Original Case: 2:21-cv-00926

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-35386
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2023
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
EVERGREEN PROFESSIONAL RECOVERIES, INC.
Defendant - Appellee
KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF WASHINGTON
Represented By
Todd W. Wyatt
Wyatt DeBenedetti PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDREA VARGAS
Represented By
Jason Anderson
Anderson Santiago, PLLC
contact info
Thomas Tyler Santiago
Anderson Santiago, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/02/2024 2:54 AM PDT
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Andrea Vargas Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/13/2023. Appellant Andrea Vargas opening brief due 08/04/2023. Appellee Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington answering brief due 09/05/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12729732] (JBS) [Entered: 06/06/2023 12:09 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet