California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-01041
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2023 1:51 AM PST
Defendant
Cole Kepro International, LLC
Represented By
Colin Hardacre
The Law Offices Of Colin A. Hardacre
contact info
Benjamin M. Low
Taft Stettinius And Hollister LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bisco Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Collie F James, IV
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 10, 2024
27 27 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/11 9:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE26 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
26 26 stip Dismiss Case Fri 06/07 4:06 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc..(James, Collie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
25 25 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 05/28 10:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. In the Joint Case Management Statement, the parties stated that they "understand that this matter is currently stayed pending action by the Receivership Court." ECF 24. This Court recognizes that a litigation stay was imposed by the Receivership Court. However, the Court ORDERS the parties to jointly file a Supplemental Brief, no longer than 10 pages, explaining whether the District Court of Clark County, Nevada can stay federal proceedings pending the resolution of a receivership case. The Supplemental Brief shall be filed no later than June 10, 2024. See order for details. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
24 24 misc Statement Wed 03/27 10:10 AM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management filed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 23 . (James, Collie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 03/25 4:47 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. On 3/1/2024, the Court issued its Reassignment Order22 instructing the parties to file a Joint Case Management Statement within 15 days. To date a report has not been filed. The parties shall file their Joint Case Management Statement no later than noon on 3/29/2024. Parties shall refer to the Reassignment Order for further details. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
22 22 4 pgs order Order Fri 03/01 12:23 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. See Order for details. (gga)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
21 21 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Fri 02/23 4:07 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-022) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-01041-CJC (DFMx). (rrp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/19 12:09 PM
Notice of Receivership of Cole Kepro and CKI Locker LLC and Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendant Cole Kepro International, LLC.(Low, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Order Appointing Receiver
Thursday, October 05, 2023
19 19 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Fri 10/06 9:48 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 10/06 9:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 4/4/2024. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 6/3/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/18/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2024 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 8/13/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
17 17 misc Report Tue 09/26 1:38 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT of Rule 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc.. (James, Collie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/08 1:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin M. Low APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, designating Colin A. Hardacre as local counsel. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 08/03 3:33 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin M. Low to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cole Kepro International, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35792535) filed by Defendant Cole Kepro International, LLC. (Hardacre, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 08/03 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 5, 2023. (rrp)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/03 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cole Kepro International, LLC, identifying The Anderson Group, LLC. (Hardacre, Colin)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/03 3:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with Jury Demand filed by Defendant Cole Kepro International, LLC.(Hardacre, Colin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 07/17 10:17 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cole Kepro International, LLC answer now due 8/3/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc..(James, Collie)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 07/14 9:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/18/2023. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 07/12 4:42 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc., upon Defendant Cole Kepro International, LLC served on 6/22/2023, answer due 7/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Benjamin Low, Esq., Counsel for Cole Kepro International, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy (James, Collie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/16 10:03 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Cole Kepro International, LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 06/15 6:49 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 06/15 6:48 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 06/15 6:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 06/13 7:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc.. (James, Collie)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 06/13 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc., (James, Collie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 06/13 6:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Bisco Industries, Inc.. (James, Collie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/13 6:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35489231 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Bisco Industries, Inc.. (Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Bisco Industries, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(James, Collie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Cole Kepro to Roseann Gonzales,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - PO No. 91730