
1945 Indian Lake Drive
Birmingham, AL 35244
Defendant
Gary Wyatt
1945 Indian Lake Drive
Birmingham, AL 35244
Defendant
Paige Yarbrough
Represented By
Stacy L Moon
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhanim LLP
contact info
Jeremy W Richter
Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alan D Blotcky, PhD LLC
Defendant
Kim Davidson Law Office LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Gilliland
Law Office Of Scott Gilliland
contact info
Defendant
Alan Blotcky
Represented By
Christoffer Peter Bolvig, III
Hall Booth Smith Atlanta
contact info
Peter Thomas Dazzio, Jr
Friedman, Dazzio & Zulanas
contact info
Ethan Robert Wright
Friedman, Dazio, & Zulanas, P.C.
contact info
Jess S Boone
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas PC
contact info
Defendant
Agnes Chappell
Represented By
Cameron Wayne Elkins
Office Of The Attorney General - Alabama
contact info
Defendant
Jay Clark
Represented By
Jennifer Devereaux Segers
Huie Fernambucq & Stewart LLP
contact info
Defendant
Connie Coker
Represented By
Wesley C Redmond
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wendy Crew
Represented By
Robert Smith Vance, III
Dominick Feld Hyde
contact info
Joseph E Stott
Stott & Harrington, P.C.
contact info
Barry A Ragsdale
Dominick Feld Hyde PC
contact info
Defendant
Crew Gentle Law PC
Represented By
Robert Smith Vance, III
Dominick Feld Hyde
contact info
Joseph E Stott
Stott & Harrington, P.C.
contact info
Barry A Ragsdale
Dominick Feld Hyde PC
contact info
Defendant
Caroline O Taylor PC
Represented By
John G Dana
Gordon Dana Gilmore & Maner LLC
contact info
Carl Christian Williams
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Crew Law Group
Represented By
Robert Smith Vance, III
Dominick Feld Hyde
contact info
Joseph E Stott
Stott & Harrington, P.C.
contact info
Barry A Ragsdale
Dominick Feld Hyde PC
contact info
Defendant
Judith Crittenden
Represented By
Stacy L Moon
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhanim LLP
contact info
Jeremy W Richter
Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Crittenden Partners PC
Represented By
Stacy L Moon
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhanim LLP
contact info
Jeremy W Richter
Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
CPE Clinic LLC
Represented By
Christian Collier Feldman
Scott Dukes & Geisler
contact info
Carter H Dukes
Scott Dukes & Geisler PC
contact info
Defendant
Madison Brantley
Represented By
Cameron Wayne Elkins
Office Of The Attorney General - Alabama
contact info
Defendant
Clotele Brantley
Represented By
Dagney Johnson
Dagney Johnson Law Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kim Davidson
Represented By
Scott Alan Gilliland
Law Office Of Scott Gilliland
contact info
Defendant
Bay Area Christian Counseling
Represented By
Robert Preston MacKenzie, III
Starnes Davis Florie LLP
contact info
Averie Armstead Jones
Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jessica Kirk Drennan
Represented By
Robert Preston MacKenzie, III
Starnes Davis Florie LLP
contact info
David Lee McAlister
Carr Allison
contact info
Averie Armstead Jones
Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
contact info
Melisa C Zwilling
Carr Allison PC
contact info
Averie Louise Armstead
Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Duncan
Represented By
Robert Preston MacKenzie, III
Starnes Davis Florie LLP
contact info
David Lee McAlister
Carr Allison
contact info
Averie Armstead Jones
Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
contact info
Melisa C Zwilling
Carr Allison PC
contact info
Averie Louise Armstead
Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Heather Fann
Represented By
Bruce F Rogers
Bainbridge Mims Rogers & Smith LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Nicholson Terenzi
Bainbridge Mims Rogers & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Erika Goldman
Represented By
Douglas J Centeno
Benton & Centeno LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deborah Gregory
Represented By
Stacy L Moon
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhanim LLP
contact info
Jeremy W Richter
Gordon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hardy Law Firm LLC
Represented By
Dagney Johnson
Dagney Johnson Law Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Hope For Healing LLC
Represented By
H. Thomas Wells, Jr
Maynard Cooper & Gale PC
contact info
Thomas W H Buck, Jr
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info
Defendant
Marcus Jones
Represented By
Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart
Balch & Bingham LLP
contact info
Stanley A Cash
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Defendant
David Kellner
Represented By
Robert V Wood, Jr
Wilmer & Lee PA
contact info
Plaintiff
G. M. W.
Represented By
Scott Ledell Tindle
Tindle Firm
contact info
Scott Tindle
Scott Tindle
contact info
Plaintiff
J. K. D.
Represented By
Scott Ledell Tindle
Tindle Firm
contact info
Scott Tindle
Scott Tindle
contact info
Plaintiff
L. W. D.
Represented By
Scott Ledell Tindle
Tindle Firm
contact info
Scott Tindle
Scott Tindle
contact info
Plaintiff
R. E. D.
Represented By
Scott Ledell Tindle
Tindle Firm
contact info
Scott Tindle
Scott Tindle
contact info
Plaintiff
T Peake
Represented By
Scott Ledell Tindle
Tindle Firm
contact info
Scott Tindle
Scott Tindle
contact info
Plaintiff
D Deaton
Represented By
Scott Ledell Tindle
Tindle Firm
contact info
Scott Tindle
Scott Tindle
contact info

GPO Sep 19 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/19/2023. (KSS)

Docket last updated: 02/26/2025 10:31 AM CST
Friday, June 02, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT against Bay Area Christian Counseling, Alan Blotcky, Clotele Brantley, Madison Brantley, CPE Clinic LLC, Caroline O Taylor PC, Agnes Chappell, Jay Clark, Connie Coker, Wendy Crew, Crew Gentle Law PC, Crew Law Group, Judith Crittenden, Crittenden Partners PC, Kim Davidson, Jessica Kirk Drennan, Amanda Duncan, Heather Fann, Erika Goldman, Deborah Gregory, Hardy Law Firm LLC, Hope For Healing LLC, Marcus Jones, David Kellner, Kirk.Drennan PC, Michael Labellarte, Craig Langrall, Gary Lee, Laura Montgomery Lee, Deegan Malone, Robert Eric Mashburn, Alisha Ruffin May, Dale Maynard, Thomas McKnight, Jr, Terri Miller, Solace Family Counseling LLC, Southern Maryland Dredging Inc, St Anne's School of Annapolis Incorporated, Patricia Stephens, Caroline Taylor, Christina Vineyard, G. M. W., Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt LLC, Andrea Weiss, Everett Wess, Wess Law Firm PC, The, Compton Wilson, Renee Wilson, Carolyn Wyatt, Gary Wyatt, filed by L. W. D., D Deaton, T Peake, R. E. D., J. K. D..(KAM)
Related: [-]