Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:L Scott Coogler
Case #: 6:23-cv-00758
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:605 Electronic Communications Privacy Act
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 3:33 AM CST
Defendant
MediaAlpha Inc
Represented By
C Meade Hartfield
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Grant A Premo
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
William A. Delgado
Dto Law
contact info
Shilpa A. Coorg
Dto Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Echols
Represented By
Charlotte Kelly
Fernee Kelly Law
contact info
James Matthew Stephens
Methvin, Terrell, Yancey, Stephens & Miller, P.C.
contact info
Anthony Paronich
Paronich Law, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Adroit Health Group LLC
Terminated: 11/28/2023
Represented By
Curtis Hussey
Hussey Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/28/2023 10:13 AM CDT
Monday, June 12, 2023
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4361181 (B5813). related document1 COMPLAINT against Adroit Health Group LLC, MediaAlpha Inc, filed by Maria Echols. (MEB2). (Stephens, James) Modified on 6/12/2023 (MEB2).
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs COMPLAINT against Adroit Health Group LLC, MediaAlpha Inc, filed by Maria Echols. (MEB2)
Related: [-]
2 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Maria Echols. (MEB2)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Adroit Health Group LLC, MediaAlpha Inc. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
Related: [-]