Aetna Life Insurance Co. et al v. Tiero, LLC et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Brendan Abell Hurson |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-01484 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 7:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Certify Global Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tiero, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sajad Zalzala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aetna Health, Inc.
980 Jolly Road
Blue Bell, PA 19422 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aetna Life Insurance Co.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
![]() SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 3/25/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
39 | 39
![]() Status Report Submitted [Parties have reached an agreement to settle] by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co. (Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Stephanie A. Chen] by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 03/13 9:05 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephanie A. Chen terminated. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 3/12/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
![]() RESPONSE in Support re30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala.(Docherty, Kevin) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/20 2:14 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Brendan Abell Hurson. Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co..(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 09/26 5:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time. The plaintiffs' opposition to the defendants' motion to dismiss the amended complaint is due October 13, 2023, and the defendants' reply is due November 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 9/26/2023. (lmys, Chambers) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co. re31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time [TO MODIFY REMAINING BRIEFING SCHEDULE] [Text of Proposed Order] (Bolton, Bryan) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 09/25 3:23 PM
QC NOTICE:31 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Aetna Life Insurance Co., Aetna Health, Inc. was filed incompletely. **The following attachments are missing - Text of Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Text of Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Text of Proposed Order to 31 Motion. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time [TO MODIFY REMAINING BRIEFING SCHEDULE] by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala(Docherty, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 08/29 10:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants' response to the plaintiffs' amended complaint is due by September 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 8/29/2023. (lmys, Chambers) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to PLs Amended Complaint by Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala(Docherty, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 08/22 12:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot18 Motion to Dismiss in light of24 the parties' stipulation and26 the plaintiffs' amended complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 8/22/2023. (lmys, Chambers) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Co., Aetna Health, Inc..(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
order
Order
Thu 08/10 9:22 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving24 stipulation that plaintiffs, in lieu of responding to defendants' motion to dismiss, shall have through and including August 21, 2023 to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 8/10/2023. (lmys, Chambers) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT UNTIL AUGUST 21, 2023 by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tiero, LLC (Docherty, Kevin) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Certify Global Inc. (Docherty, Kevin) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 08/09 12:03 PM
QC NOTICE:19 Notice (Other) filed by Certify Global Inc.,20 Notice (Other) filed by Tiero, LLC was filed incorrectly. **When docketing the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement the Corporate Parents, Affiliates and parties with a financial interest MUST be entered when prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings- Other Documents- Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE by Tiero, LLC Disclosure of Corporate Interests (Docherty, Kevin) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE by Certify Global Inc. Disclosure of Corporate Interests (Docherty, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
notice
Deficiency Notice
Tue 08/01 11:29 AM
Deficiency Notice -Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/8/2023 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala(Freeman, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Neel Lalchandani on behalf of Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala (Lalchandani, Neel) |
|
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Docherty on behalf of Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala (Docherty, Kevin) |
|
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew David Freeman on behalf of Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala (Freeman, Andrew) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aetna Life Insurance Co., Aetna Health, Inc.. Sajad Zalzala waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/08 6:11 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/07 4:24 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aetna Life Insurance Co., Aetna Health, Inc.. Certify Global Inc. waiver sent on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023; Tiero, LLC waiver sent on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Kentucky), Other Affiliate CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Other Affiliate Aetna Health Holdings, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (Georgia), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (Maine), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (New Jersey), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (Texas), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of California Inc. (California), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (Georgia), Other Affiliate Aetna Dental of California Inc. (California), Other Affiliate Aetna Dental Inc. (New Jersey), Other Affiliate Aetna Dental Inc. (Texas), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Kansas Inc. (Kansas), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (Louisiana), Other Affiliate Aetna Florida Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (Ohio), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (New Jersey), Other Affiliate Aetna Risk Assurance Company of Connecticut Inc. (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Student Health Agency Inc. (Massachusetts), Other Affiliate Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC (Arizona), Other Affiliate Prodigy Health Group, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Health of Iowa Inc. (Iowa), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Inc. (Louisiana), Other Affiliate Coventry Prescription Management Services Inc. (Nevada), Other Affiliate Coventry Health and Life Insurance Company (Missouri), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Kentucky Insurance Company (Kentucky), Other Affiliate Aetna Life Insurance Company (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Resources LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Phoenix Data Solutions LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Capital Management, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Partners Diversified Fund, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Workers' Comp Access, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Managed Care Coordinators, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Horizon Behavioral Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Resources for Living, LLC (Texas), Other Affiliate The Vasquez Group Inc. (Illinois), Other Affiliate Work and Family Benefits, Inc. (New Jersey), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Holdings Limited (England & Wales), Other Affiliate Spinnaker Topco Limited (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Aetna (Beijing) Enterprise Management Services Co., Ltd. (China), Other Affiliate ASI Wings, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Foreign, Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate CVS Caremark Indemnity Ltd (Bermuda), Other Affiliate CVS International, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Rhode Island), Other Affiliate Aetna Health of California Inc. (California), Other Affiliate Aetna, Inc. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Aetna Health of Michigan Inc. (Michigan), Other Affiliate Aetna Health of Ohio Inc. (Ohio), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc. (Texas), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Washington Inc. (Washington), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Assurance Pennsylvania Inc. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Aetna Rx Home Delivery LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Management LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Ireland Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Specialty Pharmacy LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cofinity Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate @Credentials Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Illinois Inc. (Illinois), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Premier Plan MMAI Inc. (Illinois), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Indiana Inc. (Indiana), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Oklahoma (Oklahoma), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. of Nevada Inc. (Nevada), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of North Carolina Inc. (North Carolina), Other Affiliate Aetna Network Service LLC (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Delaware Physicians Care Incorporated (Delaware), Other Affiliate Schaller Anderson Medical Administrators Incorporated (Delaware), Other Affiliate iTriage LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Medical Examinations of New York PC (New York), Other Affiliate bswift Resources LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Niagara Re Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate Performax Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Scrip World LLC (Utah), Other Affiliate Precision Benefit Services Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate American Health Holding Inc. (Ohio), Other Affiliate Meritain Health Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate Administrative Enterprises Inc. (Arizona), Other Affiliate U.S. Healthcare Holdings LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate Prime Net Inc. (Ohio), Other Affiliate Professional Risk Management Inc. (Ohio), Other Affiliate ADMINCO Inc. (Arizona), Other Affiliate Aetna ACO Holdings Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Pharmacy Management Services LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coventry Transplant Network Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Care of Nebraska Inc. (Nebraska), Other Affiliate Health Assurance Pennsylvania Inc. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Care of Virginia Inc. (Virginia), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Care of Missouri Inc. (Missouri), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Care of Illinois Inc. (Illinois), Other Affiliate Coventry HealthCare Management Corporation (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Care of West Virginia Inc. (West Virginia), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Care of Kansas Inc. (Kansas), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Care National Accounts Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Michigan Inc. (Michigan), Other Affiliate Aetna Health of Utah Inc. (Utah), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Tennessee Inc. (Tennessee), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Care National Network Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coventry Consumer Advantage Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate MHNet Specialty Services LLC (Maryland), Other Affiliate Mental Health Network of New York IPA Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate Mental Health Associates Inc. (Louisiana), Other Affiliate MHNet of Florida Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate Group Dental Services Inc. (Maryland), Other Affiliate Group Dental Service of Maryland Inc. (Maryland), Other Affiliate Florida Health Plan Administrators LLC (Florida), Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health of Florida Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate Carefree Insurance Services Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate Coventry Health Plan of Florida Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate First Health Group Corp (Delaware), Other Affiliate First Health Life & Health Insurance Company (Texas), Other Affiliate Claims Administration Corp (Maryland), Other Affiliate First Choice of the Midwest LLC (South Dakota), Other Affiliate Continental Life Insurance Company of Brentwood, Tennessee (Tennessee), Other Affiliate American Continental Insurance Company (Tennessee), Other Affiliate AHP Holdings Inc. (Connecticut), Other Affiliate AE Fourteen Incorporated (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Life Assignment Company (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Innovation Health Holdings LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Innovation Health Insurance Company (Virginia), Other Affiliate Innovative Health Plan Inc. (Virginia), Other Affiliate Texas Health + Aetna Health Insurance Company Holding Company LLC (Texas), Other Affiliate Texas Health + Aetna Health Plan Inc. (Texas), Other Affiliate Banner Health and Aetna Health Insurance Holding Company LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Banner Health and Aetna Health Insurance Company (Arizona), Other Affiliate Banner Health and Aetna Health Plan Inc. (Arizona), Other Affiliate Sutter Health and Aetna Insurance Holding Company LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Sutter Health and Aetna Administrative Services LLC (California), Other Affiliate Sutter Health and Aetna Insurance Company (California), Other Affiliate Allina Health and Aetna Insurance Company (Minnesota), Other Affiliate Allina Health and Aetna Insurance Holding Company LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Allina Health and Aetna Plan Inc. (Minnesota), Other Affiliate Aetna International LLC (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Life & Casualty (Bermuda) Ltd. (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Aetna International Ex Pat LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Insurance (Hong Kong) Limited (Hong Kong), Other Affiliate Virtual Home Healthcare LLC (Dubai), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Benefits (Bermuda) Limited (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Goodhealth Worldwide (Global) Limited (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Benefits (Europe) Limited (England & Wales), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Benefits (Asia Pacific) Limited (Hong Kong), Other Affiliate PT Aetna Management Consulting (Indonesia), Other Affiliate Goodhealth Worldwide (Asia) Limited (Hong Kong), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Benefits Limited (DIFC, UAE), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Benefits (Middle East) LLC (UAE), Other Affiliate PT Aetna Global Benefits Indonesia (Indonesia), Other Affiliate Spinnaker Bidco Limited (England and Wales), Other Affiliate Aetna Holdco (UK) Limited (England and Wales), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Benefits (UK) Limited (England and Wales), Other Affiliate Aetna Insurance Company Limited (England and Wales), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Insurance Company of Europe DAC (Ireland), Other Affiliate Aetna (Shanghai) Enterprise Services Col, Ltd. (China), Other Affiliate Aetna Global Benefits (Singapore) PTE. LTD. (Singapore), Other Affiliate Indian Health Organization Private Limited (India), Other Affiliate PE Holding LLC (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Canal Place LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Ventures LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Financial Holdings LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Aetna Asset Advisors LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate US Healthcare Properties Inc. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Aetna Behavioral Health, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Employee Assistance Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Health and Human Resources Center, Inc. (California), Other Affiliate Employee Assistance Services, LLC (Kentucky), Other Affiliate Aetna Card Solutions, LLC (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Health and Life Insurance Company (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Insurance Company (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Aetna Health Insurance Company of New York (New York), Other Affiliate AUSHC Holdings, Inc. (Connecticut), Other Affiliate PHPSNE Parent Corporation (Delaware), Other Affiliate Active Health Management, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Health Data & Management Solutions, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Accountable Care Organization Inc. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Health Re, Inc. (Vermont), Other Affiliate Aetna Corporate Service LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Echo Merger Sub, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Alabama CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Alabama), Other Affiliate Alaska CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Alaska), Other Affiliate American Drug Stores Delaware, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Arkansas), Other Affiliate CareCenter Pharmacy, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Caremark Rx, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate ACS ACQCO CORP. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Advanced Care Scripts, Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate CaremarkPCS, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Caremark IPA, L.L.C. (New York), Other Affiliate Accordant Health Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate AdvancePCS SpecialtyRx, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CaremarkPhC, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Caremark Ulysses Holding Corp. (New York), Other Affiliate MemberHealth LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate UAC Holding, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Caremark, L.L.C. (California), Other Affiliate Caremark Arizona Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Arizona), Other Affiliate Caremark Arizona Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Arizona), Other Affiliate Caremark California Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (California), Other Affiliate Caremark Florida Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Florida), Other Affiliate Caremark Florida Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Florida), Other Affiliate Caremark Hawaii Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Hawaii), Other Affiliate Caremark Hawaii Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Hawaii), Other Affiliate Caremark Illinois Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Illinois), Other Affiliate CVS Caremark Advanced Technology Pharmacy, LLC (Illinois), Other Affiliate Caremark Illinois Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Illinois), Other Affiliate Caremark Irving Resource Center, LLC (Texas), Other Affiliate Caremark Kansas Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Kansas), Other Affiliate Caremark Logistics, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Caremark Louisiana Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Louisiana), Other Affiliate Caremark Maryland Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Maryland), Other Affiliate Caremark Massachusetts Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Massachusetts), Other Affiliate Caremark Michigan Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Michigan), Other Affiliate Caremark Minnesota Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate Caremark New Jersey Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (New Jersey), Other Affiliate Caremark North Carolina Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (North Carolina), Other Affiliate Caremark Ohio Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate Caremark Pennsylvania Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Caremark Redlands Pharmacy, LLC (California), Other Affiliate Caremark Repack, LLC (Illinois), Other Affiliate Caremark Tennessee Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Tennessee), Other Affiliate Caremark Texas Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Texas), Other Affiliate Caremark Texas Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Texas), Other Affiliate Caremark Washington Specialty Pharmacy, LLC (Washington), Other Affiliate Central Rx Services, LLC (Nevada), Other Affiliate CVS Caremark TN SUTA, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Generation Health, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate I.g.G. of America, LLC (Maryland), Other Affiliate NovoLogix, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate US Bioservices Corporation (Delaware), Other Affiliate APS Enterprises Holding Company (Delaware), Other Affiliate IHS Acquisition XXX, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Pharm Plus Acquisition, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate CaremarkPCS Alabama Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Alabama), Other Affiliate CVS Caremark Part D Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Eckerd Corporation of Florida, Inc. (Florida), Other Affiliate Express Pharmacy Services of PA, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Ocean Acquisition Sub, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate T2 Medical, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Alabama (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Florida (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Greater D.C. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Greater New York (New York), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Indiana (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Mississippi (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Nevada (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Northern California (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Southern California (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Southern Florida (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Specialty Infusion Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Rx, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of North Texas (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Utah (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Healthcare Corporation of Massachusetts (Delaware), Other Affiliate Coram Alternate Site Services, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Geneva Woods Management, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Part D Holding Company, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Accendo Insurance Company (Utah), Other Affiliate Silverscript Insurance Company (Tennessee), Other Affiliate Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Connecticut), Other Affiliate Coram Clinical Trials, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Cabot Holdings Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Shaw Holdings Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Evergreen Pharmaceutical of California, LLC (California), Other Affiliate JHC Acquisition, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Geneva Woods Pharmacy, LLC (Alaska), Other Affiliate Geneva Woods Health Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Geneva Woods Retail Pharmacy, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Geneva Woods LTC Pharmacy, LLC, Other Affiliate Geneva Woods Pharmacy Wyoming, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Geneva Woods Pharmacy Washington, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Geneva Woods Pharmacy Alaska, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate AMC - Tennessee, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CHP Acquisition, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Home Pharmacy Services, LLC (Missouri), Other Affiliate CP Acquisition, LLC (Oklahoma), Other Affiliate Managed Healthcare, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Medical Arts Health Care, LLC (Georgia), Other Affiliate NIV Acquisition, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate OCR Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Shore Pharmaceutical Providers, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare of Nevada, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare Pharmacies of the Great Plains Holding, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare of Nebraska, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Pharmacy Associates of Glenn Falls, LLC (New York), Other Affiliate Sterling Healthcare Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Superior Care Pharmacy, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate TCPI Acquisition, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate UC Acquisition, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Weber Medical System LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Williamson Drug Company, LLC (Virginia), Other Affiliate Med World Acquisition Corp. (Delaware), Other Affiliate MHHP Acquisition Company, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate NeighborCare Pharmacy Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate APS Acquisition LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate ASCO HealthCare, LLC (Maryland), Other Affiliate Badger Acquisition LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Badger Acquisition of Minnesota LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Merwin Long Term Care, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate Badger Acquisition of Ohio LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Badger Acquisition of Kentucky LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Best Care LTC Acquisition Company, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Care Pharmaceutical Services, LP (Delaware), Other Affiliate CCRx Holdings, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Continuing Care Rx, LLC (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate CCRx of North Carolina LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Compscript, LLC (Florida), Other Affiliate Campo's Medical Pharmacy, LLC (Louisiana), Other Affiliate D & R Pharmaceutical Services LLC (Kentucky), Other Affiliate Enloe Drugs, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Evergreen Pharmaceutical, LLC (Washington), Other Affiliate Home Care Pharmacy, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Interlock Pharmacy System, LLC (Missouri), Other Affiliate Langsam Health Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate LCPS Acquisition, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare Pharmacy