California Southern District Court
Judge:Janis L Sammartino
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:23-cv-01087
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2023
Terminated:Dec 14, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court, San Diego County, CA, 37-02023-00009197-CU-PO-CTL
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 1:35 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 to 50
Defendant
WalMart Inc.
Represented By
Sean Costa
contact info
Bron Erik D'Angelo
Burger Meyer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Helen Mason
Represented By
Nicholas Paul Appell
San Diego Injury Law Center
contact info
Andy Van Le
Law Offices Of Andy Van Le
contact info
Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez
Law Offices Of Andy Van Le And Associates, PC
contact info
David T. Achord
San Diego Injury Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 14, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 12/14 3:57 PM
ORDER Granting30 Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/14/23. (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
30 30 motion Dismiss Mon 12/11 11:25 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice by Helen Mason. (Cuiriz-Lopez, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
29 29 minutes Settlement Disposition Conference Fri 12/08 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Settlement Disposition Conference held on 12/8/2023. (Plaintiff Attorney Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez). (Defendant Attorney Sean Costa). (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/25 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Motion to Dismiss Deadline 12/6/2023. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 12/8/2023 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/25/23.(aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
27 27 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Tue 10/24 5:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Continued Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/24/2023. Case settled. Confidential settlement put on the record UNDER SEAL. (CD# 10/24/2023 JLB23-4:25-4:32). Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Andy Van Le, Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez). (Defendant Attorney Sean Costa). (Helen Mason, Peter Lasley, Esther Mason).(no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Lodgment Thu 10/19 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Lodgment by WalMart Inc. SUPPLEMENTAL EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION STATEMENT (Costa, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
25 25 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 08/29 2:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: For the reasons discussed during the 8/29/2023 Status Conference, the parties'20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice. (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Status Conference Tue 08/29 2:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference re20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order held on 8/29/2023. (Plaintiff Attorney Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez). (Defendant Attorney Sean Costa). (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
23 23 order Minute Order (No Time) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/28 10:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The Court hereby SETS a telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference re20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order for 8/29/2023, at 1:45 PM before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the conference, the parties shall call the Court's conference line 619-657-0677, and use conference ID #: 407 154 322. (cxe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
22 22 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/23 4:13 PM
Minute Order re proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE) held on 8/23/2023. Case did not settle. A continued ENE, to be held by video, is set for 10/24/2023, at 2:00 PM before Judge Burkhardt. The parties may lodge supplemental ENE statements on or before 10/19/2023, at 12:00 PM . (Plaintiff Attorney Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez, Andy Van Le).(Defendant Attorney Bron Erik D'Angelo).(Helen Mason, Peter Lasley). (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
21 21 order Minute Order (No Time) Fri 08/18 10:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The Court has not received from Plaintiff the contact information required by paragraph 4(c) of the3 Order setting the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall lodge such information by email no later than 4:00 PM, on 8/18/2023 .(cxe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
20 20 motion Protective Order Thu 08/17 10:58 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by WalMart Inc.. (Costa, Sean)(aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Lodgment Wed 08/16 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Lodgment by WalMart Inc. re 11 Order on Motion to Continue,,, Early Neutral Evaluation Statement (Costa, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
18 18 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 08/08 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The parties'17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with Section VI.B. of Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules. (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
17 17 motion Protective Order Fri 08/04 1:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by WalMart Inc.. (Costa, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/19 3:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 2/28/2024 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 6/18/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/19/23.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
15 15 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 07/18 2:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2023. Scheduling order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez). (Defendant Attorney Sean Costa). (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
14 14 motion Discovery Mon 07/17 12:25 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by Helen Mason. (Cuiriz-Lopez, Vanessa) (cxl1)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Withdrawal of Document Mon 07/17 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Helen Mason . (Cuiriz-Lopez, Vanessa) (cxl1)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
12 12 motion Discovery Fri 07/14 5:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Plan by Helen Mason. (Cuiriz-Lopez, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 07/07 4:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Good cause appearing, the parties'8 Joint Motion to Continue is GRANTED IN PART. The Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) is continued to 8/23/2023, at 1:45 PM . ENE statements shall be lodged no later than 8/16/2023 . The Case Management Conference (CMC) is converted to a telephonic, counsel-only conference on 7/18/2023, at 1:45 PM. For purposes of the CMC, the parties shall call the Court's conference line at 619-657-0677, and use ID #: 291 859 543. In addition, the deadline to file a Joint Discovery Plan and exchange initial disclosures is continued to 7/14/2023 . All other dates, deadlines, and requirements set forth in the Court's3 Order setting the ENE and CMC remain in effect. (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Status Conference Fri 07/07 4:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference re8 Joint MOTION to Continue ENE and CMC held on 7/7/2023. Order on motion to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez). (Defendant Attorney Sean Costa). (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
9 9 order Minute Order (No Time) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/05 1:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The Court hereby SETS a telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference re8 Joint MOTION to Continue ENE and CMC for 7/7/2023, at 2:45 PM before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the conference, the parties shall call the Court's conference line at 619-657-0677, and use conference ID: 473 973 020#.(cxe)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
8 8 motion Continue Mon 07/03 2:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue ENE and CMC by Helen Mason. (Cuiriz-Lopez, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/29 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andy Van Le on behalf of Helen Mason (Le, Andy)Attorney Andy Van Le added to party Helen Mason(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/23 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez on behalf of Helen Mason (Cuiriz-Lopez, Vanessa)Attorney Vanessa Cuiriz-Lopez added to party Helen Mason(pty:pla) (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Substitute Attorney Wed 06/21 10:28 AM
Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney. Added attorney Andy Van Le for Helen Mason. Attorney David T. Achord and Nicholas Paul Appell terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/20/23.(aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/14 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Appell on behalf of Helen Mason (Appell, Nicholas)Attorney Nicholas Paul Appell added to party Helen Mason(pty:pla) (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
3 3 11 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 06/12 4:15 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conferences Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/18/2023 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/12/23.(aas)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 06/12 2:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by WalMart Inc. (ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 06/12 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17923920.), filed by WalMart Inc. The new case number is 3:23-cv-1087-JLS-JLB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit 1 Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Answer,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Supplemental Statement of Damages,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 California Secretary of State Business Search,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Arkansas Secretary of State Business Search,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 Arkansas Secretary of State Business Search