California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-04425
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2023
Terminated:Sep 12, 2023
Case in other court:Ventura County Superior Court, 56-02022-00573053
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2023 3:30 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United States
Represented By
Soo-Young Shin
Ausa - Us Attorneys Offce
contact info
John Christopher Korevec
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Lea
PO Box 35
Oak View, CA 93022
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jazmin Martinez
Terminated: 06/15/2023
Represented By
John Christopher Korevec
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
34 34 order Dismiss Case Wed 09/13 12:01 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT/S MOTION TO DISMISS FAC25 . The Court DISMISSES with prejudice the action in its entirety. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 09/07 2:51 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Soo-Young Shin counsel for Defendant United States. Adding Soo-Young Shin as counsel of record for United States for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States. (Attorney Soo-Young Shin added to party United States(pty:dft))(Shin, Soo-Young)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
31 31 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 09/06 1:25 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendant United States' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint25 , calendared for hearing on 9/11/2023, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 09/05 4:33 PM
ORDER28 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pursuant to the Stipulation filed by the parties, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby continues the Scheduling Conference (ECF No. 23) to September 25, 2023, AT 9:00 a.m. (rolm)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Lodging Tue 09/05 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Continue28(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 stip Continue Tue 09/05 10:54 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 9/18/2023 to 9/25/2023 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only23 filed by defendant United States.(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
32 32 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 09/06 4:48 PM
JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Susan Lea. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
27 27 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 08/28 4:40 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint), Memorandum of Points and Authorities 25 filed by Defendant United States. (Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
26 26 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 08/22 5:20 PM
OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 25 ; Memo of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Susan Lea. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
25 25 motion Dismiss Case Wed 08/16 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint), Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by defendant United States. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
24 24 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form Tue 08/15 2:29 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner reMOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint)22 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Memorandum contains single spaced text in violation of L.R. 11-3.6. Counsel may refile a corrected motion within 2 days of this order. (jre)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 08/15 12:22 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/11/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
22 22 motion Dismiss Case Mon 08/14 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (First Amended Complaint), Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by defendant United States. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 31, 2023
21 21 othcmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/01 4:43 PM
FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Defendants United States, Does 1 through 20 amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by plaintiff Susan Lea. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
20 20 order Dismiss Case Remand Case to State Court Fri 07/21 11:06 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [DE13 ] andDefendant's Motion to Dismiss [DE9 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiffs Complaint in its entirety. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, and GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiffs Complaint in its entirety. Plaintiff shall have two (2) weeks from the issuance of this Order to file any amended complaint. Further, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2023, at 9:00 AM., is vacated and will be reset as necessary. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 07/12 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiffs Motion to Remand13 and Defendants Motion to Dismiss9 , both calendared for hearing on 7/17/2023, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
18 18 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 07/05 4:12 PM
JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by plaintiff Susan Lea. (jp). Modified on 7/5/2023 (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
17 17 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 07/03 4:30 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , Memorandum of Points and Authorities 9 filed by Defendant United States. (Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
16 16 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 06/29 12:07 PM
OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 9 filed by Plaintiff Susan Lea. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
15 15 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/26 3:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to13 filed by Defendant United States.(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Remand
Friday, June 16, 2023
14 14 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 06/16 11:02 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant United States, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 served on 6/16/2023.(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order Regarding Newly Assigned Cases,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, June 15, 2023
13 13 motion Remand Case to State Court Thu 06/15 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand this Matter to State Court; Memo of Points and Authorities filed by plaintiff Susan Lea. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 order Correcting Caption Thu 06/15 12:21 PM
ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION6 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the Caption shall be changed to read as follows: Susan Lea, Plaintiff, v. United States, and Does 1 through 20, Defendants. (jp)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 06/15 11:07 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/17/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 06/14 2:34 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss Case Tue 06/13 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by defendant Jazmin Martinez. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kimberly A. Herbst,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 06/13 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Jazmin Martinez, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 6/13/2023.(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Monday, June 12, 2023
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 06/12 10:47 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Jazmin Martinez, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form3 served on 6/12/2023.(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, June 08, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/08 2:31 PM
Notice of Substitution filed by defendant Jazmin Martinez.(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Scope of Federal Employment,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Correcting Caption,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 06/08 11:11 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 06/08 11:11 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 06/08 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 06/06 12:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jazmin Martinez. (Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/06 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2022 00573053-CL-IC-VTA No Fee Required - US Government, filed by defendant Jazmin Martinez. (Attorney John Christopher Korevec added to party Jazmin Martinez(pty:dft))(Korevec, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Scope of Federal Employment,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 06/08 11:13 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 20, Jazmin Martinez, filed by Plaintiff Susan Lea. Filed in State Court on 12/15/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]