Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jay C Zainey
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:23-cv-01930
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2023
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 04, 2023 2:43 AM CST
Defendant
Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Antonio Jose Torres
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Jason C. MacFetters
Bennett Hodgins Devereaux
contact info
James W. Hailey, III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffery Hatcher
Represented By
David Harmon Hanchey
The Townsley Law Firm
contact info
Hannah E. Mayeaux
Townsley Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/24 2:01 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/23/2025.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 01/22 12:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 1/21/2025. Negotiations were successful and resulted in the settlement of all claims. (rkr) (NEF Section A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
23 23 21 pgs order Order Wed 01/08 9:26 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/19 7:44 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDERED that defendant/insurers, through counsel, immediately determine whether any of their settled Hurricane Ida cases remain on the docket of this Court and immediately file a Notice of Settlement in said case so that it can be dismissed by the District Judge. This process shall be completed in no more than 21 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/18/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order Set Hearings Thu 10/17 9:31 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above matter is hereby SCHEDULED, by telephone, for January 21, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael B. North. Each party shall provide, in confidence, a concise settlement memorandum. This memorandum shall be submitted at least two (2) full business days before the conference. The memorandum shall be emailed directly to: efile-north@laed.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 10/16/2024.(cs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 10/16 9:17 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Erica L Laroux for Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney Carley Ann Faucheux terminated. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/15/2024. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
19 19 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 10/14 11:15 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Erica L. Laroux to be substituted in place of Carley Ann Faucheux by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company.(Hailey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/08 4:57 PM
ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall immediately contact the chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Michael B. North for the purpose of scheduling a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/8/2024.(blg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 10/03 12:48 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jeffery Hatcher, Ocean Harbor Casualty Ins. Co. (Mayeaux, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/19 2:18 PM
ORDER: The parties shall prepare and file a joint status report to the Court, addressing the status of discovery in this matter, and the status of settlement negotiations, if any. The joint status report shall be filed by October 4, 2024, and shall not exceed three (3) double spaced pages in length (including the case caption). Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/18/2024.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 08/06 2:19 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Carley Ann Faucheux for Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney Jason C. MacFetters and Antonio Jose Torres terminated. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 08/06/2024. (meb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
14 14 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 08/05 1:38 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Carley Faucheux to be substituted in place of Antonio J.Torres and Jason C. MacFetters by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company.(Hailey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/18 1:13 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/19 3:49 PM
ORDER NO. 16 DIRECTING PARTIES TO SCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Section 3. E of CMO No. 1. in this matter, the undersigned has been notified that the parties in the cases listed below jointly request a settlement conference with the assigned Magistrate Judge following unsuccessful mediations via the SSP. Accordingly, counsel for the parties in these cases are directed to contact the assigned Magistrate Judge as soon as possible to schedule a settlement conference. These cases will remain subject to the CMO pending that settlement conference and counsel shall notify the undersigned of the result of their settlement conference after it takes place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/19/2024.(cs) (NEF: Magistrate North)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
11 11 30+ pgs order Order Thu 12/14 9:32 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
10 10 misc ADI event Thu 10/05 1:15 PM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 30+ pgs order Order Wed 09/27 2:52 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
8 8 30+ pgs order Order Fri 09/15 11:41 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/30 2:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company.Attorney Antonio Jose Torres added to party Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Torres, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/12 11:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Mayeaux, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/09 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company served on 6/9/2023, answer due 6/30/2023. (Mayeaux, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
4 4 27 pgs order Order Thu 06/08 10:18 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(lb)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/08 10:16 AM
Summons Issued as to Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (lb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 06/07 3:32 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/07 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9972669) filed by Jeffery Hatcher.Attorney Hannah E. Mayeaux added to party Jeffery Hatcher(pty:pla).(Mayeaux, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons