Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-10791

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 1:14-bk-10821
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Nov 21, 2014
Terminated:Feb 14, 2020

Debtor
GNP EAST, INC.
1 Cate St Ste 100
Portsmouth, NH 03801-7107
Represented By
Tanya Sambatakos, Esq.
Molleur Law Office
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
P. J. Perrino, Jr.
P.O. Box 49
Augusta, ME 04332
Represented By
Fred W. Bopp III,, Esq.
Perkins Thompson, P.A.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
537 Congress Street, Suite 300
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
Jennifer H. Pincus, Esq.
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Stephen G. Morrell, Esq.
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Bankruptcy judge to consider motions to auction off East Millinocket paper mill (bangordailynews.com)
Submitted Mon 11/10/2014
2. Owner of East Millinocket mill, land files for bankruptcy (pressherald.com)
Submitted Tue 10/21/2014
Docket last updated: 03/08/2017 12:44 PM EST
Friday, October 17, 2014
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by GNP EAST, INC.. Section 316 Incomplete Filing Date 12/1/2014. Atty Disclosure Statement due 10/31/2014. Employee Income Record Due: 10/31/2014. Schedule A due 10/31/2014. Schedule B due 10/31/2014. Schedule D due 10/31/2014. Schedule E due 10/31/2014. Schedule F due 10/31/2014. Schedule G due 10/31/2014. Schedule H due 10/31/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/31/2014. Summary of schedules due 10/31/2014. Incomplete Filings due by 10/31/2014. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Resolution Filed by GNP EAST, INC.. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]