California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:23-cv-04423
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2023
Terminated:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2023 3:30 AM PST
Defendant
Staffmark Investment, LLC
Represented By
Susan M Steward
Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud And Romo
contact info
Joshua Nathaniel Lange
Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud And Romo
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Enciso
Represented By
William Marshall Hogg
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/15 12:45 PM
Notice of Filing Written Consent filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso.(Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/09 12:08 PM
Notice of Filing Written Consent filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso.(Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 01, 2024
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/01 3:08 PM
Notice of Consent Susan Enciso.(Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
33 33 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 11/28 6:40 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 09/25/2023, 8:52 a.m. re Transcript32 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dpa)
Related: [-]
32 32 transcript -Transcript Tue 11/28 6:39 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 09/25/2023, 8:52 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/19/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2024. (dpa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
31 31 transcript -Transcript Order Form (G-120) Wed 09/27 1:05 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Geronimo Gonzalez at geronimo.gonzalez@aalrr.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lange, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
30 30 order Compel Arbitration Certify Wed 09/27 12:21 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting19 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Denying20 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification. The Court further STAYS the action pending the completion of arbitration. Case Terminated, MD JS-6. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
29 29 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 09/27 10:56 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) and Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court hears arguments. MOTION to Compel Arbitration19 and MOTION to Certify Conditionally Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)20 are taken under submission. The Court's order to issue. Appearances: For Plaintiff- William Marshall Hogg; For Defendant- Joshua Nathaniel Lange. Courtroom Deputy Clerk: Karlen Dubon; Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. Time in Court: 0:18 Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/30 3:34 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Due to scheduling conflicts, the Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the hearing for MOTION to Compel Arbitration17 , MOTION to Certify Conditionally Certify Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)20 , MOTION to Compel Arbitration19 , and the Scheduling Conference from September 11, 2023 to September 25, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
27 27 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 08/28 3:16 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Conditionally Certify Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)20 filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso.(Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Carl Fitz
26 26 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 08/28 11:12 AM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration19 filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC.(Lange, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of William Hogg in support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Suzanne Perry in support of Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration
Monday, August 21, 2023
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/21 3:55 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration19 filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso.(Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Susan Enciso,
Att: 2 Declaration of W.Hogg,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - IP Address Search,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Trace My IP,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Equifax Identity Verification
24 24 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 08/21 3:07 PM
Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Conditionally Certify Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)20 filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC.(Steward, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Suzanne Perry,
Att: 2 Declaration of Joshua Lange,
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 to Request for Judicial Notice
Monday, August 07, 2023
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 08/07 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 9/11/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
22 22 respm Exhibit to Motion Fri 08/04 8:25 AM
EXHIBIT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Conditionally Certify Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)20 L.R. 11-6.2 Certificate of Compliance filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
21 21 misc Status Report Tue 08/01 7:25 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
20 20 motion Certify Mon 07/31 6:30 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Conditionally Certify Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Susan Enciso,
Att: 2 Declaration of Heather Bice,
Att: 3 Declaration of Benjamin Keppers,
Att: 4 Declaration of William Hogg,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice Packet,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Compel Arbitration Mon 07/31 8:50 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Lange, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Emily Giltner iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Emily Giltner iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Emily Giltner iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 4 Declaration of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 7 Exhibit E to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 8 Exhibit F to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 9 Declaration of Emma Davis iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 10 Declaration of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 11 Exhibit G to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 12 Exhibit H to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 13 Exhibit I to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 14 Exhibit J to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 15 Exhibit K to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 16 Exhibit L to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 17 Exhibit M to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 18 Exhibit N to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 19 Exhibit O to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 20 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 21 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 22 Certificate of Service,
Att: 23 Proposed Order
Friday, July 21, 2023
18 18 notice Withdrawal (Document or Motion) Fri 07/21 2:38 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration,,,,,17 filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC. (Steward, Susan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Compel Arbitration Fri 07/21 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Lange, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit C to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 3 Exhibit D to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 4 Exhibit E to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 5 Exhibit F to Decl. of Suzanne Perry iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 6 Declaration of Emily Giltner iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 7 Exhibit A to Decl. of Emily Giltner iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 8 Exhibit B to Decl. of Emily Giltner iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 9 Declaration of Emma Davis iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 10 Declaration of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 11 Exhibit G to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 12 Exhibit H to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 13 Exhibit I to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 14 Exhibit J to Decl. of Susan Steward iso Motion to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 15 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 16 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 17 Proposed Order,
Att: 18 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 06/27 9:02 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/27 8:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC.(Lange, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/16 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC, (Steward, Susan)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/16 4:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC identifying RGF Staffing USA Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Steward, Susan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 06/16 3:31 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan M Steward counsel for Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC. Adding Susan M. Steward as counsel of record for Staffmark Investment LLC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC. (Attorney Susan M Steward added to party Staffmark Investment, LLC(pty:dft))(Steward, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 06/13 1:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso, upon Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC served on 6/9/2023, answer due 6/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisey Montenegro - authorized agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/13 8:32 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
9 9 order Transferring Case purs GO 23-05 (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 06/09 9:08 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 23-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:21-cv-00664 DOC(DFMx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-04423 DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/07 4:31 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Staffmark Investment, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 06/07 4:27 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 06/07 4:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 06/07 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 06/06 1:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 06/06 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso, identifying N/A. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 06/06 12:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/06 12:04 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff Susan Enciso. (Attorney William Marshall Hogg added to party Susan Enciso(pty:pla))(Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Consent Form
attorney Pay Filing Fee Tue 06/06 12:15 PM
FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-35441541 for $402 filing fee. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]