Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Jamar K Walker
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:23-cv-00245
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2023
Terminated:May 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 02, 2023 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
Forrest Caulder
Represented By
Kevin Edward Martingayle
Bischoff Martingayle, PC
contact info
Defendant
Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Edward Martingayle
Bischoff Martingayle, PC
contact info
Defendant
Cassidy Greenberg
Represented By
William Christopher Dunn
Randall, Page & Bruch, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Greenberg
Represented By
William Christopher Dunn
Randall, Page & Bruch, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company
Smith Bain Manuel LLP 455 Second St, SE, Ste.402 Charlottesville
Charlottesville, VA 22901
Represented By
Elisabeth Manuel
Smith Bain Manuel Horvath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 16, 2024
44 44 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/16 3:16 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the claims and demands that Plaintiff Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company brought against Defendants Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC, Forrest Caulder, Kevin Greenberg, and Cassidy Greenberg are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court RETAINS jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the parties' settlement. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 5/16/24. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
43 43 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Fri 05/03 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (other) Fri 05/03 10:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court has been advised that this matter is settled. This matter will be dismissed agreed with prejudice unless a stipulation of dismissal or a motion requesting entry of an order of dismissal is submitted by counsel within eleven (11) days from the date of this notice. This deadline may be extended only by an order of the Court obtained by counsel. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 05/02 12:54 PM
RECUSAL ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to an alternate United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 5/2/24. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask for all further proceedings.(jhie, )
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/02 12:14 PM
Settlement Conference held on 5/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (lwoo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
41 41 motion Electronic Device Application Tue 04/23 11:32 AM
MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 04/23 12:57 PM
Notice of Correction re41 MOTION for Electronic Device Application . Electronic device authorization requests should be emailed directly to the courtroom deputy. The document at ECF 41 has been removed and forwarded to the courtroom deputy for Judge Leonard, and no further action is needed at this time. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 04/19 2:45 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Leave to Appear at Settlement Conference by Telephone. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit an electronic device authorization request for a cell phone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 4/19/24. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
39 39 misc Letter Thu 04/18 9:40 AM
Letter to the Hon. Jamar K. Walker . (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
38 38 motion Appear Wed 04/17 2:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone and Supporting Brief by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 04/17 4:13 PM
MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard.38 MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone and Supporting Brief (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
37 37 order Settlement Conference Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/09 2:40 PM
Settlement Conference Order: The Settlement Conference is on 5/2/2024 at 09:30 AM. The parties must submit a brief memorandum of five pages or less directly to the chambers of the undersigned (do not file in the clerk's office) by NOON on Thursday, April 25, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 4/9/2024. (afar)
Related: [-]
36 36 respoth Brief in Support Tue 04/09 11:52 AM
Brief in Support to35 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Amend/Correct Tue 04/09 11:50 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
34 34 7 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Tue 11/07 2:04 PM
Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2024 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. Bench Trial set for 5/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 11/7/23. (ptom, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference-Rule16b Tue 11/07 11:49 AM
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 11/7/2023. (ptom, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
33 33 order Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order Fri 10/20 10:43 AM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2023 at 9:00 a.m. in Norfolk Remote. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 10/19/23. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/17 11:07 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Certify Questions to the Supreme Court of Virginia filed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/17 11:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
30 30 respoth Brief in Support Tue 10/10 4:45 PM
Brief in Support to23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Cassidy Greenberg, Kevin Greenberg.(Dunn, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Monday, October 09, 2023
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/09 4:27 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/04 4:19 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cassidy Greenberg, Kevin Greenberg.(Dunn, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
27 27 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Wed 10/04 3:04 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC.(Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
26 26 respoth Brief in Support Wed 10/04 3:01 PM
Brief in Support to25 MOTION to Certify Questions to the Supreme Court of Virginia filed by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC.(Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Wed 10/04 2:59 PM
MOTION to Certify Questions to the Supreme Court of Virginia by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC. (Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
24 24 respoth Brief in Support Wed 10/04 2:06 PM
Brief in Support to23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC.(Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Errata 3
23 23 motion Stay Wed 10/04 2:04 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC. (Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
22 22 respoth Brief in Support Wed 09/20 7:46 AM
Brief in Support Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 09/20 7:42 AM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/13 3:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC.(Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
misc Refer for 16 b Wed 09/13 4:30 PM
Refer for 16(b) (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
misc Notice of Correction Thu 08/17 10:36 AM
Notice of Correction re19 Answer to Complaint: The document is not signed. Please contact the Clerk's Office to correct this matter. Also, please refer to the CM/ECF Manual regarding electronic signatures. (afar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/16 2:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Cassidy Greenberg, Kevin Greenberg.(Dunn, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/15 4:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment filed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company.(dbra, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 08/15 4:26 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that the Answer filed by Defendants Cassidy Greenberg and Kevin Greenberg on August 11, 2023 shall be deemed a timely filed answer to the Amended Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any defendants who have not yet responded to the Amended Complaint shall do so within 30 days. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 8/15/2023. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/11 3:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Cassidy Greenberg, Kevin Greenberg.(Dunn, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/08 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Christopher Dunn on behalf of Cassidy Greenberg, Kevin Greenberg (Dunn, William)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Tue 08/08 7:27 AM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company.(Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exh. 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exh. 2,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, June 29, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 06/29 1:24 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC and Forrest Caulder shall have until August 18, 2023 to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 6/29/2023. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/28 10:17 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC.(Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 06/28 10:14 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC. (Martingayle, Kevin)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 06/28 2:20 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Leonard.12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (afar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
10 10 service Certificate of Service Tue 06/20 6:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC served on 6/14/23. (Manuel, Elisabeth) Modified docket text on 6/20/2023 (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/19 12:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Greenberg, Cassidy Greenberg. Kevin Greenberg waiver sent on 6/19/2023, answer due 8/18/2023; Cassidy Greenberg waiver sent on 6/19/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. (Page, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/15 1:50 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 06/05 11:42 AM
Four (4) Summonses Issued as to Forrest Caulder, Forrest's Home Inspections, LLC, Cassidy Greenberg, Kevin Greenberg, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Mon 06/05 10:37 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Mon 06/05 10:36 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Mon 06/05 10:35 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Mon 06/05 10:34 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 06/05 10:25 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Citizenship Disclosure Form Mon 06/05 10:25 AM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company. (Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/05 10:18 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8966056.), filed by Republic-Vanguard Insurance Company.(Manuel, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Underlying Complaint (2),
Att: 4 Exhibit Policy
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 06/05 11:13 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
Related: [-]