California Southern District Court
Judge:Dana M Sabraw
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:23-cv-01037
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1453 Class Action Fairness Act
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court Of County Of San Diego, 37-02023-00016985-CU-OE-CTL
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 3:31 AM PST
Defendant
Amentum Services, Inc.
Represented By
William Llamas
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Lara A Prodanovich Besser
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Guillermo A. Escobedo
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Plaintiff
Marco Lafon
Represented By
Marcus Bradley
Bradley Grombacher LLP
contact info
Lirit A. King
Bradley/grombacher LLP
contact info
Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Bradley/grombacher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/05 3:11 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/5/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/05 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marco Lafon (Bradley, Marcus) (bdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 10/16 8:28 AM
ORDER granting4 Defendant Amentum Services, Inc's Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/13/2023. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
5 5 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/09 4:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Stay re1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Amentum Services, Inc.. (Llamas, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Motions Submitted Tue 10/10 8:31 AM
ORDER vacating oral argument. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/06/2023.(jpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
4 4 motion Stay Fri 08/18 3:20 PM
MOTION to Stay re1 Notice of Removal,, by Amentum Services, Inc..(Llamas, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO of Defendant's Motion to Stay,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Declaration of William A. Llamas ISO of Defendant's Motion to Stay,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Request for Judicial Notice ISO of Defendant's Motion to Stay
Friday, June 02, 2023
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/05 10:31 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amentum Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amentum Government Services Holdings Sub LLC for Amentum Services, Inc... (mjw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Mon 06/05 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Amentum Services, Inc.. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mjw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 06/05 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17900905.), filed by Amentum Services, Inc.. The new case number is 3:23-cv-1037-DMS-JLB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Guillermo A. Escobedo,
Att: 3 Declaration of Mark Esposito,
Att: 4 Declaration of Micki Matcham,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 section 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1 section 3,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2-5,
Att: 9 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 10 Proof of Service