Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:23-cv-00798
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Terminated:Nov 13, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2023 2:38 AM CST
Defendant
Sheriff Dept Lincoln Parish
Plaintiff
Jerone Jackson
1100 Arlington St
Ruston, LA 71270


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, November 13, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case/Party (LR41.3) Mon 11/13 11:41 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Clerk under LR41.3. Case may be reinstated within 30 days for good cause shown. By Tony R Moore, Clerk of Court, on 11/13/2023. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included) Tue 10/24 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to effect service within 90 days. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Tue 06/27 4:15 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sheriff Dept Lincoln Parish. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 06/27 4:12 PM
FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Jerone Jackson in the amount of $402.00, receipt number 300000208. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 06/20 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Jerone Jackson regarding1 Complaint. Reason: No filing fee accompanied this complaint. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/14 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Sheriff Department Lincoln Parish filed by Jerone Jackson.(crt,Williams, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/20 11:33 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]