Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:23-mj-00421
Case Filed:May 10, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 09, 2023 3:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Benjamin Jehle Zwack (1)
Represented By
Katherian D Roe
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
John A Price, III
John A Price Iii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David P. Steinkamp
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/09/2023 6:20 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
1 1 MJ Duty Case Opening Form. (NAH)
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT(unsealed 5/11/2023) by USA David Steinkamp with affidavit of Joshua A. Szondy (ATF) as to Benjamin Jehle Zwack (1) by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster (NAH) Modified text on 5/11/2023 (JAM).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 Bench Warrant Issued as to Benjamin Jehle Zwack by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (NAH)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Benjamin Jehle Zwack. (NAH)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal as to Benjamin Jehle Zwack (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 5/10/2023. (NAH)
Related: [-]
6 6 APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM as to Benjamin Jehle Zwack. Writ issued and delivered to the USM on 5/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 5/10/2023. cc: USM & USA. (NAH) Modified text on 5/11/2023 (JAM).
Related: [-]