Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00388
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2023 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia (3)
Represented By
Oscar Alvarez
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Arturo Garcia (1)
Represented By
David Norbert Thomas
Federal Public Defender - Txsd
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Defendant
Jesus Velasco-Ibar (2)
Represented By
Zelene Vianey Zaleta
Attorney Zelene Zaleta
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
David Agustin Lindenmuth
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/15/2023 3:05 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 5/23/2023 as to Arturo Garcia, Jesus Velasco-Ibar, Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia. Defts sworn in. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Defendants First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendants examined by the U.S. Probation Office. Defendants request court appointed counsel. The Court will appoint counsel to represent each of the defendants. In the event the defendants are able to hire private counsel, defts shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ronald G. Morgan. Defendants held without bond. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ronald G. Morgan. The Detention Facility will be adhering to the Center of Disease Control guidelines in managing COVID-19 in Correctional and Detention Facilities. Defts will be placed in quarantined from the date of arrival at the facility. All time is tolled until the quarantine period is over or until such time defendant are medically cleared to appear for court proceedings. Defts remanded to the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:David Coronado, AUSA(USPO:C Gonzalez/J Hernandez)(ERO:Juanita Tabarers) (Interpreter:Noe Murillo, present for Defts Velasco-Ibar and Dominguez-Garcia only) (DUSM: A Perez/M Lucio/R Palomino) (CSO: Janie Martinez) (BerthaVasquez, 1)[9:57 - 10:14 AM] [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Norbert Thomas, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Arturo Garcia, filed.(Thomas, David) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Arturo Garcia (1), Jesus Velasco-Ibar (2), Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia (3), filed. (JuanitaTabares, 1) (SarahCastillo, 1). [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet; Date of Arrest: 5/22/23 as to Arturo Garcia, filed.(JuanitaTabares, 1) (SarahCastillo, 1). [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/23/2023) Unredacted attachment
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet; Date of Arrest: 5/22/23 as to Jesus Velasco-Ibar, filed.(JuanitaTabares, 1) (SarahCastillo, 1). [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/23/2023) Unredacted attachment
4 4 AO 257 Information Sheet; Date of Arrest: 5/22/23 as to Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia, filed.(JuanitaTabares, 1) (SarahCastillo, 1). [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/23/2023) Unredacted attachment
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Arturo Garcia ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified. (BerthaVasquez, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Jesus Velasco-Ibar. Zelene V Zaleta appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified. (BerthaVasquez, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia. Oscar Alvarez appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified. (BerthaVasquez, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
8 8 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Arturo Garcia, Jesus Velasco-Ibar, Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified. (BerthaVasquez, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
9 9 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Arturo Garcia, filed. [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
10 10 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jesus Velasco-Ibar, filed. [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
11 11 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia, filed. [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. David Agustin Lindenmuth appearing for USA, filed.(Lindenmuth, David) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
12 12 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia, filed. (mccastillo, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jesus Velasco-Ibar, filed.(Zaleta, Zelene) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
14 14 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Arturo Garcia, filed. (mccastillo, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia, filed.(Alvarez, Oscar) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia in the case of Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia, filed.(Alvarez, Oscar) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
17 17 Sealed Event, filed. [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan: DETENTION HEARING as to Jesus Velasco-Ibar held on 5/26/2023. Deft sworn in. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. After review of the PSA report and arguments of counsel, the Court finds there is no condition or combination of conditions that would reasonably assure the defendant's appearance at further court proceedings or safeguard the community and orders defendant held without bond pending further proceedings. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:David Lindenmuth, AUSA; Zelene Zaleta f/dft(USPO:Luis Lopez/Vanessa Alaniz)(ERO:Sara Celis) (Interpreter:Noe Murillo) (DUSM: A Perez/A Torres) (CSO: Sam Rivera) (BerthaVasquez, 1)[10:29 - 10:39 AM] [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan: DETENTION HEARING as to Arturo Garcia held on 5/26/2023. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. After review of the PSA report and arguments of counsel, the Court sets a $50,000.00 bond with $2,500.00 CASH Deposit and conditions as included in the Pretrial Report and recited on the record.Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:David Lindenmuth, AUSA; David Thomas f/dft(USPO:Luis Lopez/Vanessa Alaniz)(ERO:Sara Celis) (Interpreter:Noe Murillo, present not needed) (DUSM: A Perez/A Torres) (CSO: Sam Rivera) (BerthaVasquez, 1)[10:29 - 10:39 AM] [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
18 18 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jesus Velasco-Ibar, filed. (mccastillo, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
19 19 Addendum to14 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Arturo Garcia, filed. (mccastillo, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
20 20 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Arturo Garcia, filed.(Thomas, David) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jesus Velasco-Ibar ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified. (SaraCelis, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Arturo Garcia. Arturo Garcia (1) $50,000 cash bond with a $2,500 deposit ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified. (RDVenturi, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
23 23 Appearance Bond Entered as to Arturo Garcia in amount of $50,000 w/ $2,500 cash deposit, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1) [1:23-mj-00398]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
24 24 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Arturo Garcia (1) count(s) 1, 2, Jesus Velasco-Ibar (2) count(s) 1, 2, Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia (3) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (MaricelaPerez, 1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
25 25 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Arturo Garcia, Jesus Velasco-Ibar, Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia, filed.(MaricelaPerez, 1)
Related: [-]
26 26 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Arturo Garcia, Jesus Velasco-Ibar, Jose Carlos Dominguez-Garcia. Arraignment set for 6/22/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt, filed. (MaricelaPerez, 1)
Related: [-]