Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:23-cv-02152
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2023
Terminated:Aug 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 02, 2023 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
HATBORO YORK ROAD LLC
Defendant
THE VERRICHIA COMPANY, LLC
Defendant
THOMAS F. VERRICHIA
Plaintiff
ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P.
Represented By
Eliese R. Herzl-Betz
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
DANIEL G. SELZNICK
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
SCOTT M. VERNICK
Duane Morris LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
35 35 misc US Marshal Report of Sale Thu 02/27 10:41 AM
US Marshal Sale of Real Property (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/11 3:53 PM
NOTICE by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. re32 Notice (Other) Responding to Notice Filed by Thomas F. Verrichia(SELZNICK, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Wed 02/05 5:08 PM
Letter to Eric Gartner, US Marshal, re: Notice of Misrepresentation in Judgment, dated 1/29/25 by THOMAS F. VERRICHIA(va)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, February 03, 2025
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/04 8:47 AM
NOTICE by THOMAS F. VERRICHIA of Misrepresentation (envelope attached).(er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/30 3:54 PM
NOTICE by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. THAT PROPOSED SCHEDULE OF DISTRIBUTION FOR MARSHAL SALE OF PROPERTY HAS BEEN POSTED (SELZNICK, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 2:19 PM
NOTICE by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. Pursuant to 3219.3(b)(2)(A) that the Marshal's Sale is Postponed to January 8, 2025 at 10:00 AM (SELZNICK, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
29 29 misc Affidavit Mon 09/16 2:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Publication of Notice of Sale of Real Property in Newspaper by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P.. (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Affidavit Mon 09/16 2:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Publication of Notice of Sale of Real Property in Legal Journal by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P.. (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/12 9:15 AM
NOTICE by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. , PURSUANT TO PA.R.C.P. 3129.3(b)(1)(A), THAT THE MARSHAL'S SALE SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 12, 2024 IS POSTPONED TO OCTOBER 16, 2024 AT 10:00 AM (SELZNICK, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
26 26 4 pgs notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/05 4:53 PM
NOTICE by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. of Handbill Notice of Marshal's Sale of Real Estate Pursuant to Rule 3129.2 (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/05 4:47 PM
NOTICE by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. Pursuant to Rule 3129.2 to Interested Parties (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/05 4:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Notice of Marshal's Sale of Real Estate upon Penn Community Bank; Montgomery County Tax Claim Bureau; Wawa Inc. by Regular Mail on 8/12/2024 (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/05 1:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman re: served Notice of Marshal's Sale of Real Estate To Hatboro York Road, LLC; Thomas F. Verrichia; and The Verrichia Company LLC upon Ryane DePaul, Project Manager by Hand Delivery on 8/12/2024(Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Friday, August 09, 2024
22 22 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint) Fri 08/09 10:01 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P.. Amendment to17 Affidavit Pursuant to Rule 3129.1 . (VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
21 21 1 pgs misc US Marshal 285 Form Thu 08/08 4:32 PM
US Marshal 285 Form. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/10 12:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. re: USMS Deputy Clerk served Summons and Complaint upon HATBORO YORK ROAD LLC by Personal Service. HATBORO YORK ROAD LLC served on 7/10/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
19 19 order Writ Issued Thu 06/13 2:22 PM
WRIT OF Execution ISSUED as to Defendant Hatboro York Road LLC. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
18 18 misc Praecipe/Request Wed 06/05 4:04 PM
for Service of Process by U.S. Marshals Service by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P.. (VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Affidavit Wed 06/05 3:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT Pursuant to Rule 3129.1 by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P.. (VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
16 16 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 01/30 9:19 PM
Praecipe for Writ of Execution by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P.. (SELZNICK, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
15 15 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 08/18 12:31 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS THE VERRICHIA COMPANY, LLC, THOMAS F. VERRICHIA AND HATBORO YORK ROAD, LLC, JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY, IN THE AMOUNT OF $701,487.27. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/17/23. 8/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
14 14 misc Request for Default Judgment Thu 08/10 12:57 PM
Request for Default Judgment ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. against All Defendants.(VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 10, 2023
13 13 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 07/10 11:09 AM
DEFAULT BY HATBORO YORK ROAD LLC, THE VERRICHIA COMPANY, LLC, THOMAS F. VERRICHIA FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (va)
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Mon 07/10 11:09 AM
Default Entered (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
12 12 misc Request for Default Fri 07/07 4:46 PM
Request for Default ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. against All Defendants.(SELZNICK, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Fri 07/07 11:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas J. Crean, Jr., re: served Summons, Designation Form, Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Lis Pendens with Exhibits upon Thomas F. Verrichia by Personal on 6/15/2023 (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Fri 07/07 11:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas J. Crean, Jr., re: served Summons, Designation Form, Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Lis Pendens with Exhibits upon The Verrichia Company, LLC by Personal on 6/15/2023 (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Fri 07/07 11:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas J. Crean, Jr., re: served Summons, Designation Form, Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Lis Pendens with Exhibits upon Hatboro York Road LLC by Personal on 6/15/2023 (Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/07 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eliese R. Herzl-Betz on behalf of ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. with Certificate of Service(Herzl-Betz, Eliese)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/07 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL G. SELZNICK on behalf of ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. with Certificate of Service(SELZNICK, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 06/06 7:59 PM
Summons Issued as to HATBORO YORK ROAD LLC, THE VERRICHIA COMPANY, LLC, THOMAS F. VERRICHIA. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 6/6/23 (va)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/06 1:55 PM
NOTICE by ARCTRUST INVESTMENTS, L.P. re1 Complaint (Attorney), Amended Designation Form (VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 06/06 11:14 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions needs to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
4 4 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint) Mon 06/05 6:22 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by ARCTRUST Investments, LP. Amendment to3 Notice of Lis Pendens .(VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Montgomery Pa Parcel 02356,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Montgomery Pa Parcel 06727,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Montgomery Pa Parcel 06724
3 3 notice Notice of Lis Pendens Mon 06/05 6:07 PM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by ARCTRUST Investments, LP(VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement Mon 06/05 5:47 PM
Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1 by ARCTRUST Investments, LP. (VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 06/05 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Hatboro York Road LLC, The Verrichia Company, LLC, Thomas F. Verrichia ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16734830.), filed by ARCTRUST Investments, LP.(VERNICK, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - PPA,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - First Amendment to PPA,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Second Amendment to PPA,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Letter Amendment to PPA