South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Case #: 9:23-cv-02542
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2023
Case in other court:Beaufort Court of Common Pleas, 2023CP0700588
Last checked: Thursday Dec 07, 2023 5:35 AM EST
Defendant
Lowes Home Centers LLC
Represented By
Andrew G Melling
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Woronowich
Represented By
Jonathan Steven Arndt
Morgan And Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancey Woronowich
Represented By
Jonathan Steven Arndt
Morgan And Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/03 2:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by John Woronowich, Nancey Woronowich. (Arndt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
18 18 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order Mon 02/26 11:07 AM
Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/26/2024. (gray)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Confidentiality Order Mon 02/26 10:18 AM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Lowes Home Centers LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Melling, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Order
Thursday, December 21, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 12/21 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due 1/3/2024. Defendant's expert disclosures due 2/2/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/21/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 12/05 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot 12 Motion for Extension of Time based on filing of 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/5/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Mon 12/04 10:00 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct12 MOTION for Extension of Time by John Woronowich, Nancey Woronowich. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Arndt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/01 4:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by John Woronowich, Nancey Woronowich. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Arndt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 07/17 5:40 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by John Woronowich.(Arndt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/17 3:21 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/2/2023, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 12/4/2023, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/3/2024, Discovery due by 3/4/2024, Motions due by 4/2/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 7/1/2024, Mediation Due by 3/4/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/17/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 07/14 4:00 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Melling, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Fri 07/14 3:59 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Melling, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Rule 26(f) Report Fri 07/14 3:58 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Melling, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order
Friday, June 09, 2023
6 6 order Mediation Order Fri 06/09 9:27 AM
MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 12/4/2023. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/9/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/09 9:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/30/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/14/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 7/14/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/4/2023, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 9/5/2023, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/5/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/5/2023, Discovery due by 12/4/2023, Motions due by 1/3/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 4/2/2024, Mediation Due by 12/4/2023. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/9/2023. (gray)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/08 2:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Melling, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 06/08 1:23 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (gray)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Thu 06/08 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023CP0700588. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11144151), filed by Lowes Home Centers LLC. (gray)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs State Court Documents