Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Case #: 3:23-cv-01302
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2023
Terminated:Oct 06, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Dec 07, 2023 6:28 AM AST
Defendant
SIMED
Defendant
Dr. Leonardo Torres-Rodriguez
Defendant
Dr. Eduardo Torres-Berrios
Defendant
The Medical Protective Company (Medpro)
Defendant
Spouses XYZ
Defendant
Susan Smith
Defendant
Rose Smith
Defendant
John Smith
Defendant
Joana Smith
Defendant
Triple S Propiedad
Defendant
Dr. Felix Ruiz-Alvarez
Defendant
Dr. Luis Rosario-Vargas
Defendant
Susan Roe
Defendant
Rose Roe
Defendant
Lt. Richard Roe
Defendant
Joana Roe
Defendant
ABC Entities
Defendant
Dr. Emeline Rodriguez-Soto
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Smith-Colon
Defendant
TR Medical Management, LLC
Defendant
Dr. Jose M. Rodriguez-Castro
Defendant
Dr. Luis A. Perez-Abreu
Defendant
Susan Miles
Defendant
John Miles
Defendant
Joanna Miles
Defendant
Metropolitan OB/GYN Group CSP
Defendant
Dr. Luis B. Gonzalez-Ingles
Defendant
Jane Roe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Perez-Miles
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Miles- Atienza
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Doe-Rodriguez
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Alcaraz-Smith
Defendant
Laura Atienza-Reyes
Defendant
XYZ Insurance Companies
Defendant
XYZ Entities
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Febo-Miles
Defendant
Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company
The Corporate Building Center 33 Calle Resolucion Suite 702
San Juan, PR 00920
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Ruiz-Roe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Smith
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Smith
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Morales-Roe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Miles
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Roe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Galan-Doe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Fahme-Miles
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Avila-Doe
Defendant
Dr. Stephanie Colon-Lopez
Defendant
Bayamon Medical Center
Defendant
Dr. Andres Avila-Gonzalez
Defendant
Aspen American Insurance Company
Defendant
Dr. Osvaldo Alcaraz-Diaz
Defendant
Emergency Room Administrative Services, LLC
Defendant
Physicians XYZ
Defendant
Dr. Pedro Morales-Morales
Defendant
Rose Miles
Defendant
Jane Miles
Defendant
Dr. Armando Lopez-Tristani
Defendant
Dr. Ricardo Galan-Vazquez
Defendant
Dr. Pedro Febo-Toledo
Defendant
Dr. Eduardo Fahme-Gonzalez
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Torres-Roe
Defendant
Dorado Health, Inc.
Defendant
Rose Doe
Defendant
Richard Doe
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Joana Doe
Defendant
Jane Doe
Defendant
Continental Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Michael L. Ramirez-Cedeno
Represented By
Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 order Judgment Fri 10/06 5:00 PM
JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/6/2023. (AEM)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Fri 10/06 4:54 PM
ORDER: Noting and granting6 "Motion Requesting Dismissal Without Prejudice." Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/6/2023. (AEM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Attorney Only Tue 10/03 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Michael L. Ramirez-Cedeno (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/07 12:10 PM
ORDER: Granting4 "Motion for Brief Extension of Time to Serve Summons." Plaintiffs shall serve process on all defendants by October 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/7/2023. (AEM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
4 4 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/05 9:37 PM
MOTION for extension of time until October 7, 2023 to serve Summons filed by Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/19/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/09 4:09 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Osvaldo Alcaraz-Diaz, Aspen American Insurance Company, Andres Avila-Gonzalez, Bayamon Medical Center, Stephanie Colon-Lopez, Conjugal Partnership Alacaraz-Smith, Conjugal Partnership Avila-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Smith, Conjugal Partnership Fahme-Miles, Conjugal Partnership Febo-Miles, Conjugal Partnership Galan-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Miles, Conjugal Partnership Morales-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Miles, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Smith, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Smith, Conjugal Partnership Ruiz-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Torres-Roe, Continental Insurance Company, Dorado Health, Inc., Emergency Room Administrative Services, LLC, Eduardo Fahme-Gonzalez, Pedro Febo-Toledo, Ricardo Galan-Vazquez, Luis B Gonzalez-Ingles, Armando Lopez-Tristani, Metropolitan OB/GYN Group CSP d/b/a Metropolitan OB/GYN Group, Pedro Morales-Morales, Luis A Perez-Abreu, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, Jose M Rodriguez-Castro, Emeline Rodriguez-Soto, Luis Rosario-Vargas, Felix Ruiz-Alvarez, SIMED, TR Medical Management, LLC d/b/a TR Medical Management Group, The Medical Protective Company (Medpro), Eduardo Torres-Berrios, Leonardo Torres-Rodriguez, Triple S Propiedad. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 06/09 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (vdm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/08 1:38 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8250912.), filed by Michael L Ramirez-Cedeo. Service due by 9/6/2023,(Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Sheet Category Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Leonardo Torres-Rodriguez,
Att: 4 Summons Conjugal Partnership Torres-Doe,
Att: 5 Summons Eduardo Torres-Berrios,
Att: 6 Summons Conjugal Partnership Torres-Roe,
Att: 7 Summons Luis Rosario Vargas,
Att: 8 Summons Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Smith,
Att: 9 Summons TR Medical Management, LLC,
Att: 10 Summons Metropolitan OB/GYN Group CSP,
Att: 11 Summons Armando Lopez Tristani,
Att: 12 Summons Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Miles,
Att: 13 Summons Ricardo Galan Vazquez,
Att: 14 Summons Conjugal Partnership Galan-Doe,
Att: 15 Summons Pedro Morales Morales,
Att: 16 Summons Conjugal Partnership Morales-Roe,
Att: 17 Summons Pedro Febo Toledo,
Att: 18 Summons Conjugal Partnership Febo-Miles,
Att: 19 Summons Andres Avila Gonzalez,
Att: 20 Summons Conjugal Partnership Avila-Doe,
Att: 21 Summons Emeline Rodriguez Soto,
Att: 22 Summons Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Doe,
Att: 23 Summons Luis B. Gonzalez Ingle,
Att: 24 Summons Conjugal Partnership Gonzalez-Roe,
Att: 25 Summons Osvaldo Alcaraz Diaz,
Att: 26 Summons Conjugal Partnership Alcaraz-Smith,
Att: 27 Summons Eduardo Fahme Gonzalez,
Att: 28 Summons Conjugal Partnership Fahme-Miles,
Att: 29 Summons Stephanie Colon Lopez,
Att: 30 Summons Conjugal Partnership Colon-Smith,
Att: 31 Summons Felix Ruiz Alvarez,
Att: 32 Summons Conjugal Partnership Ruiz-Roe,
Att: 33 Summons Jose M. Rodriguez Castro,
Att: 34 Summons Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Smith,
Att: 35 Summons Luis Perez Abreu,
Att: 36 Summons Conjugal Partnership Perez-Miles,
Att: 37 Summons Bayamon Medical Center,
Att: 38 Summons Dorado Health, Inc.,
Att: 39 Summons Emergency Room Administrative Services, LLC,
Att: 40 Summons SIMED,
Att: 41 Summons Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company,
Att: 42 Summons Triple S Propiedad,
Att: 43 Summons Aspen American Insurance Company,
Att: 44 Summons The Medical Protective Company (MEDPRO),
Att: 45 Summons Continental Insurance Company