Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:23-cv-00677
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2023
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 04, 2023 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Officer J. Benson
Represented By
Rose Regina Daragjati
Paul Daragjati, PLC
contact info
Paul A. Daragjati
Paul Daragjati, PLC
contact info
Mary Margaret Giannini
Office Of General Council, City Of Jacksonville
contact info
Defendant
Officer John Doe 1
Defendant
Officer John Doe 2
Defendant
Officer M.A. Morel-Sepulveda
Represented By
Rose Regina Daragjati
Paul Daragjati, PLC
contact info
Sean Bryan Granat
City Of Jacksonville
contact info
Paul A. Daragjati
Paul Daragjati, PLC
contact info
Mary Margaret Giannini
Office Of General Council, City Of Jacksonville
contact info
Defendant
Sheriff T.K. Waters
Represented By
Sean Bryan Granat
City Of Jacksonville
contact info
Mary Margaret Giannini
Office Of General Council, City Of Jacksonville
contact info
Mediator
Michael I. Coulson
# Coulson Law Firm 320 North First Street Suite 708
Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250
Represented By
Michael Irwin Coulson
The Coulson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Bernardo Santana
Represented By
George Farrell, IV
Phillips & Hunt
contact info
John Michael Phillips
Law Offices Of John M. Phillips, LLC
contact info
Amy Maletzky Hanna
Phillips & Hunt
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Former Sheriff Mike Williams
Terminated: 07/07/2023
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Sean Bryan Granat
City Of Jacksonville
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
57 57 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 10/04 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
56 56 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/03 1:37 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/3/2024. (JW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
55 55 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/02 5:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bernardo Santana. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]