Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-30347

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Guy R Humphrey
Case #: 3:23-ap-03012
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2023
Terminated:Aug 25, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Greg Bohl
dba QwikFile.net 3161 Sunridge Heights Pkwy #2320
Henderson, NV 89053
Represented By
Greg Bohl
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 170 N High Street Suite 200
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Jeremy Shane Flannery
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, August 25, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/25 2:11 PM
Adversary Case 3:23-ap-3012 Closed (crw)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 19, 2023
5 5 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 08/20 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)4 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
4 4 6 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 08/17 8:19 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving the United State Trustee's Complaint for Injunctive Relief, Turnover of Funds, and Assessing Penalties Under 11 U.S.C §§ 110 and/or 526, 527, and/or 528 against Defendant Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (crw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
3 3 misc Summons Issued and Served Wed 07/05 8:59 AM
Summons(es) Issued and Served on Greg Bohl on 7/5/2023, Answer due on 08/4/2023 (Flannery, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
2 2 misc Summons Issued Mon 06/12 3:20 PM
Summons Issued on Greg Bohl Date Issued 6/12/2023, Answer Due 07/12/2023 (Flannery, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/08 4:55 PM
Adversary case 3:23-ap-03012. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (72 (Injunctive relief - other)): Complaint by United States Trustee against Greg Bohl. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount of $ 0.00 is Exempt (Flannery, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EDVA Order
Att: 2 Exhibit EDPA Order
Att: 3 Exhibit Other Orders