North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-00210
Case Filed:May 16, 2023
Terminated:May 30, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2023 3:38 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
GRAHAM TOD GREEN
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
2367 BETHABARA ROAD, APARTMENT A9 WINSTON-SALEM, NC 27106 (1)
Terminated: 05/30/2023


Docket last updated: 06/15/2023 4:29 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
1 1 APPLICATION and Affidavit for Search Warrant - SEALED as to 2367 BETHABARA ROAD, APARTMENT A9 WINSTON-SALEM, NC 27106. (Levintow, David) (Garland, Leah).
Related: [-]
2 2 Search Warrant Issued - SEALED in case as to 2367 BETHABARA ROAD, APARTMENT A9 WINSTON-SALEM, NC 27106. (Levintow, David) (Garland, Leah).
Related: [-]