Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Referred: James P O'Hara
Case #: 1:23-cv-01495
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2023
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2023 2:45 AM MST
Defendant
Columbine Logging, Inc.
Represented By
Peter J. Stuhldreher
Bakerhostetler LLP
contact info
Jennifer DeVlugt
Bakerhostetler LLP
contact info
Mark D. Temple
Bakerhostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Sadle
Represented By
Richard M. Schreiber
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Michael Andrew Josephson
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, August 26, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/27 8:38 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The above-captioned matter is dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 8/26/2024. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Mon 08/26 11:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Defendant Columbine Logging, Inc.. (Temple, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
27 27 order Order Thu 07/25 12:28 PM
ORDER. In light of Defendant's26 Notice of Settlement, the parties are ORDERED to file appropriate dismissal documents BY NO LATER THAN 8/26/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 7/25/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 07/25 8:24 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Columbine Logging, Inc. (Temple, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
25 25 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Thu 01/25 3:09 PM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews as a United States District Judge, this case is reassigned to visiting Magistrate Judge James P. OHara. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge OHara at the end of the civil action number (such as 23-cv-01495-RMR-JPO). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained. Judge OHaras chambers can be reached at 913-735- 2287 and ksd_ohara_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov (Text only entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 01/22 1:44 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Columbine Logging, Inc.. (Temple, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/12 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Plaintiff Sharon Sadle(Schreiber, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent
Monday, November 20, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Class Mon 11/20 1:56 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Conditional Certification. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/20/2023.(rmrja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/14 3:15 PM
RULE 502 ORDER entered. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/14/2023. (skclc3)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Protective Order Tue 11/14 3:13 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/14/2023. (skclc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
19 19 order Order Referring Motion Mon 11/13 4:01 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 18 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Columbine Logging, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/13/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Protective Order Mon 11/13 2:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Columbine Logging, Inc..(Temple, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Stipulated Rule 502(d) Order
Monday, October 30, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/30 11:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: entered by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/30/2023. (amont, )
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 10/30 11:44 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2023. Discovery due by 7/30/2024. Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2024. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs motion Certify Class Mon 10/30 10:03 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Sharon Sadle.(Schreiber, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Consent Forms,
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, October 23, 2023
14 14 11 pgs misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 10/23 10:46 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Sharon Sadle. (Schreiber, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
13 13 order Minute Order Thu 09/28 8:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephone Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2023 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews.The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/28/2023. Text Only Entry (amont, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 07/19 8:36 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Jennifer DeVlugt on behalf of Columbine Logging, Inc.Attorney Jennifer DeVlugt added to party Columbine Logging, Inc.(pty:dft) (DeVlugt, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 07/19 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Peter J. Stuhldreher on behalf of Columbine Logging, Inc.Attorney Peter J. Stuhldreher added to party Columbine Logging, Inc.(pty:dft) (Stuhldreher, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/17 12:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Temple, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/17 12:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Mark D. Temple added to party Columbine Logging, Inc.(pty:dft) by Columbine Logging, Inc..(Temple, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 07/17 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Sharon SadleAttorney Richard M. Schreiber added to party Sharon Sadle(pty:pla) (Schreiber, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
7 7 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 07/06 10:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Sadle. Columbine Logging, Inc. served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (Dunlap, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/14 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Plaintiff Sharon Sadle (Dunlap, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/13 4:32 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 6/13/2023. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Tue 06/13 3:29 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jcharl, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 06/13 3:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Request Tue 06/13 2:48 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Columbine Logging, Inc. d/b/a Columbine Corporation by Plaintiff Sharon Sadle. (Josephson, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/13 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Columbine Logging, Inc. d/b/a Columbine Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9149278)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Sharon Sadle(pty:pla), filed by Sharon Sadle.(Josephson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet