New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:23-cv-03216
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 4:43 AM EST
Defendant
CITY OF HACKENSACK
Represented By
MARY ANNE GROH
Cleary Giacobbe Alfieri Jacobs, LLC
contact info
ANTHONY P. SEIJAS
Cleary Giacobbe Alfieri Jacobs
contact info
Plaintiff
DENNY RAMIREZ
Represented By
DYLAN THOMAS HASTINGS
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MARKOS
Williams Cedar, LLC
contact info
GERALD J. WILLIAMS
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 12 2024
LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/12/2024. (qa, )
GPO Oct 01 2024
LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/1/2024. (mxw, )

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
46 46 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/07 3:44 PM
TEXT ORDER--A settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey Adams is scheduled on June 10, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. IN PERSON at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 9, Newark, NJ 07102. Trial counsel and all parties must attend. If a corporate or government entity is a party, then a person with full settlement authority must attend. If an insurance carrier is involved, then an adjustor with full settlement authority must attend (in addition to the party). Each party shall submit, by email to SDA_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement memorandum of no more than ten double spaced pages no later than five business days before the conference. Voluminous exhibits to settlement letters (exceeding 20 pages) will not be reviewed by the Court unless submitted in hard copy that is received by Chambers no later than five (5) business days in advance of the settlement conference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 3/7/2025. (JB, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 03/07 6:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Status Conference held on 3/7/2025. Order to be file. (JB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
45 45 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 12/23 11:50 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial disclosures and jurisdiction discovery are to be exchanged by January 15, 2025. Fact discovery shall be completed by May 30, 2025. (Status Conference set for 3/7/2025 at 03:00 PM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 12/23/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 12/23 11:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/23/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
44 44 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 12/16 10:15 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by All Parties.(HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
43 43 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/21 9:32 AM
LETTER ORDER: An initial scheduling conference with Plaintiff and only remaining Defendant (United Public Service shall be held by video conference on December 23, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found[LINK:here] . (Initial Conference set for 12/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.)Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 11/20/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 10/01 5:15 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'21 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint as against the City and John Doe Defendants. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/1/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
41 41 3 pgs order Opinion Tue 10/01 5:13 PM
LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/1/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
40 40 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/24 4:08 PM
TEXT ORDER: A status conference was held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. As per their July 24, 2024 letter (ECF No.39 ), Defendants United States Public Service Employees Union (UPSE) and Gillman are no longer objecting to the second amended complaint and have filed an answer. The motion to dismiss filed by Gillman and UPSE to dismiss the 1st amended complaint (ECF No. 31) is withdrawn as moot. The motion to dismiss filed by City of Hackensack to dismiss the 1st amended complaint (ECF No.21 ) remains pending. Absent further order from the Court, discovery shall not proceed until the pending motion to dismiss is resolved. Motions terminated:31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION, ROBERT GILLMAN. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 7/24/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Letter Wed 07/24 1:34 PM
Letter from Matthew P. Rocco Advising of Withdrawal of Objection to 2nd Amended Complaint Filing re 38 Order,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,. (ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 07/24 4:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Status Conference held on 7/24/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
38 38 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/19 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephonic conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Adams for July 24, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. The dial in number is 973-437-5535 and the access code is 144 261 615#. The purpose of the conference is to discuss Defendant United Public Service Employee Union's (UPSEU) letter dated July 15, 2024 (ECF No.35 ) objecting to the filing of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint (ECF No.34 ); the filing of UPSEU's answer to the 2nd Amended Complaint (ECF No.36 ) on the same date; and Plaintiff's letter dated July 17, 2024 (ECF No.37 ). If UPSEU is withdrawing its objection to the filing of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint and/or is withdrawing its Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (ECF No.31 ), it shall immediately notify the undersigned via filed letter and the telephonic conference may be cancelled. Status Conference set for 7/24/2024 at 03:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 7/19/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
37 37 misc Letter Wed 07/17 2:16 PM
Letter from Dylan T. Hastings, Esquire re35 Letter. (HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
36 36 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 07/15 1:29 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION.(ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Letter Mon 07/15 1:28 PM
Letter from Matthew P. Rocco re34 Amended Complaint. (ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
34 34 18 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/01 9:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF HACKENSACK, JOHN AND JANE DOES, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION, filed by DENNY RAMIREZ.(HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/08 3:47 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to the case. (smf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
33 33 misc Proposed Order Fri 06/21 6:49 PM
Proposed Order by ROBERT GILLMAN, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION re31 MOTION to Dismiss . (ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 06/21 3:18 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by ROBERT GILLMAN, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION re31 MOTION to Dismiss (ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 06/21 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ROBERT GILLMAN, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION. Responses due by 7/1/2024.(ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew P. Rocco, Esq., in Support
qc QC - Motion - Missing Supporting Document Fri 06/21 4:35 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A Proposed Order was not submitted with the31 Motion to Dismiss submitted by Matthew Rocco on 6/21/2024. PLEASE SUBMIT THE MISSING DOCUMENT ONLY using the event "Proposed Order" found under Civil-Other Filings-Other Documents. (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/21 4:36 PM
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/15/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 06/05 4:00 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The30 Return of Service filed by Dylan Hastings on 5/31/2024 was submitted incorrectly as an Acknowledgment of Service. For future reference, if filing a Return of Service or Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and Complaint, please use the event "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED" found under Civil-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
30 30 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 05/31 3:20 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by DENNY RAMIREZ. UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION served on 5/8/2024, answer due 5/30/2024. (HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
29 29 14 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/31 1:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CITY OF HACKENSACK re21 Second MOTION to Dismiss (GROH, MARY ANNE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
28 28 order Order Thu 05/23 12:21 PM
TEXT ORDER re25 Stipulation filed by UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION, ROBERT GILLMAN: The parties' stipulation (D.E.25 ) is hereby rejected. The United Public Service Employees Union and Robert Gillman (collectively, the "Union Defendants") must answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint by Friday, June 21, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/23/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/22 8:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by DENNY RAMIREZ re21 Second MOTION to Dismiss (HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW PHILLIP ROCCO on behalf of ROBERT GILLMAN, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION (ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Stipulation Wed 05/22 10:25 AM
STIPULATION re17 Amended Complaint Extending The Time To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to The First Amended Complaint by ROBERT GILLMAN, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION. (ROCCO, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
24 24 order Order Tue 05/21 1:28 PM
TEXT ORDER re23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend21 Second MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by DENNY RAMIREZ: Plaintiff's motion for an extension (D.E.23 )--which was filed on the opposition brief's due date and contains several inaccuracies including incorrect dates--is DENIED. By no later than 4:00 pm on Friday, May 24, 2024, Plaintiff shall file his brief in opposition to the second motion to dismiss (D.E.21 ("Motion")). Failure to do so will result in the Motion being deemed unopposed. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/21/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Amend Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/20 4:57 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend21 Second MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 Second MOTION to Dismiss by DENNY RAMIREZ.(HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 05/15 12:03 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The22 Return of Service filed by Dylan Hastings on 5/13/2024 was submitted incorrectly as an Acknowledgment of Service. For future reference, if filing a Return of Service or Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and Complaint, please use the event "Summons Returned Executed" found under Civil-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
22 22 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 05/13 9:16 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by DENNY RAMIREZ. UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION served on 5/9/2024, answer due 5/30/2024. (HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/08 10:02 AM
Set Deadlines as to21 Second MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss Tue 05/07 5:49 PM
Second MOTION to Dismiss by CITY OF HACKENSACK. Responses due by 5/20/2024.(GROH, MARY ANNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order
Friday, April 26, 2024
20 20 service Summons Issued Fri 04/26 9:11 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ROBERT GILLMAN, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
19 19 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 04/25 5:34 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by DENNY RAMIREZ as to ROBERT GILLMAN, UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION. (HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/16 9:33 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITY OF HACKENSACK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/7/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
18 18 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 04/15 4:16 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to City of Hackensack.. (GROH, MARY ANNE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 12:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED PUBLIC SERVICE EMPLOYEES UNION, ROBERT GILLMAN, filed by DENNY RAMIREZ.(HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 3:00 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/12 2:17 PM
ORDER granting10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/12/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs order Opinion Tue 03/12 2:15 PM
LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/12/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
14 14 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 09/25 7:44 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CITY OF HACKENSACK re10 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of an Answer (GROH, MARY ANNE)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/18 9:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re10 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of an Answer (HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/01 9:19 AM
ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file and serve their response to Defendants' motion to dismiss10 on or before September 18, 2023. Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on or before September 25, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/1/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/01 9:20 AM
Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of an Answer . Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/31 1:47 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of an Answer by All Plaintiffs.(HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/31 3:50 PM
Set Deadlines as to11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of an Answer . Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/21 4:42 PM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of an Answer . Motion set for 9/18/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
10 10 1 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 08/18 11:14 AM
MOTION to Dismiss In Lieu of an Answer by CITY OF HACKENSACK. Responses due by 9/5/2023.(GROH, MARY ANNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certification
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/19 10:11 AM
CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to Answer, Reply, or Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/19/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Tue 07/18 1:11 PM
Letter from Mary Anne Groh, Esq. re1 Complaint.(GROH, MARY ANNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 23, 2023
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 06/23 9:54 AM
AMENDED Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to City of Hackensack. Attorney ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for CITY OF HACKENSACK added. (SEIJAS, ANTHONY) Modified on 6/23/2023 (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 06/23 12:21 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITY OF HACKENSACK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/20/2023. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 06/22 2:17 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to City of Hackensack. Attorney ANTHONY P. SEIJAS for CITY OF HACKENSACK added. (SEIJAS, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/20 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNY RAMIREZ. CITY OF HACKENSACK served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023. (HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/15 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD J. WILLIAMS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WILLIAMS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/15 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER MARKOS on behalf of DENNY RAMIREZ (MARKOS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/13 9:18 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITY OF HACKENSACK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/12 5:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14383265) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DENNY RAMIREZ.(HASTINGS, DYLAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/12 5:33 PM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
Related: [-]