Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:D P Marshall Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00138
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2023
Terminated:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 3:33 AM CST
Defendant
Greene County Tech School District
Represented By
Rebecca Worsham
Mixon & Worsham PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlan Hurt
Represented By
Lindsey C. Noe
Wh Law
contact info
Christopher Wesley Burks
Wh Law
contact info

GPO Jan 31 2024
on 1/31/2024. (jak) ORDER granting 6 motion to dismiss; the alternative motion for summary judgment is denied as moot; dismissing with prejudice Hurt's FMLA claim; and dismissing without prejudice any embedded defamation claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.
GPO Jan 31 2024
JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Hurt's FMLA claim and dismissing without prejudice any embedded defamation claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2024. (jak)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
25 25 order Judgment Wed 01/31 2:51 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Hurt's FMLA claim and dismissing without prejudice any embedded defamation claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
24 24 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/31 2:44 PM
ORDER granting6 motion to dismiss; the alternative motion for summary judgment is denied as moot; dismissing with prejudice Hurt's FMLA claim; and dismissing without prejudice any embedded defamation claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
misc Docket Note Wed 11/01 2:57 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States Chief District Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/1/2023.(jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Tue 10/31 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re23 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "DESIGNATION to Unseal Exhibits by Greene County Tech School District" as marked on the document. (jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/27 12:57 PM
NOTICE by Greene County Tech School District re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment of Designation of Exhibits to Unseal (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/19 2:48 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Greene County Tech School District. (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/13 3:29 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 20 , granted. Reply due by 19 September 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/13/2023. (slb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/05 11:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Greene County Tech School District (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
19 19 utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 08/30 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re18 Response. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted with an incorrect case number. The correct document was added to docket entry18 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/29 4:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Carlan Hurt.(Burks, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Response -- Affidavit of Carlan Hurt
17 17 misc Response to Statement of Facts Tue 08/29 4:40 PM
RESPONSE re7 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by Carlan Hurt. (Burks, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/24 8:27 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 15 , granted. Response due by 29 August 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2023. (tck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/22 4:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Carlan Hurt (Noe, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/17 3:40 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. 13 , granted. Response due by 22 August 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/17/2023. (slb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/15 2:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Carlan Hurt (Noe, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
12 12 brief Brief in Support Thu 08/10 4:04 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/10 2:56 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT. (jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/04 1:38 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed Motion, Doc. 5 , granted as modified. Greene County School District may file the designated exhibits under seal. Please file the sealed exhibits conventionally with the Clerk's office in Jonesboro. And send paper courtesy copies to Jonesboro chambers. But, within thirty days after the reply is filed on the motion to dismiss, the District must identify those documents that may be unsealed and make a document-by-document showing for any document it believes should remain sealed. Unopposed motion, Doc. 9 , granted. Response due by 15 August 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/4/2023. (slb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/02 9:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Carlan Hurt (Noe, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/02 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey C. Noe on behalf of Carlan Hurt (Noe, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
7 7 misc Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) Wed 07/19 5:00 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Greene County Tech School District. (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/19 4:57 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Greene County Tech School District(Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1A-FMLA Policy
5 5 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/19 3:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supporting Brief and Exhibits Under Seal by Greene County Tech School District (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/29 3:53 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Unopposed motion, Doc.3 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 19 July 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2023. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/28 3:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by All Defendants (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/28 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Worsham on behalf of All Defendants (Worsham, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/12 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Greene County Tech School District, filed by Carlan Hurt. (Fee of $402. Receipt Number JON168. Summons issued and returned to plaintiff's counsel for service)(jak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet