Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John Antoon II
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:23-cv-00361
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2023
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 4:37 AM EST
Defendant
American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Edwin A. Green, III
Gilligan, Anderson, Phelan, Williams & Green, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jared Parks
Represented By
Nicholas Joseph Castellano, II
Buckman & Buckman, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, September 26, 2024
38 38 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 09/26 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 09/25 5:30 PM
ORDER adopting 36 Report and Recommendation; granting 35 Renewed Joint Motion; denying as moot 29 Joint Motion; dismissing case with prejudice; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 9/25/2024. (EK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
36 36 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 09/05 12:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 35 Joint MOTION for approval of FLSA settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/5/2024. (AR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/28 2:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Approve FLSA Settlement by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 08/23 11:37 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Defendant's motion for second extension of time. The parties shall file their revised proposed settlement agreement no later than September 5, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/23/2024. (AR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 08/22 3:56 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Motion for Court Approval of Settlement by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/07 10:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 Defendant's motion for extension of time. The parties shall file their revised proposed settlement agreement no later than August 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/7/2024. (AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 08/06 2:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Motion for Court Approval of Settlement by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
30 30 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Tue 07/23 12:24 PM
ORDER taking under advisement 29 the parties' joint motion to approve settlement and providing the parties an opportunity to file a revised settlement agreement by August 8, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/23/2024. (AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
29 29 motion Approve Consent Judgment Tue 07/09 2:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC.(Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit FLSA Settlement Agreement and Release
Monday, May 20, 2024
28 28 adr Mediation report Mon 05/20 12:44 PM
SETTLEMENT REPORT: The parties has reached a Impasse and will proceed to trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/20/2024. (MJT)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 05/20 10:50 AM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/20/2024. (No Recording per Judge) (MJT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
26 26 4 pgs order Order scheduling mediation conference Wed 02/28 1:14 PM
ORDER scheduling mediation conference: Mediation Conference set for 5/20/2024 at 09:00 AM in Ocala Courtroom 1 A before Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/28/2024. (MJT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/13 4:43 PM
ORDER regarding scheduling of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/13/2024. (MJT)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference Tue 02/13 10:34 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to United States Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/13/2024. (EK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
23 23 misc Status report Thu 11/30 3:59 PM
STATUS report re settlement by Jared Parks. (Castellano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
22 22 misc Verified summary Thu 10/12 11:37 AM
VERIFIED summary by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC.(Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 10/04 9:56 AM
ORDER discharging order to show cause and granting 20 Defendant's motion for extension through October 12, 2023, within which to file its verified summary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/4/2023. (AR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 09/28 4:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Verified Summary by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
19 19 misc Response to order to show cause Mon 09/25 2:47 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re18 Order to show cause filed by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order to show cause Mon 09/18 5:03 PM
ORDER to show cause why Defendant has failed to comply with the Court's 11 FLSA Scheduling Order as to American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. Response due within 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/18/2023. (MJT)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
17 17 respoth Response Mon 08/14 2:48 PM
RESPONSE re11 Case Management Scheduling Order to the Court's Interrogatories filed by Jared Parks. (Castellano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/08 10:46 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re11 Case Management Scheduling Order by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blanchard, Merriam, Adel, Kirkland & Green, P.A., Corporate Parent American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Edwin A Green, Other Affiliate Gilligan, Anderson, Phelan, Williams & Green, P.A., Other Affiliate Travis Durden for American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 08/03 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Nicholas Joseph Castellano, II on behalf of Jared Parks. Lead Counsel: Nicholas J. Castellano, II. (Castellano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 08/02 12:02 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicholas Joseph Castellano, II of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 08/02 12:02 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edwin A. Green of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of change of address Wed 08/02 8:58 AM
NOTICE of change of address by Edwin A. Green, III (Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
11 11 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 08/01 8:37 AM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/1/2023. (MJT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerks Default Thu 07/27 12:20 PM
ORDER denying 8 Motion for Clerk's Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 7/27/2023. (EE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
9 9 4 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/18 4:48 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC.(Green, Edwin)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Clerks Default Tue 07/18 11:24 AM
Verified MOTION for Clerk's Default against American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC by Jared Parks. (Castellano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
7 7 service Summons returned executed Wed 06/28 7:46 PM
RETURN of service executed on June 22, 2023 by Jared Parks as to American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (Castellano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/15 10:59 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jared Parks. (Castellano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
5 5 service Summons issued Tue 06/13 8:27 AM
SUMMONS issued as to American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Mon 06/12 2:00 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/12/2023. (KM)
Related: [-]
3 3 8 pgs order Interested Persons Order Mon 06/12 1:57 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER (FLSA) directing counsel to file a Disclosure Statement within 14 days from the date of this order; file a notice of pendency if there is a related case within 14 days from the date of this order; waiving requirement for a case management report. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/12/2023. (KM)
Related: [-]
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:23-cv-361-JA-PRL. (ARC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/12 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against American Catastrophe Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20929948) filed by Jared Parks.(Castellano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/12 12:38 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:23-cv-361-JA-PRL. (ARC)
Related: [-]