Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:23-cv-00580
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:7413(b) Clean Air Act
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 04, 2023 3:37 AM EST
defendant
James Baker
Represented By
Joel C. Bryant
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Sarah Reasoner
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
defendant
Graphic Packaging Holding Co.
Represented By
Charles M. Denton
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Scott Michael Watson
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Mark P. Miller
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (chicago)
contact info
Anthony C. Sallah
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Graphic Packaging International
Represented By
Charles M. Denton
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Scott Michael Watson
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Mark P. Miller
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (chicago)
contact info
Anthony C. Sallah
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Bobby Hopewell
Represented By
Stephen J. Hessen
Kreis Enderle Hudgins & Borsos Pc (kalamazoo)
contact info
Rebecca M. Smith
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
defendant
Andrea Keatley
Represented By
Laura Rose LaMore
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
Rebecca M. Smith
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
defendant
Aaron Keatly
Represented By
Laura Rose LaMore
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
Rebecca M. Smith
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
defendant
Paul W. McCann
Represented By
Charles M. Denton
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Scott Michael Watson
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Mark P. Miller
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (chicago)
contact info
Anthony C. Sallah
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Michigan, State of
Represented By
Laura Rose LaMore
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
Rebecca M. Smith
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
defendant
Jack Urban
Represented By
Joel C. Bryant
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Sarah Reasoner
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Redding Cofer Cates
U.S Department Of Justice
contact info
Nicole Mazzocco
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Tom Olstad
Represented By
Charles M. Denton
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Scott Michael Watson
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Mark P. Miller
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (chicago)
contact info
Anthony C. Sallah
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Sean McCann
Represented By
Laura Rose LaMore
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
Rebecca M. Smith
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
defendant
Jim Ritsema
Represented By
Joel C. Bryant
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Sarah Reasoner
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
defendant
Kalamazoo, City of
Represented By
Joel C. Bryant
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Sarah Reasoner
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
defendant
Marta Fuoco
Represented By
Redding Cofer Cates
U.S Department Of Justice
contact info
Brian J. Boyd
U.S. Department Of Justice (civil Division)
contact info
Nicole Mazzocco
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Debra Shore
Represented By
Redding Cofer Cates
U.S Department Of Justice
contact info
Nicole Mazzocco
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Michael Compher
Represented By
Redding Cofer Cates
U.S Department Of Justice
contact info
Nicole Mazzocco
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
David Anderson
Represented By
Joel C. Bryant
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
Sarah Reasoner
Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone Plc (ann Arbor)
contact info
defendant
Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By
Laura Rose LaMore
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
Rebecca M. Smith
Mi Dept Attorney General (enra-Lansing)
contact info
plaintiff
Reginald T. Doss
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Deborah Fields
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Nicole Fields
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Andrietta Gaston
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Dori Word
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Timothy D. Johnson
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Benjamin Winfield
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Tyrell L. Lagrone
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Paul J. Lambert
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Mikel Lucas
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Shannika Lucas
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Alisa Watkins
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Durlahn Rolstone, Sr.
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Della Nichols
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Natalie Norris
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Barbara Iris Potter
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Ajani Rodgers
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Devauhntre Bates
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Barbara Cummings
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
James Cummings
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Tyler Dancer
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Erline Fields
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Antaneisha Fox
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Cedric Huntley
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Britney Johnson
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Deandre Jordan
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Devin Parker
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Melba Parker
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Shaprace Stegall
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Deann Winfield
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Jenny Doezcema
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Cheryl Bronson
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Kimberly Bronson
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Joe Byars
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Gloria Clopton
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Mary Collins
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Brandi Crawford
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Thomas W. Crawford
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Mary Dancer
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Michelle Dancer
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Odie Dancer, Jr.
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Odie Dancer, Sr.
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Jasmine Davies
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info
plaintiff
Sam Dixison
Represented By
John Robert Beason, III
The J.R. Beason Firm Pllc.
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2023
(DISREGARD) OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks) Modified text on 8/23/2023 per Chambers. (ns).
GPO Mar 15 2024
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)

Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
151 151 4 pgs appeal USCA Order Tue 04/15 12:21 PM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal146 filed granting stipulation to dismiss case - mediation ; no mandate to issue (ns)
Related: [-]