New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nicholas G Garaufis
Referred: Taryn A Merkl
Case #: 1:23-cv-04388
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2023 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
Jack R. Dugo, JR, D.C.
Represented By
Jeffrey Randolph
Law Office Of Jeffrey Randolph, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Faisal Mahmood, M.D.
Represented By
Nicole Allocca
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info
Christopher Brian Bladel
Christopher B. Bladel
contact info
John William Leardi
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info
Paul Donald Werner
Buttaci & Leardi, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Middletown Spine and Joint Care, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Randolph
Law Office Of Jeffrey Randolph, LLC
contact info
Defendant
One Oak Medical Group, LLC
Represented By
Nicole Allocca
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info
Christopher Brian Bladel
Christopher B. Bladel
contact info
John William Leardi
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info
Paul Donald Werner
Buttaci & Leardi, LLC
contact info
Defendant
One Oak Orthopaedic & Spine Group, LLC
Represented By
Nicole Allocca
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info
Christopher Brian Bladel
Christopher B. Bladel
contact info
John William Leardi
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info
Paul Donald Werner
Buttaci & Leardi, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Max Saulter Gershenoff
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Qasim Ikram Haq
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Max Saulter Gershenoff
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Qasim Ikram Haq
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Geico Indemnity Company,
Represented By
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Max Saulter Gershenoff
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Qasim Ikram Haq
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Government Employees Insurance Company,
Represented By
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Max Saulter Gershenoff
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Qasim Ikram Haq
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2024
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, GEICO's motion to stay all pending no-fault insurance collection arbitrations brought by or on behalf of Defendants is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/10/2024. (TLH)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
71 71 misc Letter Tue 05/06 10:36 AM
Letter to Judge Merkl withdrawing Dkt. 70 request by Faisal Mahmood, MD, One Oak Medical Group, LLC, One Oak Orthopaedic & Spine Group, LLC (Allocca, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
70 70 misc Letter Mon 05/05 2:35 PM
Letter to Judge Merkl requesting discovery conference by Faisal Mahmood, MD, One Oak Medical Group, LLC, One Oak Orthopaedic & Spine Group, LLC (Allocca, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sood Subpoena,
Att: 2 Venkataraman Subpoena,
Att: 3 Callagy Law Subpoena,
Att: 4 Fredson Statmore Bitterman Subpoena,
Att: 5 Halkovich Law Subpoena,
Att: 6 Haddad Law Subpoena