Montana District Court
Judge:Kathleen L Desoto
Referred: Kathleen L Desoto
Case #: 1:23-cv-00063
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2023 1:39 AM MST
Defendant
American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By
Brooke B. Murphy
Murphymyers PLLC
contact info
Ben T. Sather
Murphymyers PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol A. Fachner
Represented By
Shawn P. Cosgrove
Parker Law Firm
contact info
Mark D. Parker
Parker, Heitz & Cosgrove, PLLC
contact info
Geoffrey T. Cunningham
Parker, Heitz & Cosgrove, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerome O. Fachner
Represented By
Shawn P. Cosgrove
Parker Law Firm
contact info
Mark D. Parker
Parker, Heitz & Cosgrove, PLLC
contact info
Geoffrey T. Cunningham
Parker, Heitz & Cosgrove, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of America
Terminated: 07/14/2023

GPO Jul 19 2024
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/19/2024. (SGN)
GPO Oct 09 2024
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 10/9/2024. (APP) Mailed to Counsel for Fachner and Luxury Living Rentals, LLC and each of these parties individually per the Order

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
44 44 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/24 11:10 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re42 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, pursuant to Rule 45(3), Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena to Produce Documents Joel Fachner,
Att: 2 Affidavit Brooke B. Murphy,
Att: 3 Exhibit Carol Fachner Deposition Excerpts,
Att: 4 Exhibit Jerome Fachner Deposition Excerpts
Thursday, April 10, 2025
43 43 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Thu 04/10 1:27 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re42 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, pursuant to Rule 45(3), Fed. R. Civ. P. filed by Joel Fachner. (Nelson, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Joel Fachner Deposition page,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Joel Fachner,
Att: 3 Deposition of Joel Fachner
42 42 motion Quash Thu 04/10 1:23 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena, pursuant to Rule 45(3), Fed. R. Civ. P. . Randall G. Nelson appearing for In Re Joel Fachner. (Nelson, Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 01/13 9:07 AM
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. (HMJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
41 41 misc Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT Response to Motion Tue 12/24 10:36 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Facts , Statement of Undisputed Fact re:28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner filed by Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner. (Cunningham, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
40 40 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Reply to Response to Motion Thu 12/12 5:31 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , REPLY to Response to Motion filed by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Supplement - MT Thu 12/12 5:23 PM
SUPPLEMENT re28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ,29 Statement of Undisputed Fact by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 12/12 3:37 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/12/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
37 37 motion Leave to File Document Wed 12/11 5:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Facts . Ben T. Sather appearing for Defendant American Economy Insurance Company. (Sather, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Facts,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion
Monday, December 02, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/02 3:45 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to33 Response to Motion ,28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Replies due by 12/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/2/2024. (TXB)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/02 1:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to33 Response to Motion . Brooke B. Murphy appearing for Defendant American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
34 34 misc Statement - MT Fri 11/22 5:09 PM
STATEMENT re33 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner. (Cunningham, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit October 28, 2021 Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition Transcript - Mandy Winters,
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition Transcript - Jerome Fachner,
Att: 4 Exhibit February 10, 2021 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit Claim Notes,
Att: 6 Exhibit March 3, 2022 Letter w/ Attachments,
Att: 7 Exhibit April 25, 2022 Letter w/ Attachments,
Att: 8 Exhibit May 3, 2022 Email,
Att: 9 Exhibit Rimkus Estimate,
Att: 10 Exhibit September 30, 2022 Winters Letter,
Att: 11 Exhibit November 15, 2022 Parker Letter,
Att: 12 Exhibit Alpha Omega Estimate,
Att: 13 Exhibit Deposition Transcript - Carol Fachner,
Att: 14 Exhibit Singer Opinion
33 33 respm Response to Motion Fri 11/22 5:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner. (Cunningham, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Setting - MT ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 11/14 4:11 PM
IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs'31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants motion for partial summary judgment on or before November 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 11/14/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/14 8:34 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re30 Brief/Memorandum in Support . Geoffrey T. Cunningham appearing for Plaintiffs Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner. (Cunningham, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 25, 2024
30 30 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 10/25 5:15 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT Fri 10/25 5:11 PM
Statement of Undisputed Fact re:28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by American Economy Insurance Company filed by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Partial Summary Judgment - SDM Fri 10/25 5:05 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Brooke B. Murphy appearing for Defendant American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
27 27 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 10/09 3:26 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 10/9/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/18 1:09 PM
NOTICE by Jerome O. Fachner Settlement Conference Report (Parker, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
25 25 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 09/13 2:38 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re24 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brooke B. Murphy in Support of Def American Economy's Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Exhibit EX. B-Carol Fachner Depo Excerpts
24 24 motion Compel Fri 09/13 2:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas Duces Tecum . Brooke B. Murphy appearing for Defendant American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 07/25 12:20 PM
American Economy Insurance Company's Amended ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trail by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/25 8:45 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/25/2024. (TXB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
21 21 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/24 3:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer . Brooke B. Murphy appearing for Defendant American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to File Amended Answer
Friday, July 19, 2024
20 20 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 07/19 3:31 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/19/2024. (SGN)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Protective Order Fri 07/19 12:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order . Brooke B. Murphy appearing for Defendant American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Agreed Order of Protection
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/09 3:12 PM
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings-Amended Pleadings Deadline 11/03/2023. (APP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order - SDM Fri 09/29 1:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2023. Discovery due by 8/23/2024. Motions due by 10/25/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/29/2023. (TXB)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
17 17 misc Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT Fri 09/15 10:14 AM
Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
16 16 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 09/14 4:50 PM
Related: [-]
15 15 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 09/14 2:37 PM
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 09/14 11:51 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/14/2023 (Hearing held in Missoula) (APP)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 09/14 1:33 PM
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings-Zoom Pretrial Conference 09/14/2023 (APP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
13 13 notice Mailing of Consent - MT Tue 09/12 1:29 PM
Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/26/2023. (APP)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/12 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey T. Cunningham on behalf of Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner (Cunningham, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
11 11 misc Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT Thu 09/07 3:39 PM
STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner. (Parker, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Thu 09/07 3:38 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner. (Parker, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Thu 09/07 3:36 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Carol A. Fachner, Jerome O. Fachner. (Parker, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Thu 09/07 3:17 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 08/04 12:51 PM
Defendant American Economy Insurance Company's ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by American Economy Insurance Company. (Murphy, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosures
Friday, July 14, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 07/14 3:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Summons. Served on Cassie Moyer on June 16, 2023, filed by Jerome O. Fachner. Safeco Insurance Company of America answer due date 7/7/2023. (Cosgrove, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/13 3:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by Jerome O. Fachner. (Cosgrove, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Insurance Policy
Thursday, June 15, 2023
4 4 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Thu 06/15 11:39 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/7/2023. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/7/2023. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/7/2023. Zoom Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2023 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/15/2023. (APP) Modified on 6/15/2023 SEND OUT ZOOM INFO (APP)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/15 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Safeco Insurance Company of America. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (APP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
2 2 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Wed 06/14 3:27 PM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Safeco Insurance Company of America, re1 Complaint (Cosgrove, Shawn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Wed 06/14 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by Jerome O. Fachner, Carol A. Fachner. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 06/14 2:51 PM
Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-3085195 (JDH)
Related: [-]