Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-03554

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher B Latham
Case #: 3:23-ap-90033
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2023
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kendall Olson, Defendant
Represented By
Kendall Olson
contact info
Defendant
Highlander Services, Inc., Defendant
17260 Highlander Drive
Ramona, CA 92065
Represented By
Highlander Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiffs
Christopher R. Barclay, Plaintiff
P.O. Box 2819
La Mesa, CA 91943
Represented By
Brian A. Kretsch
Law Office Of Brian A. Kretsch
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, January 13, 2025
33 33 court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Mon 01/13 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by BC. Receipt Number 302132. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
32 32 order Closed Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/22 4:45 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
31 31 vCal Virtual Minute Entry - CHAP Mon 05/20 5:41 PM
Virtual Minute Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 06/03/2024. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 3/18/24). DISPOSITION: Matter off calendar. Order Regarding Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding entered on 5/15/24 Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Olivas, J.)
Related: [-] ECF No. 299 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Thursday, May 16, 2024
30 30 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sat 05/18 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 05/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
29 29 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Order)(CSD 3039, 3040, other) Thu 05/16 2:47 PM
Order Regarding Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding 3:2023-ap-90033-CL; with BNC Service. Signed on 5/15/2024. Related [+] (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 28 Stipulation
28 28 misc Stipulation Wed 05/15 10:52 AM
Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brian A. Kretsch on behalf of Christopher R. Barclay. (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
27 27 order Intended Action (Order) (CSD 1180 & 2062) Mon 05/06 3:12 PM
Order Regarding Noncontested Notice of Intended Action & Opportunity for Hearing Re: Compromise or Settle Controversy, Adversary Proceeding # 3:23-ap-90033; with BNC Service. Signed on 5/6/2024. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
26 26 vCal Minute Order Continued - CHAP Tue 03/19 10:33 AM
Minute Order. Termination of Hearing DATE: 03/18/2024. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 12/11/23). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. HEARING Scheduled for 06/03/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse Related [+] (Rodriguez-Olivas, J.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Friday, March 08, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to amd Complaint Fri 03/08 6:14 PM
Defendants Kendall D. Olson and Highlander Services, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint - First Amended Related [+] filed by Mary Wyman of Witham Mahoney & Abbott, LLP on behalf of Highlander Services, Inc., Kendall D. Olson. (Wyman, Mary)
Related: [-] 23
Friday, February 23, 2024
24 24 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 02/25 9:10 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 02/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Stipulated Order
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/23 5:46 PM
First Amended Complaint by Christopher R. Barclay against Highlander Services, Inc., Kendall D. Olson Related [+] filed by Brian A. Kretsch on behalf of Christopher R. Barclay. (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
22 22 order Stipulated Order Fri 02/23 3:24 PM
Order Regarding Stipulation for Leave to Amend Complaint; with BNC Service Related [+] Signed on 2/23/2024. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation
21 21 misc Stipulation Fri 02/23 12:03 PM
Stipulation for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Brian A. Kretsch on behalf of Christopher R. Barclay. Related [+] (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, December 29, 2023
20 20 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 12/31 9:09 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Change in Date Fixed for Trial/Hearing
18 18 notice Change in Date Fixed for Trial/Hearing (Notice) (CSD 1188 & 3025)(BNC) Fri 12/29 10:00 AM
Notice of Change in Date Fixed for Hearing HEARING Scheduled for 3/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] (Rodriguez-Olivas, J.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Thursday, December 28, 2023
19 19 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sat 12/30 9:10 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order
17 17 order ~Generic~ Order Thu 12/28 2:26 PM
Order on Agreement and Stipulated Re: Protective Order ; with BNC Service Related [+] signed on 12/28/2023. (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation
Friday, December 22, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation Fri 12/22 3:51 PM
Stipulation Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order filed by Mary Wyman on behalf of Highlander Services, Inc., Kendall D. Olson. (Wyman, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Protective Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B Order on Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order
Monday, December 11, 2023
15 15 vCal Minute Order Continued - CHAP Tue 12/12 1:17 PM
Minute Order. Termination of Hearing DATE: 12/11/2023. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 9/1/23). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. HEARING Scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse Related [+] (Rodriguez-Olivas, J.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Thursday, September 07, 2023
14 14 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sat 09/09 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 09/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order to Schedule/Continue Hearing
13 13 order Schedule/Continue Hearing (Order) Thu 09/07 11:17 AM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order; with Service by BNC HEARING Scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] Signed on 9/7/2023. (Cary, B.)
Related: [-] 12 Minute Order Hearing Continued (CHAP)
Friday, September 01, 2023
12 12 vCal Minute Order Continued - CHAP Tue 09/05 2:25 PM
Minute Order. Termination of Hearing DATE: 09/01/2023. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE. DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. HEARING Scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse Related [+] (Rodriguez-Olivas, J.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Thursday, August 10, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 (CSD 3018) Thu 08/10 2:32 PM
Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 filed by Brian A. Kretsch of Law Office of Brian A. Kretsch on behalf of Christopher R. Barclay. Related [+] (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
10 10 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Thu 08/03 9:12 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 08/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference Hearing
9 9 notice Hearing, Pre-Trial Status Conference (Notice) (CSD 3019)(BNC) Tue 08/01 2:15 PM
Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference -- PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Scheduled for 9/1/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] (McGrew, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, July 10, 2023
8 8 notice Miscellaneous (Document/Notice) Mon 07/10 7:39 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Matthew M. Mahoney filed by Matthew M. Mahoney on behalf of Highlander Services, Inc., Kendall Olson. (Mahoney, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Miscellaneous (Document/Notice) Mon 07/10 7:37 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel of Mary K. Wyman filed by Mary Wyman on behalf of Highlander Services, Inc., Kendall Olson. (Wyman, Mary)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/10 7:34 PM
DEFENDANTS Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Mary Wyman of Witham Mahoney & Abbott, LLP on behalf of Highlander Services, Inc., Kendall Olson. (Wyman, Mary)
Related: [-] []
Thursday, June 08, 2023
5 5 cmp Return of Summons Served Thu 06/08 1:56 PM
Summons Served on: Highlander Services, Inc., Kendall Olson. Served On 6/8/2023 filed by Brian A. Kretsch on behalf of Christopher R. Barclay. (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
4 4 order Defer Payment of Fee for filing Complaint (Order) Wed 06/07 4:15 PM
Order APPROVING Application to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint 3:23-ap-90033 . IT IS ORDERED the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court shall cause a copy of this Order to be transmitted to the court of jurisdiction over the underlying bankruptcy case for docketing; and that any deferred filing fees be collected from the estate, if any, created for the underlying case unless otherwise directed by the court. Michael Williams, Clerk of Court signed on 6/7/2023. (Admin)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint by Trustee or DIP (Application) (CSD 2017) Wed 06/07 4:15 PM
Application by Trustee or DIP to Defer Payment of Fee for Filing Complaint 3:23-ap-90033. filed by Brian A. Kretsch on behalf of Christopher R. Barclay. Related [+] (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) (auto) Wed 06/07 4:09 PM
Summons Issued on Kendall Olson Answer Due 07/7/2023; Highlander Services, Inc. Answer Due 07/7/2023; with Certificate of Service. (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 4:09 PM
Adversary case 23-90033 Complaint by Christopher R. Barclay against Kendall Olson, Highlander Services, Inc.. Nature of Suit: 13 Related [+] 14 12 , Fee Amount $ 0.0 Filed by Brian A. Kretsch on behalf of Christopher R. Barclay. Filing fee collected, receipt #defer. (Kretsch, Brian)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - othercovery of money/property - 547 preference