Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Hilary L Barnes
Case #: 2:23-bk-12371
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jul 13, 2023
Claims Deadline:Aug 21, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Dec 21, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
VEGASNAP, LLC
1110 PALMS AIRPORT DR., STE. 110
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119
Represented By
MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW
Larson And Zirzow, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
CHAPTER 11 - LV
300 LAS VEGAS BLVD., SO. #4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Monday, January 29, 2024
161 161 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/29 9:54 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of VEGASNAP, LLC Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 160 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Debtor VEGASNAP, LLC
160 160 notice Entry of Order (BK) Mon 01/29 9:27 AM
Notice of Entry of Order Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of VEGASNAP, LLC Related [+] (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-] 158 Order on Application for Compensation,159 Order on Application for Compensation
Friday, January 26, 2024
159 159 order Compensation Fri 01/26 12:00 PM
Order Granting Re: Application For Compensation and Reimbursement of Expense Related [+] for LARSON AND ZIRZOW, LLC, Fees awarded: $53797.50, Expenses awarded: $4518.82 (arv)
Related: [-] 143
158 158 order Compensation Fri 01/26 11:57 AM
Order Granting Re: Application For Compensation and Reimbursement of Expense Related [+] for EDWARD M. BURR, Fees awarded: $8840.00 (arv)
Related: [-] 145
Monday, January 22, 2024
157 157 misc Monthly Operating Report Mon 01/22 2:27 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Ending 12/31/2023 Filed by MATTHEW C. ZIRZOW on behalf of VEGASNAP, LLC (ZIRZOW, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]