Original Case: 5:21-cv-00768

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pcf-50413
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2023
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 4:37 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
Axis Supply Corporation
Represented By
James G. Ruiz
Winstead, P.C.
contact info
Elin Isenhower
Winstead, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Appliance Liquidation Outlet, L.L.C.
Represented By
Matthew Justin Badders
Drought, Drought & Bobbitt
contact info
Nick Guinn
Gunn, Lee & Cave, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jun 21 2024
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-50413 Affirmed in Part ] Judge: JES , Judge: CH , Judge: DMD Mandate issue date is 07/15/2024 [23-50413]

Docket last updated: 06/24/2024 4:37 AM CDT
Friday, June 02, 2023
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Axis Supply Corporation 23-50413 (AS)
Related: [-]