Thomas E. Richardson v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02665 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2023 3:52 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Richardson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Terminated: 11/21/2023
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of entire cases by Plaintiffs Rick A. Brazill, Robert K. Ratzlaff, Thomas E. Richardson Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02663-RMG, 2:23-cv-02664-RMG, 2:23-cv-02665-RMG(Back, Daniel) Modified to edit docket text, filer, for clarification on 8/20/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas E. Richardson as to Defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., only (Back, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Back on behalf of Rick A. Brazill, Robert K. Ratzlaff, Thomas E. Richardson Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02663-RMG, 2:23-cv-02664-RMG, 2:23-cv-02665-RMG(Back, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/14/2023), Thomas E. Richardson v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02665-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Kansas (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cper, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 06/15 5:30 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/14/2023), Thomas E. Richardson v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02665-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Kansas (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11156463) filed by Thomas E. Richardson. Service due by 9/12/2023(cper, ) |