District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ana C Reyes
Case #: 1:23-cv-01616
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2023
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2023 6:30 AM EST
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
Christina O'Tousa
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
CONSULAR OFFICERS
Represented By
Christina O'Tousa
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By
Christina O'Tousa
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
Christina O'Tousa
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By
Christina O'Tousa
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
DANIELA ZADROZNY
Represented By
Christina O'Tousa
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
AMIRREZA ANSARI DOGAHEH
Represented By
David Elliott Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
MIR HESAM ADDIN MORTAZAVI
Represented By
David Elliott Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
AYDIN RAHMANISEIFI
Represented By
David Elliott Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
FARIBA SOLTANZADEH
Represented By
David Elliott Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
PEZHMAN TOURTIZ
Represented By
David Elliott Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/25 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
17 17 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 11/02 11:07 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANTONY BLINKEN, CONSULAR OFFICERS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DANIELA ZADROZNY. (O'Tousa, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
16 16 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 10/23 2:33 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 Motion to Dismiss, filed by AMIRREZA ANSARI DOGAHEH, MIR HESAM ADDIN MORTAZAVI.(Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Table,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
15 15 motion Dismiss Tue 10/03 6:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ANTONY BLINKEN, CONSULAR OFFICERS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DANIELA ZADROZNY.(O'Tousa, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
14 14 misc Status Report Wed 09/27 9:38 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by ANTONY BLINKEN, CONSULAR OFFICERS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DANIELA ZADROZNY.(O'Tousa, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Carson Wu,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, September 12, 2023, Hearing Transcript
Thursday, September 14, 2023
13 13 misc Transcript Thu 09/14 9:18 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE before Judge Ana C. Reyes held on September 12, 2023; Page Numbers: 1-27. Date of Issuance: September 14, 2023. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/5/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2023.(zlfe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
minutes Pre-motion Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/12 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ana C. Reyes: Pre-motion Conference held on 9/12/2023. Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2023. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards) (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/06 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pre-motion Conference set for 9/12/2023 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
order Order on Motion for Hearing Mon 08/21 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants'11 Motion for a Pre-Motion Conference is hereby GRANTED. The parties are directed to reach out to Judge Reyes' Courtroom Deputy, Chashawn White (Chashawn_White@dcd.uscourts.gov), to set a pre-motion conference date. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 8/21/2023. (lcsj)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
12 12 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Mon 08/14 7:02 PM
RESPONSE to Defendants' Request for Pre-Motion Conference filed by AMIRREZA ANSARI DOGAHEH, MIR HESAM ADDIN MORTAZAVI, AYDIN RAHMANISEIFI, FARIBA SOLTANZADEH, PEZHMAN TOURTIZ. (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/07 7:41 PM
NOTICE Regarding Request for Pre-Motion Conference by ANTONY BLINKEN, CONSULAR OFFICERS, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DANIELA ZADROZNY re1 Complaint,(O'Tousa, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/07 7:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina O'Tousa on behalf of All Defendants (O'Tousa, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Tue 06/27 10:58 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2023. (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 06/27 10:57 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DANIELA ZADROZNY served on 6/13/2023 (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 06/27 10:56 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/13/2023. (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 06/27 10:56 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 6/13/2023 (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 06/27 10:55 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/12/2023 (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 06/27 10:54 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 6/12/2023 (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 06/27 10:53 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/13/2023 (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 06/06 12:21 PM
SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY BLINKEN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DANIELA ZADROZNY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/06 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10118240) filed by AMIRREZA ANSARI DOGAHEH, FARIBA SOLTANZADEH, MIR HESAM ADDIN MORTAZAVI, PEZHMAN TOURTIZ, AYDIN RAHMANISEIFI.(Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-23,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/06 12:10 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zljn)
Related: [-]