New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:23-cv-04163
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2023 6:31 AM EST
Defendant
Target Corporation
Represented By
Michael J. Crowley
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
Erin Nicole Pietkewicz
Connell Foley, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Georgia Morrissey
Leav & Steinberg, L.L.P. 75 Broad Street Suite 1601
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Ricardo Juan Martinez
Leav & Steinberg
contact info
Regina Koyfman
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 misc Status Report Wed 04/30 2:16 PM
STATUS REPORT by Georgia Morrissey (Koyfman, Regina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Fri 04/11 9:58 AM
ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter at ECF No.24 , informing the Court of the parties' intention to participate in a private mediation. Within 3 days of the completion of this mediation, the parties should file a joint letter as to its outcome. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/11/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 04/04 5:01 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery nunc pro tunc . Discovery closes 4/30/2025; the parties must file a letter certifying that discovery is complete on that same day. Dispositive motion practice must be commenced on or before 5/30/2025 in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/4/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
24 24 misc Status Report Letter Mon 03/31 7:55 PM
STATUS REPORT by Georgia Morrissey, Letter regarding status of discovery by Georgia Morrissey (Koyfman, Regina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/27 5:48 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Georgia Morrissey. (Koyfman, Regina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
order Status Report Order Tue 02/11 4:32 PM
ORDER. A status letter must be filed with the Court by 3/27/2025 certifying discovery as complete. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/11/2025. (SH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Mon 02/10 8:51 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all pretrial proceedings. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. So Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/7/2025. (KD) Modified on 2/10/2025 (EM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
order Order(Other) Fri 02/07 5:48 PM
ORDER: The Clerk's of office is directed to assign a Magistrate Judge to this case to handle all pre-trial matters. So Ordered by Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/7/2025. (EM)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/07 5:54 PM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time to complete discovery22 is granted. The deadline to complete all discovery is extended to 3/27/2025 and the final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is extended to 4/28/2025 . So Ordered by Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/7/2025. (MPG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/06 4:41 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Georgia Morrissey. (Koyfman, Regina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
order Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/03 12:14 PM
ORDER: Following the close of discovery on 2/10/2025 , the final date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is 3/12/2025 . So Ordered by Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/3/2025. (MPG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 3:15 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/15 11:48 AM
ORDER: The joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery21 is granted. The deadline to complete all discovery is extended to 2/10/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/15/2024. (MPG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/11 3:38 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery On Consent by Target Corporation. (Pietkewicz, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
20 20 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 07/16 9:27 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Eric R. Komitee no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (ENE)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Tue 07/16 9:26 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 06/28 11:37 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Target Corporation. (Pietkewicz, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
18 18 order Order(Other) Fri 06/21 12:13 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' indication that they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction17 , they are directed to execute the attached consent form, consenting to Judge Bulsara's jurisdiction for all purposes. The parties must file the form on the docket no later than 6/28/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/21/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Tue 06/18 12:13 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Target Corporation (Pietkewicz, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
minutes Status Conference Tue 06/04 5:52 PM
MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER: A status conference was held on 6/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Counsel for Plaintiff Related [+] and counsel for Defendant (Erin Nicole Pietkewicz) were present. As stated on the record, the deadline to complete all discovery is 10/11/2024 ; and the last date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice remains 11/12/2024 . The parties shall follow the Individual Practices of Judge Bulsara if they consent to his jurisdiction, or Judge Komitee if they do not. The parties shall file a joint letter by 6/18/2024 on whether they would consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. If all parties do not consent, they should not indicate which party did not consent. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/4/2024. (FTR Log: 2:13 P.M. - 2:23 P.M.) (AL)
Related: [-] gina Koyfman
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Koyfman on behalf of Georgia Morrissey (aty to be noticed) (Koyfman, Regina)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Scheduling Order Mon 05/13 1:11 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the status conference originally scheduled for 5/16/2024 will now be held on 6/4/2024 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/13/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 01/16 3:09 PM
ORDER: The parties' joint motion to approve their proposed protective order14 is so ordered. To the extent that any portion of the stipulation is inconsistent with this Court's procedures for sealing documents or the standards governing the ability of this Court to permit the sealing of documents, the Court's practices and standards shall be followed by the parties and will govern any dispute. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 1/16/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
14 14 motion Protective Order Thu 01/11 4:44 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Target Corporation. (Pietkewicz, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/12 4:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: A telephonic-initial conference was held on 12/12/2023. Plaintiff's counsel (Ricardo Martinez) and Defendant's counsel (Erin Pietkewicz) were present. As discussed on the record, the Court adopts the Phase II (two) deadlines in the parties' proposed Rule 26(f) report (unless otherwise indicated on the record), and those deadlines include: Time to amend the pleadings or add additional claims shall be completed by 1/30/2024 ; completion of all fact discovery by 6/17/2024 ; completion of experts discovery by 10/11/2024 ; the last date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice will be 11/12/2024 . An in person status conference will take place on 5/15/2024 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/12/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/12/2023. (AT&T Log #2:05-2:12.) (EM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
order Scheduling Order Thu 12/07 11:57 AM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on 12/12/2023 at 2:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274 . The access code is 6534420 . The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/7/2023. (EM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 10/25 6:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 11/2/2023 is hereby adjourned sine die , pending reassignment of this case to a different magistrate judge. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/25/2023. (AL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 10/13 3:38 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Pietkewicz, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/11 10:18 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 12:00 P.M. on 11/02/2023 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274 . The access code is 6534420 . The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 10/31/2023 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/11/2023. (EM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
11 11 motion Hearing Wed 08/09 3:23 PM
Letter MOTION for Hearing re: Schedule an Initial Pre-Trial Conference by Target Corporation. (Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/28 12:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Morrissey (Martinez, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Wed 06/28 12:04 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff failed to file their Rule 7.1 disclosure statement by 6/21/2023 as reflected in the Court's order dated 6/7/2023. The newly amended Rule 7.1, which became effective on December 1, 2022, provides: "In an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a), a party or intervenor must...file a disclosure statement." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). "The statement must name--and identify the citizenship of--every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor: when the action is filed in or removed to federal court[.]" Id. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to review the newly amended Rule 7.1, and file a compliant statement by 7/5/2023 . Failure to file the required disclosure statement may lead to sanctions, including dismissal of the action, entry of default, or other appropriate remedies. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/28/2023. (MD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/09 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo Juan Martinez on behalf of Georgia Morrissey (aty to be noticed) (Martinez, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/07 3:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation (Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/07 12:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Statement and Jury Demand served on Leav & Steinberg, LLP on June 6, 2023, filed by Target Corporation. (Pietkewicz, Erin)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/07 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Pietkewicz on behalf of Target Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Pietkewicz, Erin)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Wed 06/07 2:11 PM
ORDER: The parties are reminded to file the required Rule 7.1 disclosure statement, because in this case, the alleged subject matter jurisdiction is based upon diversity of citizenship. The newly amended Rule 7.1, which became effective on December 1, 2022, provides: "In an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a), a party or intervenor must...file a disclosure statement." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). "The statement must name--and identify the citizenship of--every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor: when the action is filed in or removed to federal court[.]" Id. Defendant's Rule 7.1 Statement2 fails to comply with the newly amended Rule 7.1. Specifically, it only includes information about corporate relationships, and nothing about diversity of citizenship, which is what the newly amended Rule requires. Counsel for both sides are directed to review the Rule and file compliant statements by 6/21/2023 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/7/2023. (MD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 06/06 4:49 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 06/06 4:48 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Jury Demand Tue 06/06 3:47 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation (Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/06 3:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation (Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 06/06 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Supreme Court/Kings County, case number 504227/2023. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16769218) (Crowley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A - Summons & Verified Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Target's Verified Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Verified Bill of Particulars,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/06 4:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Tue 06/06 4:48 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SR)
Related: [-]