Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00195
Case Filed:May 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 10, 2023 3:59 AM AST
Defendant
Wanda M. Rodriguez-Feliciano (41)
Represented By
Yassmin Gonzalez-Velez
Gonzales Velez Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Tomas E. Catala-Suarez (40)
Represented By
Mariangela Tirado-Vales
Mariangela Tirado Vales Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Marla Pereira-Medina (31)
Represented By
Carlos Xavier Irizarry-Rivera
Altos De La Fuente
contact info
Defendant
Ricardo J. Ramos-Moyet (36)
Represented By
Miguel A. Rodriguez-Robles
Cond. Riberas De Rio Hondo
contact info
Defendant
Luis E. Reyes-Sandoval (29)
Represented By
Wilfredo Rios-Mendez
Rios Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Yoel Rivera-Hernandez (44)
Represented By
Yanira I. Colon-Garcia
contact info
Defendant
Juan L. Rivera-Mundo (26)
Represented By
Ovidio E. Zayas-Perez
Zayas Perez Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Christian J. Rivera-Renovales (13)
Represented By
Eduardo Ferrer-Rios
Eduardo Ferrer & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Arnaldo X. Rodriguez-Camacho (10)
Represented By
Marie L. Cortes-Cortes
Marie L. Cortes-Cortes, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Denisse Y. Rodriguez-De Jesus (14)
Represented By
Jose G. Perez-Ortiz
Jose Guillermo Perez Ortiz
contact info
Defendant
Luis A. Rodriguez-De Jesus (30)
Represented By
Melanie Carrillo-Jimenez
Melanie Carrillo-Jimenez Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Carlos E. Pena-Santiago (12)
Represented By
Thomas Trebilcock-Horan
Trebilcock & Rovira, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Divad Roman-Estrada (15)
Represented By
Ruben Cerezo-Hernandez
Ruben Cerezo Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Hendrick Socorro Sanchez-Orta (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Samuel P. Carrion
Federal Public Defender District Of Puerto Rico
contact info
Defendant
Harold H. Sanchez-Santiago (4)
Represented By
Antonio L. Bisbal-Bultron
Bisbal & Matos Estudio Legal
contact info
Defendant
Hillary Sanchez-Santiago (3)
Represented By
Saul Roman-Santiago
Saul Roman Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Hector I. Santiago-Diaz (18)
Represented By
Juan F. Matos-De-Juan
Matos De Juan Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Jesus E. Soto-Lozada (23)
Represented By
Maria T. Arsuaga
Maria T. Arsuaga, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Nicole M. Suarez-Padilla (32)
Represented By
Osvaldo Carlo-Linares
Carlo Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ruth D. Trinidad-De Leon (38)
Represented By
Javier A. Cuyar-Olivo
contact info
Defendant
Kenned A. Velazquez-Toledo (28)
Represented By
Raymond L. Sanchez-Maceira
Sanchez-Maceira Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Javier Velez-Torres (22)
Represented By
Jose R. Gaztambide-Aneses
contact info
Defendant
Felix D. Lara-Vazquez (17)
Represented By
Edgar L. Sanchez-Mercado
Esm Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Wendee P. Cedeno-Rosa (42)
Represented By
Rosa Ivette Bonini-Laracuente
Urb Hillside
contact info
Defendant
Alexandra Davila-Ortiz (7)
Represented By
Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Mariani Franco Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Katty M. De Leon-Delgado (27)
Represented By
Francisco J. Adams-Quesada
contact info
Defendant
Yeimyliz E. Diaz-Pastrana (5)
Represented By
David J. Colon-Almenas
contact info
Defendant
Iris Y. Diaz-Perez (19)
Represented By
Ismael Rodriguez-Izquierdo
contact info
Defendant
Alex Gotay-Concepcion (6)
Represented By
Kendys Pimentel-Soto
Kendys Pimentel
contact info
Defendant
Roberto Gotay-Concepcion (37)
Represented By
Ian Carlos Garcia-Ferreras
contact info
Defendant
Josearyam Gotay-Leon (24)
Represented By
Johnny Rivera-Gonzalez
contact info
Defendant
Jan A. Hernandez-Martinez (21)
Represented By
Leonardo M. Aldridge
Ecija-Sbgb Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Julia E. Pastrana-Romero (2)
Represented By
Jason Gonzalez-Delgado
contact info
Defendant
Sergio A. Leon-Perez (39)
Represented By
Alfredo M Umpierre-Soler
contact info
Hector J. Dauhajre-Rodriguez
contact info
Defendant
Reynaldo Lopez-Agrinzoni (35)
Represented By
Wilfredo Diaz-Narvaez
Wilfredo Diaz Narvaez Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Oscar Lopez-Cruz (33)
Represented By
Richard O. Dansoh
American Legal Associates LLC
contact info
Defendant
Angel M. Martinez-Martinez (9)
Represented By
Javier A. Morales-Ramos
Javier A. Morales Ramos Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Rafael J. Mejias-Gonzalez (34)
Represented By
Rafael F. Castro-Lang
Castro & Castro Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Morales-Santiago (25)
Represented By
Julio Cesar Alejandro-Serrano
contact info
Defendant
Yadisha Morales-Santiago (43)
Defendant
Ivelisse Nieves-Irizarry (20)
