Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Algenon L Marbley
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:23-cv-01873
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 12:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Gaudio Insurance Group 2, LLC
Plaintiff
Zachary Hopkins
Represented By
Brian T Giles
Giles & Harper, LLC
contact info
Anthony Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/09 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Zachary Hopkins (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 08/09 3:26 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per5 Notice of Dismissal. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
4 4 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/07 4:27 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Paronich as co-counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on June 7, 2023. (jlk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 06/07 4:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Gaudio Insurance Group 2, LLC. (jlk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/07 1:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9456832) of Anthony Paronich by Plaintiff Zachary Hopkins. (Giles, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/07 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gaudio Insurance Group 2, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9456428), filed by Zachary Hopkins. (Giles, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet