District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00084
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2023 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1)
Represented By
Joseph S. Passanise
Wampler & Passanise Law Office
contact info
Charles Burnham
Burnham & Gorokhov PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kyle Robert Mirabelli
Usao
contact info
Stephen James Rancourt
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/13/2023 3:33 AM EDT
Thursday, January 12, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1). (zltp) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD.(zltp) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 1/12/2023. (zltp) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
Arrest of KYLER JOSEPH BARD in Missouri. (zltp) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (zltp) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant, dated 1/12/2023, Returned Executed on 1/17/2023 as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD. (zltp) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
MINUTE ORDER as to Defendant: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant appear for an initial appearance on 1/24/2023 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference; call-in instructions will be provided to counsel prior to the hearing. Counsel for the United States is directed to ensure that counsel for Defendant has received this Order and will provide the information to Defendant. If Defendant does not have counsel, counsel for the United States is directed to contact the Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Columbia and provide their office with the information contained in this Order. If the parties have questions about this Order or the scheduled hearing, please contact the Courtroom Deputy at 202-354-3173. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 1/19/2023. (zcll) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles Burnham appearing for KYLER JOSEPH BARD for purposes of a pro hac vice motion (Burnham, Charles) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Passanise Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9802656. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KYLER JOSEPH BARD.(Burnham, Charles) (zltp). [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 (1/31/2023) Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD. (bb) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: VTC First Appearance in the District as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1) held on 1/24/2023. Defendant was present by video. Defendant retained Attorney Joseph Passanise as counsel. The Court advised the Government of its due process obligations under Rule 5(f). Conditions of release were imposed. Defendant waived the right to have the Preliminary Hearing. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial Waiver as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1); Heard and Granted. Time between 1/24/2023, and 3/21/2023, shall be excluded from calculation of time in the interest of justice (XT) under the Speedy Trial Act. Status Hearing set for 3/21/2023 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant placed on Personal Recognizance Bond; Court Reporter: FTR Gold; FTR Time Frame: CTRM 4 [2:16:42-2:27:15] [2:46:47-2:55:09]; Defense Attorney: Joseph Passanise and Charles Burham; U.S. Attorney: Frederick Yette for Stephen Rancourt; Pretrial Officer: Andre Sidbury. (bb) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1): As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 1/24/2023. (bb) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 1/24/2023. (zcll) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appearance Bond
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kyle Robert Mirabelli appearing for USA. (Mirabelli, Kyle) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
11 11 ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 2/10/2023. (ztl) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
12 12 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD.(Rancourt, Stephen) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 MOTION for Order to Disclose Items Protected by Fed. R. Crim. Proc. 6(e) and Sealed Materials by USA as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD.(Rancourt, Stephen) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/8/2023. (zcll) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD, GRANTING the government's unopposed13 Motion for an Order to Disclose Items Protected by Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e) and Sealed Materials and AUTHORIZING the government, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e)(3)(E)(i) and the previously entered14 Protective Order governing discovery in this case, to provide to defendant, and any co-defendants who may later be joined, materials protected by Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e), insofar as such disclosure is necessary for the government to comply with its discovery and disclosure obligations. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 9, 2023. (lcbah4) [1:23-mj-00009-GMH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
17 17 INDICTMENT as to KYLER JOSEPH BARD (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6. (zltp)
Related: [-]