Nebraska District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-03074
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2023 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Victor Aaron Gonzales (1)
Represented By
Daniel R. Stockmann
Stockmann Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sara E. Fullerton
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Lincoln
contact info

GPO Jun 22 2023
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Victor Aaron Gonzales. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
GPO Jul 13 2023
ORDER granting the Defendant's 17 Motion to Continue to Victor Aaron Gonzales (1). Pretrial Motion Deadline set for 8/16/2023. The conference call to discuss setting any pretrial motion hearing needed, a change of plea hearing, or the date of the jury trial and deadlines for disclosing experts as required under Rule 16, previously scheduled for July 21, 2023, is continued to August 23, 2023 at 10:45 a.m. The time between today's date and August 23, 2023 shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
GPO Sep 21 2023
ORDER granting the Defendant's 20 Motion to Continue as to Victor Aaron Gonzales (1). Change of Plea Hearing set for 10/18/2023 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Accordingly, the time between today's date and the district court judge's acceptance or rejection of the anticipated plea of guilty shall be excluded for speedy trial calculation purposes. 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
GPO Jan 11 2024
ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Victor Aaron Gonzales. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. ( Zwart, Cheryl)
GPO Apr 19 2024
TENTATIVE FINDINGS OF FACT regarding Presentence Investigation Report as to defendant Victor Aaron Gonzales. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)

Docket last updated: 06/15/2023 3:31 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
1 1 PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E- Government Act as to defendant Victor Aaron Gonzales. (MKR)
Related: [-]
2 2 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment1 as to defendant Victor Aaron Gonzales. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Victor Aaron Gonzales. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]