Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00367
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause18 USC 1595 Human Trafficking Litigation
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2023 6:49 AM EST
Defendant
Diamond Hotel, LLC
Represented By
Raymond James Sinnott, IV
Sinnott, Nuckols & Logan, P.C.
contact info
Gary Christopher Jones, Jr.
Sinnott Nuckols & Logan PC
contact info
Plaintiff
K A.
Represented By
Randolph Janis
Douglas & London Pc (ny-Na)
contact info
Jason Fernandez
Greenberg & Bederman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/20 4:42 PM
FINAL ORDER; the Court acknowledges the voluntary dismissal and DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 2/20/24. (wtuc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/19 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by K A. (Fernandez, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 02/08 8:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight: Settlement Conference held on 2/7/2024. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/13 12:42 PM
STIPULATION ORDER REGARDING STATUE OF LIMITATIONS The parties, by their respective counsel, stipulate the Plaintiff may only prosecute her 18 U.S.C. 1595(a) claims for time period beginning Jaun 6, 2023 and thereafter and that any claim for the time period prior to June 6, 2013, is barred by the statute of limitations. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 11/13/2023. (Kat)
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs order Order Mon 11/13 11:36 AM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on February 7, 2024, at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 11/13/2023. (Kat)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/13 2:15 PM
Settlement Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. (mful)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation Wed 11/08 2:10 PM
STIPULATION Statute of Limitations by Diamond Hotel, LLC. (Sinnott, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/30 8:44 AM
Case REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight for settlement. (Kat, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
13 13 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/27 1:05 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set to begin 5/8/2024 at 9:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney Jr. [see Order for details] (signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 10/26/2023) (rpiz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 10/26 11:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/26/2023. (wtuc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/28 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Counsel shall report to Courtroom 6000. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/26/23. (wtuc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Tue 09/19 4:23 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Randolph Janis to appear Pro hac vice for K A. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 9/19/2023. (Kat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/12 10:08 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Randolph Janis and Certification of Local Counsel Jason Fernandez Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9119708. by K A.. (Fernandez, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/05 2:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Diamond Hotel, LLC.(Sinnott, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/31 2:57 PM
ORDER Upon due consideration, The Court GRANTS the consent motion for an extension of time6 and EXTENDS the deadline to September 5, 2023, for Diamond Hotel to file pleadings in response to the complaint. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 8/31/2023. (Kat)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/31 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Christopher Jones, Jr on behalf of Diamond Hotel, LLC (Jones, Gary)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/31 11:07 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Diamond Hotel, LLC.(Sinnott, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Endorsed Order
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 08/31 10:58 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Diamond Hotel, LLC. (Sinnott, Raymond)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/31 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond James Sinnott, IV on behalf of Diamond Hotel, LLC (Sinnott, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 06/07 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Diamond Hotel, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted . (sbea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 06/06 11:53 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by K A.. (Fernandez, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/06 11:47 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8968445.), filed by K A..(Fernandez, Jason) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/6/2023) (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 06/06 12:18 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]