New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Referred: Robert W Lehrburger
Case #: 1:23-cv-04964
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2023 4:46 AM EST
Defendant
New York Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By
Michael E. Gertzman
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Liza May Velazquez
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Gregory Frederick Laufer
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Juhyun Park
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Emily A. Vance
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Kauffman
7 Spaulding Ln
Saugerties, NY 12477


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, January 13, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 01/13 8:35 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
39 39 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 01/10 8:36 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:38 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations in favor of New York Presbyterian Hospital against Kevin Kauffman. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated January 8, 2025, the Court ADOPTS Judge Lehrburger's R&R in its entirety. NYPH's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Title VII claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and his NYSHRL and NYCHRL claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Leave to amend is DENIED. Accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Tammi M Hellwig on 1/10/2025) (tp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 01/10 10:13 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Wed 01/08 4:37 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for28 Motion to Dismiss filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital,37 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge Lehrburger's R&R in its entirety. NYPH's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Title VII claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and his NYSHRL and NYCHRL claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Leave to amend is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 28, close the case, and mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff pro se. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/8/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 12/11 10:09 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 37. Mailed to: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
37 37 order Report and Recommendations Tue 12/10 5:42 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO HON. ANALISA TORRES: MOTION TO DISMISS re:28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital. For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that NYPH's motion be GRANTED and the Amended Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. The Title VII claim should be dismissed with prejudice. The state and city claims should be dismissed without prejudice. To the extent not discussed herein, the Court has considered all of Plaintiff's arguments and determined them to be either moot or without merit. SO ORDERED. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2024 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 12/10/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
36 36 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 10/07 1:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply in Further Support of Defendant The New York and Presbyterian Hospital's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint served on Kevin Kauffman on 10/7/2024. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Vance, Emily)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 10/07 1:08 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . . Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
34 34 respoth Declaration in Opposition (non-motion) Fri 09/20 3:32 PM
DECLARATION of Kevin Kauffman Response in Opposition re:13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Kauffman. (ar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 09/04 9:31 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/03 11:22 AM
ORDER: On July 30, 2024, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has not filed any opposition within the time permitted. The Court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's time to file any opposition to September 23, 2024. No further extensions will be granted. Any reply shall be filed by October 7, 2024. In the event Plaintiff does not file any opposition, the Court will decide the motion based on the existing record, and the absence of any opposition may alone be a basis for granting the motion. SO ORDERED. Copies transmitted to all counsel of record. The Court respectfully requests the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Lane Saugerties, NY 12477. ( Responses due by 9/23/2024, Replies due by 10/7/2024.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 9/3/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 08/01 11:54 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 32. Mailed to: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
32 32 order Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 07/31 4:17 PM
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) Particular Motion: ECF No. 28. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/31/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
31 31 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 07/30 8:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Declaration of Emily A. Vance, and Exhibit A served on Kevin Kauffman on 7/30/2024. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Vance, Emily)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 07/30 8:28 PM
DECLARATION of Emily A. Vance in Support re:28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint .. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Vance, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Religious Exemption Request History for Kevin Kauffman
29 29 28 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 07/30 8:24 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . . Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss Tue 07/30 7:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/18 12:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against New York Presbyterian Hospital with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kevin Kauffman. Related document:1 Complaint. (nb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Tue 06/11 1:25 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 26. Mailed to: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (sac)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/10 12:27 PM
ORDER for13 Motion to Dismiss filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital,25 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge Lehrburger's R&R in its entirety. NYPH's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. If-and only if-Plaintiff has a good-faith basis to plead facts that would adequately state a claim upon which relief may be granted, he may amend his complaint by July 15, 2024.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 13 and mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2024.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/10/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 05/20 2:28 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 24-25. Mailed to: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (vn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
25 25 order Report and Recommendations Thu 05/16 3:40 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO HON. ANALISA TORRES: MOTION TO DISMISS re:13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital,1 Complaint filed by Kevin Kauffman. For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that NYPH's motion be GRANTED and the Compliant be dismissed without prejudice to leave to amend. To the extent not discussed herein, the Court has considered all of Plaintiff's arguments and determined them to be without merit. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 5/16/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
24 24 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 05/14 11:24 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:23 Letter filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court extends its condolences to Mr. Gertzman's family, friends, and colleagues. SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael E. Gertzman terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 5/14/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Mon 05/13 4:38 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Liza M. Velazquez dated May 13, 2024 re: Withdrawing Counsel due to Death. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
22 22 misc Letter Thu 11/30 7:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Liza M. Velazquez dated November 30, 2023 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
21 21 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 11/16 3:33 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit /Affirmation of Service
Friday, October 27, 2023
20 20 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Tue 10/31 4:44 PM
DECLARATION of Kevin Kauffman - EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, re:13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Document filed by Kevin Kauffman. (sc)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/31 4:40 PM
DECLARATION( RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint ). Document filed by Kevin Kauffman. (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 10/04 11:06 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 17-18. Mailed to: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (sha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/03 6:24 PM
ORDER: On October 2, 2023, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss the complaint. (See Dkt. 13-15.) Any opposition from Plaintiff must be filed by November 2, 2023. Failure to timely file opposition may result in dismissal of the complaint for that reason alone. Defendants must file any reply thereto by November 16, 2023. SO ORDERED. Copies transmitted to all counsel of record. The Court respectfully requests the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff: Kevin Kauffman, 7 Spaulding Lane, Saugerties, NY 12477. Responses due by 11/2/2023 Replies due by 11/16/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/3/2023) (mml)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/03 11:50 AM
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Particular Motion: ECF No. 13. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/3/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Other Mon 10/02 6:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notices of Appearance, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Declaration of Emily A. Vance, and Exhibit A served on Kevin Kauffman on 10/2/2023. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Vance, Emily)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 10/02 6:26 PM
DECLARATION of Emily A. Vance in Support re:13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint .. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Vance, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Religious Exemption History for Kevin Kauffman
14 14 24 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 10/02 6:24 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 10/02 6:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/02 6:21 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 6:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Juhyun Park on behalf of New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Park, Juhyun)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 6:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily A. Vance on behalf of New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Vance, Emily)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 6:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Frederick Laufer on behalf of New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Laufer, Gregory)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 6:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Liza May Velazquez on behalf of New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Velazquez, Liza)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/02 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael E. Gertzman on behalf of New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Gertzman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 09/20 11:50 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6. Mailed to: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (sha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/19 12:42 PM
ORDER Plaintiff initiated this action on June 12, 2023. (Dkt. 1.) A summons issued to Defendant on June 13, 2023. (Dkt. 3.) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), Plaintiff has a 90-day period to serve Defendant. That time has expired. The Court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's time to serve by 60 days. The Court reminds Plaintiff that it is his responsibility to effect service and the case can be dismissed if he fails to do so. The Court also directs Plaintiff to the Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175, open during normal business hours, 8:30 a.m. to 5:00 p.m., Monday through Friday, or available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/prose. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 9/19/2023) Copies transmitted to all counsel of record. The Court respectfully requests the Clerk ofCourt to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Lane Saugerties, NY 12477 (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 06/21 9:06 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (kh)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Wed 06/21 4:02 PM
Mailed a copy of Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment to Kevin Kauffman at 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 06/20 2:17 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/20/2023) (kv)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 06/20 12:21 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 06/20 12:22 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/13 4:17 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Presbyterian Hospital. (ta)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Se Payment of Fee - Processed Tue 06/13 3:58 PM
Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Money Order processed by the Finance Department on 6/13/2023, Receipt Number 384. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Tue 06/13 4:18 PM
Mailed a copy of3 Summons Issued to Kevin Kauffman 7 Spaulding Ln Saugerties, NY 12477..(ta)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 06/13 3:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Presbyterian Hospital, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kevin Kauffman. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/13 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against New York Presbyterian Hospital. Document filed by Kevin Kauffman. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 06/13 3:23 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]