Represented By
Jose L. Novas-Debien
Law Offices Of Jose Luis Novas Debien, P.S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Betzaida Ortiz-Garcia (11)
Represented By
Thomas R. Lincoln-San-Juan
Thomas R. Lincoln Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Alexis X. Pantoja-Diaz (8)
Represented By
Saul Suarez-Flores
Alvarez & Suarez
contact info
Defendant
Eduardo Pastrana-Morales (16)
Represented By
Lydia Lizarribar-Masini
Lizarribar Masini Law Office
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Joseph Olinghouse
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Oct 16 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Josearyam Gotay-Leon (24). Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 10/16/23. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
GPO Oct 20 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Oscar Lopez-Cruz (33) . Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2023 . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 10/20/23. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
GPO Jan 12 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Wendee P. Cedeno-Rosa (42). Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 1/12/2024. (SJL)
GPO Feb 16 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Hillary Sanchez-Santiago (3). Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 2/16/2024. (SJL)
GPO Feb 16 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Javier Velez-Torres (22). Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 2/16/2024. (SJL)
GPO Mar 25 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Juan L. Rivera-Mundo (26). Objections to R&R due by 4/8/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 3/25/2024. (CSV)
GPO May 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Arnaldo X. Rodriguez-Camacho (10). Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/15/2024. (Kalman, Michael)
GPO May 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Roberto Gotay-Concepcion (37). Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/15/2024. (Kalman, Michael)
GPO May 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Ruth D. Trinidad-De Leon (38). Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/15/2024. (Kalman, Michael)
GPO May 16 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Yoel Rivera-Hernandez (44). Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/16/2024. (MK)
GPO May 20 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Denisse Y. Rodriguez-De Jesus (14). Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/20/2024. (MK)
GPO May 30 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Christian J. Rivera-Renovales (13). Objections to R&R due by 6/13/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 05/30/2024. (Ramos-Vega, Hector)
GPO May 30 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Joseph Morales-Santiago (25). Objections to R&R due by 6/13/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 05/30/2024.(Ramos-Vega, Hector)
GPO Jun 04 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Harold H. Sanchez-Santiago (4). Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/4/2024. (MK)
GPO Jun 04 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Betzaida Ortiz-Garcia (11). Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/4/2024. (MK)
GPO Jun 05 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Sergio A. Leon-Perez (39). Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/5/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jun 12 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Felix D. Lara-Vazquez (17). Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 6/12/2024. (hgp)
GPO Jun 17 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Ricardo J. Ramos-Moyet (36). Objections to R&R due by 7/1/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 6/17/24. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
GPO Jun 27 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Alexis X. Pantoja-Diaz (8). Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/27/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jul 10 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Reynaldo Lopez-Agrinzoni (35). Objections to R&R due by 7/24/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/10/2024. (MK)
GPO Jul 11 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Wanda M. Rodriguez-Feliciano (41). Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/11/2024. (MK)
GPO Jul 12 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Yeimyliz E. Diaz-Pastrana (5). Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/12/2024. (MK)
GPO Jul 19 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Julia E. Pastrana-Romero (2). Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 7/19/2024. (hgp)
GPO Jul 30 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Kenned A. Velazquez-Toledo (28). Objections to R&R due by 8/13/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/30/2024. (CSV)
GPO Sep 13 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Marla Pereira-Medina (31). Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 9/13/2024. (CSV)
GPO Sep 17 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Iris Y. Diaz-Perez (19). Objections to R&R due by 10/1/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 9/17/2024. (hgp)
GPO Oct 02 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Hector I. Santiago-Diaz (18). Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 10/2/2024. (hgp)
GPO Oct 23 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Alex Gotay-Concepcion (6). Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 10/18/2024.(cml)
GPO Mar 05 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Hendrick Socorro Sanchez-Orta (1). Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 3/5/2025. (MK)
GPO Mar 11 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Carlos E. Pena-Santiago (12). Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 03/11/2025. (Ramos-Vega, Hector)

Docket last updated: 06/10/2023 5:30 AM AST
Thursday, May 11, 2023
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to All Defendants. (mcm)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to All Defendants. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 5/11/2023. (mcm)
Related: [-]
3 3 31 pgs INDICTMENT as to Hendrick Socorro Sanchez-Orta (1) count(s) 1, 2-52, 53, Julia E. Pastrana-Romero (2) count(s) 5, Hillary Sanchez-Santiago (3) count(s) 6, Harold H. Sanchez-Santiago (4) count(s) 7, Yeimyliz E. Diaz-Pastrana (5) count(s) 8, Alex Gotay-Concepcion (6) count(s) 9, Alexandra Davila-Ortiz (7) count(s) 10, Alexis X. Pantoja-Diaz (8) count(s) 11, Angel M. Martinez-Maritnez (9) count(s) 12-13, Arnaldo X. Rodriguez-Camacho (10) count(s) 14, Betzaida Ortiz-Garcia (11) count(s) 15, Carlos E. Pena-Santiago (12) count(s) 16, Christian J. Rivera-Renovales (13) count(s) 17, Denisse Y. Rodriguez-De Jesus (14) count(s) 18, Divad Roman-Estrada (15) count(s) 19, Eduardo Pastrana-Morales (16) count(s) 20, Felix D. Lara-Vazquez (17) count(s) 21, Hector I. Santiago-Diaz (18) count(s) 22, Iris Y. Diaz-Perez (19) count(s) 23, Ivelisse Nieves-Irizarry (20) count(s) 24, Jan A. Hernandez-Martinez (21) count(s) 25, Javier Velez-Torres (22) count(s) 27, Jesus E. Soto-Lozada (23) count(s) 28, Josearyam Gotay-Leon (24) count(s) 29, Joseph Morales-Santiago (25) count(s) 30, Juan L. Rivera-Mundo (26) count(s) 31, Katty M. De Leon-Delgado (27) count(s) 32, Kenned A. Velazquez-Toledo (28) count(s) 33, Luis E. Reyes-Sandoval (29) count(s) 34, Luis A. Rodriguez-De Jesus (30) count(s) 35, Marla Pereira-Medina (31) count(s) 36, Nicole M. Suarez-Padilla (32) count(s) 37, Oscar Lopez-Cruz (33) count(s) 38, Rafael J. Mejias-Gonzalez (34) count(s) 40, Reynaldo Lopez-Agrinzoni (35) count(s) 42, Ricardo J. Ramos-Moyet (36) count(s) 43, Roberto Gotay-Concepcion (37) count(s) 44, Ruth D. Trinidad-De Leon (38) count(s) 45, Sergio A. Leon-Perez (39) count(s) 46, Tomas E. Catala-Suarez (40) count(s) 47, Wanda M. Rodriguez-Feliciano (41) count(s) 48, Wendee P. Cedeno-Rosa (42) count(s) 49, Yadisha Morales-Santiago (43) count(s) 50, Yoel Rivera-Hernandez (44) count(s) 51. (mcm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NPV Indictment
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to All Defendants held on 5/11/2023. Arraignment to be set upon arrest. Arrest warrants to be issued. (Court Reporter DCR.) (mcm)
Related: [-]
5 5 *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan in case as to Hendrick Socorro Sanchez-Orta (1), Julia E. Pastrana-Romero (2), Hillary Sanchez-Santiago (3), Harold H. Sanchez-Santiago (4), Yeimyliz E. Diaz-Pastrana (5), Alex Gotay-Concepcion (6), Alexandra Davila-Ortiz (7), Alexis X. Pantoja-Diaz (8), Angel M. Martinez-Maritnez (9), Arnaldo X. Rodriguez-Camacho (10), Betzaida Ortiz-Garcia (11), Carlos E. Pena-Santiago (12), Christian J. Rivera-Renovales (13), Denisse Y. Rodriguez-De Jesus (14), Divad Roman-Estrada (15), Eduardo Pastrana-Morales (16), Felix D. Lara-Vazquez (17), Hector I. Santiago-Diaz (18), Iris Y. Diaz-Perez (19), Ivelisse Nieves-Irizarry (20), Jan A. Hernandez-Martinez (21), Javier Velez-Torres (22), Jesus E. Soto-Lozada (23), Josearyam Gotay-Leon (24), Joseph Morales-Santiago (25), Juan L. Rivera-Mundo (26), Katty M. De Leon-Delgado (27), Kenned A. Velazquez-Toledo (28), Luis E. Reyes-Sandoval (29), Luis A. Rodriguez-De Jesus (30), Marla Pereira-Medina (31), Nicole M. Suarez-Padilla (32), Oscar Lopez-Cruz (33), Rafael J. Mejias-Gonzalez (34), Reynaldo Lopez-Agrinzoni (35), Ricardo J. Ramos-Moyet (36), Roberto Gotay-Concepcion (37), Ruth D. Trinidad-De Leon (38), Sergio A. Leon-Perez (39), Tomas E. Catala-Suarez (40), Wanda M. Rodriguez-Feliciano (41), Wendee P. Cedeno-Rosa (42), Yadisha Morales-Santiago (43), Yoel Rivera-Hernandez (44). (mcm)
Related: [-]