Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 2:23-cv-02225
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 25, 2024
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/26 10:21 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against GERALD V. DAVIS, JR, JOHN HEWCZUK, EMILY R. PROVENCHER, JOSEPH R. WALTON, filed by SEAN C. CRAWFORD.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Wed 06/28 12:55 PM
Letter dated 6/28/23 Re: Status Update(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
Monday, June 26, 2023
5 5 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/26 1:59 PM
ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915. SEAN C. CRAWFORD, #0042324, SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS, PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915(B), REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN OF CHESTER COUNTY PRISON. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. TO THE EXTENT CRAWFORD ASSERTS CLAIMS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IN THE FORM OF DISMISSAL OF CRIMINAL CHARGES PENDING AGAINST HIM IN STATE COURT (SEE COMPL. AT 15), HIS CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, INCLUDING SCREENING OF CRAWFORDS REMAINING CLAIMS FOR DAMAGES, ARE STAYED UNTIL CRAWFORD INFORMS THIS COURT THAT HIS RELATED CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS HAVE BEEN RESOLVED IN ACCORDANCE WITH PARAGRAPH SEVEN (7) OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME. THE TIME TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 4(M) IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO THE DATE THE COURT ISSUES SUMMONSES IN THIS CASE IN THE EVENT SUMMONSES ARE ISSUED; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/26/23.6/26/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND EMAILED TO WARDEN OF CHESTER COUNTY.(mas) Modified on 6/26/2023 (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Wed 06/28 12:54 PM
Letter dated 6/20/23 by SEAN C. CRAWFORD (sbt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
misc Remark Tue 06/13 12:11 PM
Doc. 4 mailed to Pro SE. (er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
4 4 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Mon 06/12 2:23 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (fdc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 06/12 2:20 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by SEAN C. CRAWFORD. (fdc)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 06/12 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT against GERALD V. DAVIS, JR, JOHN HEWCZUK, EMILY R. PROVENCHER, JOSEPH R. WALTON, filed by SEAN C. CRAWFORD. *IFP PENDING*(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/12 2:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SEAN C. CRAWFORD..(fdc)
Related: [-]