Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Susan K Declercq
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:23-cv-11407
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2023 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of
Represented By
James J. Carty
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Dena Leath
Represented By
Dionne E Webster-Cox
Webster Law Office PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Shane Haynes
Terminated: 07/26/2023
Defendant
James Victorian
Terminated: 07/26/2023

GPO Mar 31 2025
OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 20 ). Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (SOso).

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/02 4:04 PM
ORDER of Attorney Substitution. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (KBro)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 misc Attorney Substitution Mon 04/28 1:39 PM
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of: Zak Toomey added. (Toomey, Zak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
27 27 appeal Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit* Thu 04/24 10:33 AM
Certificate of Service re26 Notice of Appeal. (SSch)
Related: [-]
26 26 appeal Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Thu 04/24 9:15 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Dena Leath. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10210294 - Fee: $ 605 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
25 25 order Judgment* Mon 03/31 4:00 PM
JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (SOso)
Related: [-]
24 24 31 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Mon 03/31 3:57 PM
OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.20 ). Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/17 4:07 PM
REPLY to Response re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of. (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/07 3:54 PM
RESPONSE to20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
21 21 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order Wed 05/22 5:00 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Fed. R. Civ. Pro 56(a)., Response as to20 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Response due by 6/7/2024 . Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
order Text-Only Order Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/09 5:31 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER. Status Conference set for 5/13/2024 at 10:00 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/03 9:59 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER. IN-PERSON Status Conference set for 5/13/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Susan K. DeClercq . All dates previously established remain in effect. Parties must file a Joint Status Report 3 days prior to the conference. The Report must contain a brief summary of the case, discovery that has been completed and anticipated remaining discovery. The Parties should also address any attempts to settle the case and any other matter that should be brought to the Court's attention. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
20 20 motion Summary Judgment Fri 04/26 4:15 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of. (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, Leath Dep.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, Allen Dep.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, Williams Fact-Finding,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, Victorian Dep.,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, Leath Mailbox Report of Contact,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, Victorian Mailbox Report of Contact,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, Haynes Mailbox Report of Contact,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, Myers Email,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, Myers Fact Finding,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, Berry Fact Finding,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, Cass Email,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13, Courtesy Violation Notice,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14, Leath EEO Affidavit,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15, Allen Email re Titles,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16, Leath email,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17, Myers Book Memorandum,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18, Second Leath Trans.,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19, July 2020 Report of Contact,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20, Leath DBRS Entry,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21, EEO Investigative Report,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22, Robinson Email,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23, Leath ROC,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24, Victorian ROC,
Att: 26 Exhibit 25, Barrett ROC,
Att: 27 Exhibit 26, Wilhoite ROC,
Att: 28 Exhibit 27, Tasker Fact Finding,
Att: 29 Exhibit 28, Complaint of Employment Discrimination,
Att: 30 Exhibit 29, Final Agency Decision,
Att: 31 Exhibit 30, EEOC Decision,
Att: 32 Exhibit 31, Blank Report of Contact
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
order Text-Only Reassignment Tue 04/02 1:55 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Linda V. Parker to District Judge Susan K. DeClercq pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-007. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
19 19 trial Witness List Fri 11/17 2:01 PM
WITNESS LIST by US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/28 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER (PHASE I): Discovery due by 4/5/2024 . Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/26/2024 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. Related [+] (AFla)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/28 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference not held on 9/28/2023. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
17 17 order Stipulation and Order Wed 09/27 9:25 PM
STIPULATED RULE 502(d) ORDER Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Protective Order Wed 09/27 9:24 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF RECORDS SUBJECT TO THE PRIVACY ACT AND 45 C.F.R. 164.512(e) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
15 15 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 09/25 9:27 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
14 14 notice Appear* Fri 09/01 11:06 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2023 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker . (AFla)
Related: [-]
13 13 respoth Answer - Free Fri 09/01 10:26 AM
ANSWER to12 Answer to Amended Complaint by US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of. (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/02 5:29 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second by Dena Leath. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, July 28, 2023
11 11 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/28 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/28 3:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of served on 7/17/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
9 9 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 07/27 8:53 AM
STIPULATED ORDER, Shane Haynes and James Victorian terminated. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (SKra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
8 8 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/20 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Victorian served on 07/19/2023. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/20 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. US Department of Veteran Affairs, Secretary served on July 12, 2023. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Thu 07/20 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Carty on behalf of US Department of Veterans Affairs, Secretary of. (Carty, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/14 12:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Shane Haynes served on 7/6/2023, answer due 7/27/2023. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued for US Attorney/Attorney General* Thu 06/29 9:22 AM
SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (TTho)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Thu 06/29 9:21 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
2 2 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Wed 06/28 8:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dena Leath against Dena Leath. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-10
service Request for Additional Summons Wed 06/28 8:02 PM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 06/14 9:37 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 06/13 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Dena Leath against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9383450 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Wastenaw. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Webster-Cox, Dionne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 10