of Tennessee LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Lobos Acquisition, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Lo-Med Prescription Services, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate ZS Acquisition Company, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Main Street Pharmacy, LLC (Maryland), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of Illinois, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of Iowa, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate Martin Health Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of Kansas, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of Kentucky, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare Montana, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of South Carolina, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of Tennessee, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of Ohio, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate NCS Healthcare of Wisconsin, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate North Shore Pharmacy Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare Indiana Partnership Holding Company LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare of New York, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate NeighborCare of Indiana, LLC (Indiana), Other Affiliate Grandview Pharmacy, LLC (Indiana), Other Affiliate NeighborCare of Virginia, LLC (Virginia), Other Affiliate Omnicare Pharmacies of Pennsylvania West LLC (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate Omnicare Pharmacy and Supply Services LLC (South Dakota), Other Affiliate Omnicare Pharmacy of the Midwest, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Omnicare Property Management, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Pharmacy Consultants, LLC (South Carolina), Other Affiliate PRN Pharmaceutical Services, LP (Delaware), Other Affiliate Roeschen's Healthcare LLC (Wisconsin), Other Affiliate PP Acquisition Company LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Specialized Pharmacy Services, LLC (Michigan), Other Affiliate Value Health Care Services LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate VAPS Acquisition Company, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Westhaven Services Co., LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate Three Forks Apothecary, LLC (Kentucky), Other Affiliate UNI-Care Health Services of Maine, LLC (New Hampshire), Other Affiliate CVS 2948 Henderson, L.L.C. (Nevada), Other Affiliate CVS AL Distribution, L.L.C. (Alabama), Other Affiliate CVS Albany, L.L.C. (New York), Other Affiliate CVS AOC Services, L.L.C. (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS AOC Corporation (California), Other Affiliate CVS Care Concierge, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Health Applications, LLC (Rhode Island), Other Affiliate CVS Health Clinical Trial Services, LLC (Connecticut), Other Affiliate CVS Health Growth Equity, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Health Solutions LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Health Ventures Management, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Health Ventures Fund GP, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Health Ventures Fund, LP (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Indiana, LLC (Indiana), Other Affiliate CVS International, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate CCI Foreign, S.a.R.L. (R.C.S. Luxembourg), Other Affiliate Beauty Holdings, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Pamplona Saude e Beleza LTDA (Brazil), Other Affiliate CVS Safir Sourcing, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Strategic Resources Private Limited (India), Other Affiliate CVS Kidney Care, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Kidney Care Health Services LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Kidney Care Advanced Technologies LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Kidney Care Home Dialysis LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS-SHC Renal Holdings LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Management Support, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Manchester NH, LLC (New Hampshire), Other Affiliate CVS Media Exchange LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate CVS Michigan, L.L.C. (Michigan), Other Affiliate CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C. (Florida), Other Affiliate CVS PA Distribution, L.L.C. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate CVS Pharmacy Overseas Online, LLC, Other Affiliate CVS PR Center, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Puerto Rico), Other Affiliate Caremark Puerto Rico, L.L.C. (Puerto Rico), Other Affiliate Caremark Puerto Rico Specialty Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Puerto Rico), Other Affiliate CVS RS Arizona, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate Arizona CVS Stores, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate CVS 3268 Gilbert, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate CVS 3745 Peoria, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate CVS Gilbert 3272, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate CVS Rx Services, Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate Busse CVS, L.L.C. (Illinois), Other Affiliate Goodyear CVS, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate Sheffield Avenue CVS, L.L.C. (Illinois), Other Affiliate South Wabash CVS, L.L.C. (Illinois), Other Affiliate Thomas Phoenix CVS, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate Washington Lamb CVS, L.L.C. (Nevada), Other Affiliate CVS SC Distribution, L.L.C. (South Carolina), Other Affiliate CVS State Capital, L.L.C. (Maine), Other Affiliate CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C. (Tennessee), Other Affiliate CVS Transportation, L.L.C. (Indiana), Other Affiliate CVS Vero FL Distribution, L.L.C. (Florida), Other Affiliate D.A.W., LLC (Massachusetts), Other Affiliate Delaware CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Delaware), Other Affiliate District of Columbia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (District of Columbia), Other Affiliate Enterprise Patient Safety Organization, LLC (Rhode Island), Other Affiliate E.T.B., Inc. (Texas), Other Affiliate Garfield Beach CVS, L.L.C. (California), Other Affiliate Georgia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Georgia), Other Affiliate German Dobson CVS, L.L.C. (Arizona), Other Affiliate Grand St. Paul CVS, L.L.C. (Minnesota), Other Affiliate Highland Park CVS, L.L.C. (Illinois), Other Affiliate Holiday CVS, L.L.C. (Florida), Other Affiliate Hook-SupeRx, L.L.C. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Idaho CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Idaho), Other Affiliate Iowa CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Iowa), Other Affiliate Kansas CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Kansas), Other Affiliate Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C. (California), Other Affiliate Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Louisiana), Other Affiliate Maryland CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Maryland), Other Affiliate Melville Realty Company, Inc. (New York), Other Affiliate CVS Bellmore Avenue, L.L.C. (New York), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic, L.L.C. (Delaware), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Alabama, L.L.C. (Alabama), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Arkansas, LLC (Arkansas), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Arizona, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Colorado, LLC (Colorado), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Florida, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Georgia, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Hawaii, LLC (Hawaii), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Illinois, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Kentucky, LLC (Kentucky), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Louisiana, LLC (Louisiana), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Maine, L.L.C. (Maine), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Maryland, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Massachusetts, LLC (Massachusetts), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Nebraska, L.L.C. (Nebraska), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of New Hampshire, L.L.C. (New Hampshire), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of New Mexico, L.L.C. (New Mexico), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Ohio, LLC (Ohio), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Oklahoma, LLC (Oklahoma), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Oregon, LLC (Oregon), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Pennsylvania, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Rhode Island, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of South Carolina, L.L.C. (South Carolina), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Texas, LLC (Minnesota), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Utah, L.L.C. (Utah), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Virginia, LLC (Virginia), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Washington, LLC (Oregon), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Diagnostic of Wisconsin, L.L.C. (Wisconsin), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Online Diagnostic Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Physician Practice of Texas (Texas), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Telehealth Services, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate MinuteClinic Telehealth Services of Texas Association (Texas), Other Affiliate Mississippi CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Mississippi), Other Affiliate Missouri CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Missouri), Other Affiliate Montana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Montana), Other Affiliate Nebraska CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Nebraska), Other Affiliate New Jersey CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (New Jersey), Other Affiliate North 53, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate North 53 TAOH Limited, Other Affiliate North 53 TAOO Limited, Other Affiliate North 53 (Ireland) TAOH Limited, Other Affiliate North Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (North Carolina), Other Affiliate Ohio CVS Stores, L.L.C. (Ohio), Other Affiliate Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Oklahoma), Other Affiliate Omnicare Resources, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Oregon CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Oregon), Other Affiliate Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Pennsylvania), Other Affiliate ProCare Pharmacy Direct, L.L.C. (Ohio), Other Affiliate ProCare Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Rhode Island), Other Affiliate Red Oak Sourcing, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Rhode Island CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Rhode Island), Other Affiliate South Carolina CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (South Carolina), Other Affiliate Tennessee CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Tennessee), Other Affiliate Utah CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Utah), Other Affiliate Vermont CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Vermont), Other Affiliate Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Virginia), Other Affiliate Warm Springs Road CVS, L.L.C. (Nevada), Other Affiliate Washington CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Washington), Other Affiliate Wellpartner, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (West Virginia), Other Affiliate Wisconsin CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Wisconsin), Other Affiliate Woodward Detroit CVS, L.L.C. (Michigan), Other Affiliate Zinc Health Ventures, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Zinc Health Services, LLC (Delaware) for ; Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co..(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/5/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/05 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co. or counsel for Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/20/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued 21 days as to Certify Global Inc., Tiero, LLC, Sajad Zalzala.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jordan F. Rice. Directing attorney Jordan F. Rice to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 6/2/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) | |
6 | 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nathaniel J. Moore. Directing attorney Nathaniel J. Moore to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 6/2/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) | |
5 | 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephanie A. Chen. Directing attorney Stephanie A. Chen to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 6/2/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) | |
4 | 4
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jordan F. Rice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10634124.) by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
3 | 3
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathaniel J. Moore (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10634117.) by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie A. Chen (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10634097.) by Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
notice
Deficiency Notice
Fri 06/02 9:40 AM
Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/9/2023 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/02 4:00 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |